EP2273377 - Interrupt control apparatuses and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyake, Hideo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Suga, Atsuhiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Yasuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
Miyake, Hideo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Suga, Atsuhiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakamura, Yasuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2011/02] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10178418.9 | 25.10.2000 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | JP19990309598 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30959899 | JP19990341077 | 30.11.1999 Original published format: JP 34107799 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2273377 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2273377 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/24 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
G06F9/4812 (EP,US);
G06F9/46 (KR);
G06F13/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/02] | Title | German: | Unterbrechungskontrollgeräte und Verfahren | [2011/02] | English: | Interrupt control apparatuses and methods | [2011/02] | French: | Méthodes et appareils de contrôle d'interruptions | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 12.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00309397.8 / EP1096386 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000309397) is 28.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.10.2012 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0702297 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 50 - line 56 * [I] 2-9,11-15; | [A]US5732210 (BUZBEE WILLIAM B [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 15 - line 33 *; | [A]EP0712078 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * | by applicant | - N . J. WARTER, "The Benefit of Predicated Execution for Software Pipelining", IIICSS-26 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (199301), vol. 1, pages 497 - 606 |