EP2262295 - Communication route optimization system and nodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirano, Jun c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Ng, Chan Wah c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Koh, Tien-Ming c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Tan, Pek Yew c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10178786.9 | 14.12.2005 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | JP20040361997 | 14.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004361997 | JP20050334575 | 18.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005334575 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2262295 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/08 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
H04W8/082 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/08 (KR);
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Routenoptimierungssystem und -knoten | [2010/50] | English: | Communication route optimization system and nodes | [2010/50] | French: | Système pour optimiser des routes et noeuds correspondants | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 26.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05819721.1 / EP1825651 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050819721) is 21.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004228343 (MOLTENI MARCO [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0022] , [0027] , [0036] , [0037] , [0054] , [0055] *; | [I] - RYUJI WAKIKAWA MASAFUMI WATARI KEIO UNIV /WIDE, "Optimized Route Cache Protocol (ORC)", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20041024), no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015039818 [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [05.1] , [5.3.1] , [5.3.2] , [06.1] , [ 6.2] , [000A] * | by applicant | US2002009066 | WO2004010668 | US2004095913 |