EP2308645 - Distributor for continuously feeding abrasive material in a water-jet cutting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIESSE S.p.A. Via della Meccanica, 16 61100 Pesaro / IT | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siepi, Marco Biesse S.p.A. Via della Meccanica 16 61100 Pesaro Urbino / IT | 02 /
Traini, Matteo Biesse S.p.A. Via della Meccanica 16 61100 Pesaro Urbino / IT | 03 /
Belli, Marco Biesse S.p.A. Via della Meccanica 16 61100 Pesaro Urbino / IT | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
Siepi, Marco Biesse S.p.A. Via della Meccanica 16 61100 Pesaro Urbino / IT | ||
02 /
Traini, Matteo Biesse S.p.A. Via della Meccanica 16 61100 Pesaro Urbino / IT | |||
03 /
Belli, Marco Biesse S.p.A. Via della Meccanica 16 61100 Pesaro Urbino / IT | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2011/15] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10178185.4 | 22.09.2010 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00732 | 28.09.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090732 | [2011/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2308645 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308645 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B24C3/04, B24C5/02 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
B24C3/04 (EP,US);
B24C5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | Verteiler zum kontinuierlichen Zuführen von Abrasivmaterial in einer Wasserstrahl-Schneidmaschine | [2011/15] | English: | Distributor for continuously feeding abrasive material in a water-jet cutting machine | [2011/15] | French: | Distributeur pour l'alimentation ininterrompue d'un matériau abrasif dans une machine de découpe par jet d'eau | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 04.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2010 | AL | 14.03.2012 | AT | 14.03.2012 | BE | 14.03.2012 | CY | 14.03.2012 | DK | 14.03.2012 | EE | 14.03.2012 | FI | 14.03.2012 | HR | 14.03.2012 | LT | 14.03.2012 | LV | 14.03.2012 | MK | 14.03.2012 | MT | 14.03.2012 | NL | 14.03.2012 | RO | 14.03.2012 | SI | 14.03.2012 | SK | 14.03.2012 | SM | 14.03.2012 | TR | 14.03.2012 | BG | 14.06.2012 | NO | 14.06.2012 | GR | 15.06.2012 | ES | 25.06.2012 | IS | 14.07.2012 | PT | 16.07.2012 | IE | 22.09.2012 | LU | 22.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
AL | 14.03.2012 | ||
AT | 14.03.2012 | ||
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
SM | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 22.09.2012 | ||
LU | 22.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 14.03.2012 | ||
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
SM | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 22.09.2012 | ||
LU | 22.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 14.03.2012 | ||
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 22.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 14.03.2012 | ||
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 22.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 22.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
IE | 22.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 14.03.2012 | |
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 14.03.2012 | |
NO | 14.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4827679 (EARLE III GEORGE A [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, lines 50-60 *; | [A]US5349788 (NEDO WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 3* column 2, lines 49-52 *; | [A]US2004259478 (HASHISH MOHAMED A [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0048] , [0049] * * figures 2A-2D,4A-4H,6 *; | [A]WO2008128303 (TECHNI WATERJET PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 12 * * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 6 * * page 9, lines 30-38 * * page 11, line 21 - page 18, line 26 * * figures 1-12 * | by applicant | WO2008128303 |