EP2286796 - Controlled release formulation comprising albuterol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Penwest Pharmaceuticals Co. 2981 Route 22 Patterson, NY 12563-9970 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baichwal, Anand R. 5 Kendell Drive Wappinger Falls, NY 12590 / US | 02 /
McCall, Troy W. 4 Sullivan Farm New Milford, CT 06776 / US | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Stephen, Robert John CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Stephen, Robert John Olswang 90 High Holborn GB-London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10178632.5 | 04.11.1996 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | US19950553008 | 03.11.1995 Original published format: US 553008 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2286796 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2286796 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/22, A61K31/137, A61P11/08 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K9/2009 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/205 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/08] | Title | German: | Formulierungen mit kontrollierter Abgabe von Albuterol | [2011/08] | English: | Controlled release formulation comprising albuterol | [2011/08] | French: | Formulation à libération contrôlée d'albuterol | [2012/09] |
Former [2011/08] | Formulation a libération contrôlée d'albuterol | Examination procedure | 22.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96940352.6 / EP0804166 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960940352) is 14.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4309405 (GULEY PAUL C, et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,8,15 * example 1 * * claim - * [I] 2,4,6,9-14; | [I]EP0360562 (MENDELL CO INC EDWARD [US]) [I] 1-15 * claims 1-15,20-22 * * page 7; examples 1-15 ** page 9; examples 25,26; table 5 *; | [I]EP0539059 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * claims 1,11,13,14 * * page 3, line 31 - line 56 * * example 1 *; | [X]EP0642785 (MENDELL CO INC EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 13; example 15 * | by applicant | US4839177 | US4994276 | EP0234670 | US5128143 | US5135757 | - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 5, pages 857 - 884 |