EP2298245 - Modular bone implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 19.02.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Technology, Inc. 1800 West Center Street Warsaw, IN 46580 / US | For all designated states Goble, E. Marlowe 1125 North Cedar Heights Drive Logan, UT 84341 / US | For all designated states Triplett, Daniel J. 583 S. 225 E. Providence UT 84332 / US | For all designated states Justin, Daniel F. 185 N. Winding Way Logan UT 84321 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goble, E. Marlowe 1125 North Cedar Heights Drive Logan, UT 84341 / US | 02 /
Triplett, Daniel, J. 583 S. 225 E. Providence, UT 84332 / US | 03 /
Justin, Daniel F. 185 N. Winding Way Logan, UT 84341 / US | 04 /
Hodorek, Robert A. 2005 E. Blossom Ln Warsaw, IN IN 46580 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Mays, Julie Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10179328.9 | 07.10.2004 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20030682101 | 09.10.2003 Original published format: US 682101 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298245 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/4637 (EP,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2/461 (EP,US);
A61F2/4603 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30133 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30492 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30785 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30797 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30894 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4628 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4641 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | Modulares Knochenimplantat | [2011/12] | English: | Modular bone implant | [2011/12] | French: | Implant osseux modulaires | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 02.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/12] | 18.02.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2016 | 17.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04256209.0 / EP1522284 | EP08017942.7 / EP2033599 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040256209) is 09.05.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5271737 (BALDWIN JAMES L [US], et al) [Y] 1,8-10 * column 1, line 27 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [Y]FR2748389 (RECH APPLIQUEES AUX TRAITEMENT [FR]) [Y] 1,8-10 * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 6; figure 1 * * page 8, line 27 - line 30 *; | [AP]EP1449500 (ZIMMER TECH INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-13* paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007]; figures 1,2,4 * | Examination | FR2706283 |