EP2275425 - Novel crystalline forms of temozolomide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMAGIS LTD. 29 Lehi Street 51200 Bnei-Brak / IL | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adin, Itai 11 Nathan Yelin-Mor Street 84684 Beer Sheva / IL | 02 /
Iustain, Carmen 5 Burla Street 84000 Beer Sheva / IL | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10177879.3 | 30.12.2004 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | US20030532944P | 30.12.2003 Original published format: US 532944 P | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2275425 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/4188, A61P35/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neue kristalline Formen von Temozolomid | [2011/03] | English: | Novel crystalline forms of temozolomide | [2011/03] | French: | Nouvelles formes cristallines de temozolomide | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04806720.1 / EP1706407 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040806720) is 07.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2511679 (MAY & BAKER LTD [GB]) [X] 1-8 * Claims 1-7; Formula (I); Compound A; examples 1, 4, 9 *; | [X] - LOWE, P. R. ET AL., "Antitumor imidazotetrazines. 25. Crystal structure of 8-carbamoyl-3-methylimidazo[5,1-d]-1,2,3,5-tetrazin-4(3H)-one (temozolomide) and structural comparisons with the related drugs mitozolomide and DTIC", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 35, no. 18, pages 3377 - 3382, XP002327080 [X] 1-8 * Compound 5; Fig. 2-3; Table II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00096a013 | [X] - WANG, HAINA ET AL., "Preparation and thermostability of polymorphs of temozolomide", ZHONGGUO YIYAO GONGYE ZAZHI, (2003), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 178 - 180, XP001206278 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - BRITAIN ET AL, "Polymorphism in Pharmaceutical Solids passage", POLYMORPHISM IN PHARMACEUTICAL SOLIDS, (1999), pages 235 - 238, XP002278123 [A] 1-8 * p. 236, l. 18-22 * | [A] - CAIRA M R, "CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPHISM OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (1998), vol. 198, ISSN 0340-1022, pages 163 - 208, XP001156954 [A] 1-8 * p. 164, paragraph 1; p. 165, paragraph 2; p. 165, last paragraph - p. 166, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 | [A] - RODRIGUEZ-HORNEDO N ET AL, "SIGNIFICANCE OF CONTROLLING CRYSTALLIZATION MECHANISMS AND KINETICS IN PHARMACEUTICAL SYSTEMS", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (19990701), vol. 88, no. 7, doi:10.1021/JS980490H, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 651 - 660, XP001096590 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js980490h | [A] - SHEKUNOV B Y ET AL, "Crystallization processes in pharmaceutical technology and drug delivery design", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000401), vol. 211, no. 1-4, doi:10.1016/S0022-0248(99)00819-2, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 122 - 136, XP004193361 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(99)00819-2 |