EP2284243 - Process for reducing coke agglomeration in coking processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Clinton Township Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Clinton Township Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siskin, Michael 209 South Scotch Plains Avenue Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 02 /
Kelemen, Simon 64 Mount Grove Road Annandale, NJ 08801 / US | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. I.P. Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 10179532.6 | 10.07.2002 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US20010304212P | 10.07.2001 Original published format: US 304212 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284243 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10G9/14, C10G9/16 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
C10G75/00 (EP,US);
C10G9/005 (EP,US);
C10G2400/06 (EP,US);
Y10S585/95 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduzierung der Agglomeration von Koks in Verkokungsprozessen | [2011/07] | English: | Process for reducing coke agglomeration in coking processes | [2011/07] | French: | Procédé pour réduire l'agglomération du coke dans des procédés de cokage | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 05.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 26.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02749880.7 / EP1414929 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020749880) is 04.08.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4673489 (ROLING PAUL V [US]); | [A]US5282957 (WRIGHT BRUCE E [US], et al); | [A]US5614080 (ROOF GLENN L [US]) |