EP2431221 - Passenger seat for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens AG Österreich Siemensstraße 92 1210 Wien / AT | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brabec, Johann Lewinskyg. 32 1160 Wien / AT | 02 /
Gschwantner, Antony Lindengasse 12 2521 Trumau / AT | 03 /
Tiefenböck, Manfred Klitschgasse 8-10/c/6 1130 Wien / AT | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10177894.2 | 21.09.2010 | [2012/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431221 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/68, B61D33/00 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
B60N2/242 (EP);
B60N2/686 (EP);
B61D33/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Passagiersitz für ein Fahrzeug | [2012/12] | English: | Passenger seat for a vehicle | [2012/12] | French: | Siège passager pour un véhicule | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 30.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1176078 (ANSALDOBREDA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3-5,8-10 * the whole document * [I] 2,6,7; | [XI]US5924771 (MARCHESI PAOLO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,10 * the whole document * [I] 7,9; | [XI]US4099780 (SCHMIDHUBER KARL) [X] 1,3-5,8,10 * abstract * [I] 6,7,10; | [A]GB2468365 (ROBINSON DOMINIC JAMES [GB]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5839787 (MAGNUSON RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |