EP2306580 - Composition and energy storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soloveichik, Grigorii Lev GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Rm. Bldg. K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Hart, Richard Louis GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Rm. Bldg. K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Galloway, Roy Christie Unit 5.3, Lancaster Court Lancaster Park Needwood, Staffordshire DE13 9PD / GB | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Soloveichik, Grigorii Lev GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Rm. Bldg. K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | ||
02 /
Hart, Richard Louis GE Global Research One Research Circle Patent Docket Rm. Bldg. K1-4A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | |||
03 /
Galloway, Roy Christie Unit 5.3, Lancaster Court, Lancaster Park Needwood, Staffordshire DE13 9PD / GB | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/39] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/14] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10178461.9 | 22.09.2010 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | US20090565842 | 24.09.2009 Original published format: US 565842 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306580 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2306580 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/39, H01M4/52, H01M4/58, H01M4/04, // H01M10/42, H01M10/615, H01M10/625, H01M10/633, H01M10/6571 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
H01M10/39 (EP,US);
H01M10/399 (EP,US);
H01M4/0471 (EP,US);
H01M4/0473 (EP,US);
H01M4/523 (EP,US);
H01M4/58 (EP,US);
H01M10/42 (EP,US);
H01M10/615 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/14] | H01M10/39, H01M4/136, H01M4/52, H01M4/58, H01M4/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2011/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung und Energiespeichervorrichtung | [2011/14] | English: | Composition and energy storage device | [2011/14] | French: | Composition et dispositif de stockage d'énergie | [2014/52] |
Former [2011/14] | Dispositif de stockage de composition et d'énergie | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 20.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2010 | AL | 20.05.2015 | AT | 20.05.2015 | BE | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | CZ | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | ES | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | HR | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | LV | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | MK | 20.05.2015 | MT | 20.05.2015 | NL | 20.05.2015 | PL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | SM | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | NO | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | IE | 22.09.2015 | LU | 22.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MK | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3959012 (LIANG C C, et al) [Y] 1-5,7-10 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 24 *; | [Y]EP0073877 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7-10* page 2, line 19 - page 5, line 26 *; | [XA]GB2164786 (LILLIWYTE SA) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 16, line 5 - page 17, line 61 * * page 19, line 27 - page 22, line 48 * [A] 5-7; | [YA]WO9423467 (PROGRAMME 3 PATENT HOLDINGS [LU]) [Y] 1-5,7-10 * page 22, lines 1-9; examples 1,5 * [A] 6; | [YA]US5536593 (REDEY LASZLO I [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * column 3, lines 7-19 * * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 22 * [A] 6,7; | [YA]US5573873 (BUGGA RATNAKUMAR V [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 53 - column 6, line 8 * [A] 6,7 |