EP2258913 - Covering element particularly for pits of workshops and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Truck Training Center Italy S.R.L. Via Louis Blériot, 2 25018 Montichiari (BS) / IT | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pesci, Giuseppe Via Eufemia, 52/E 25135, Brescia / IT | 02 /
Scolari, Giovanni Battista Via Verginello, 3 25045, Castegnato (BS) / IT | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10178031.0 | 21.09.2010 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI01843 | 23.10.2009 Original published format: IT MI20091843 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2258913 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2258913 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04H5/06, E06B9/06 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
E04H5/06 (EP);
E06B9/0669 (EP);
E06B9/0638 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abdeckelement insbesondere für Werkstattgruben und dergleichen | [2010/49] | English: | Covering element particularly for pits of workshops and the like | [2010/49] | French: | Elément de recouvrement en particulier pour les fosses d'atelier et analogues | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3415516 (SIEWERT RUDOLF) [X] 1-8 * page 9, paragraph 7 - page 15, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [AD]EP1849935 (TRUCK TRAINING CT ITALY S R L [IT]) [AD] 1,6,8 * the whole document * |