EP2256155 - MATRIX, CELL IMPLANTATION AND METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/48] | Matrix, cell implant, and method for their production and use | ||
[2016/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Human Auto Cell Limited Kingsmere House The Kings Drive Hersham Surrey KT12 4BA / GB | [2017/10] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states HAC Biomed GmbH Arnulfstrasse 197 80634 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Görne, Martin Am Stein 46 22337 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Kaufmann, Peter-Matthias Am Heerwege 23 30900 Wedemark / DE | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Görne, Martin Am Stein 46 22337 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
Kaufmann, Peter-Matthias Am Mühlenberg 14c 30900 Wedemark / DE | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10179005.3 | 07.06.2004 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | DE20031025807 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325807 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256155 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256155 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/26, A61L27/26, A61L27/38, A61L27/56, A61L27/58 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
A61L27/3886 (EP,US);
A61L27/26 (EP,US);
A61L27/3804 (EP,US);
A61L27/3895 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | C08J9/26, A61L27/56, A61L27/58, A61L27/50, A61L27/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MATRIX, ZELLIMPLANTAT, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2016/48] | English: | MATRIX, CELL IMPLANTATION AND METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE | [2016/48] | French: | MATRICE, IMPLANT CELLULAIRE, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2016/48] |
Former [2010/48] | Matrix, Zellimplantat, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung | ||
Former [2010/48] | Matrix, cell implant, and method for their production and use | ||
Former [2010/48] | Matrice, implant cellulaire, leur procédé de production et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 28.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04739671.8 / EP1633807 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040739671) is 22.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2004 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | IE | 07.06.2017 | LU | 07.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.06.2004 | |
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.06.2004 | |
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.06.2004 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 03.05.2017 | |
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 03.05.2017 | |
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 03.05.2017 | |
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9425079 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph l - page 13, paragraph 2; claim - *; | [X]US5514378 (MIKOS ANTONIOS G [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 6-10 ** page 2, line 62 - page 7, line 44; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5626861 (LAURENCIN CATO T [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 10-12 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 23 * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 31 * * column 9, line 21 - column 10, line 67; example - * * column 16, line 15 - column 19, line 43; claim - *; | [XD]WO9844027 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 1, lines 2-6 * * page 2, line 24 - page 15; example -; claim - *; | [XD]WO9909149 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 1, line 20 - page 4, line 6 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 2 * * page 7, line 18 - page 9, line 21 * * page 14, line 17 - page 26, line 25 * * page 34, lines 15-19 * * page 36, lines 9-17; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9932204 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 18, paragraph 2 * * page 22, paragraph 1 - page 23, paragraph 1 * * page 29, paragraph 3 - page 30, paragraph 1 * * page 32, paragraph 2 - page 35, paragraph 2; example 2; claim - *; | [I]WO0135932 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, lines 12-18 * * page 8, line 30 - page 12, line 30 * * page 13, line 17 - page 15, line 4 * * page 18, line 6 - page 19, line 12 * * page 20, line 26 - page 21, line 28 * * page 24, line 24 - page 29, line 31 * * page 32, line 4 - page 38, line 16; example - * * page 63, lines 1-30; claim - *; | [X]US6337198 (LEVENE HOWARD B [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 13-22 * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 29 * * column 3, line 66 - column 7, line 14 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 44; example -; claim - *; | [AP]WO03064509 (UNIV TWENTE [NL], et al) [AP] 1-15 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 2, line 29 - page 7, line 9; figure -; example -; claim - *; | [XP]WO2004031371 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraphs [02.9] - [0046]; example 11; claim - *; | [I] - HOU Q ET AL, "Porous polymeric structures for tissue engineering prepared by a coagulation, compression moulding and salt leaching technique", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (200305), vol. 24, no. 11, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 1937 - 1947, XP004412414 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1938, column R, paragraph L - page 1947, column L, paragraph 6; figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(02)00562-8 | [A] - SOHIER J ET AL, "A novel method to obtain protein release from porous polymer scaffolds: emulsion coating", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030221), vol. 87, no. 1-3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 57 - 68, XP004412747 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 58, column R, paragraph 2 - page 66, column R, paragraph 1; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00350-4 | [X] - CHEN G ET AL, "Preparation of poly(l-lactic acid) and poly(dl-lactic-co-glycolic acid) foams by use of ice microparticulates", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (200109), vol. 22, no. 18, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 2563 - 2567, XP004273584 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2563, column L, line 1 - page 2567, column L, line 2; figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(00)00447-6 | [I] - HARRIS L D ET AL, "OPEN PORE BIODEGRADABLE MATRICES FORMED WITH GAS FOAMING", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, WILEY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1998), vol. 42, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 396 - 402, XP001021110 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 396, column R, paragraph L - page 402, column r, paragraph L; figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4636(19981205)42:3<396::AID-JBM7>3.0.CO;2-E | [X] - WHANG K ET AL, "A novel method to fabricate bioabsorbable scaffolds", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (19950201), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 837 - 842, XP004025968 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 837, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 839, column L, paragraph L - page 841, column R, paragraph 3; figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(95)93115-3 | by applicant | WO9844027 | WO9909149 | WO0187575 |