EP2341205 - Door stay for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metalsa Automotive GmbH Othestrasse 19 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | [2013/37] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states ISE Automotive GmbH Othestrasse 19 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegert, Viktor Auf der Ley 12 51580, Reichshof-Eckenhagen / DE | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 10178385.0 | 22.09.2010 | [2011/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341205 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/20 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
E05C17/203 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Türfeststeller für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2011/27] | English: | Door stay for motor vehicles | [2011/27] | French: | Arrêt de portière pour véhicules automobiles | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/39] | 14.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE29717283U (LUNKE & SOHN AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * page 5, line 10 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102004015793 (EDSCHA AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1741859 (ISE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0033]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE9111509U (SIEGMÜLLER GMBH) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE29717283U |