EP2357192 - Human endokine alpha and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Human Genome Sciences, Inc. 14200 Shady Grove Road Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Guo-Liang 242 Gravatt Drive Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | 02 /
Ni, Jian 5502 Manorfield Road Rockville, MD 20853 / US | 03 /
Rosen, Craig A. 22400 Rolling Hill Road Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10179623.3 | 25.02.2000 | [2011/33] | Priority number, date | US19990122099P | 26.02.1999 Original published format: US 122099 P | US19990136788P | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 136788 P | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2357192 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/52, C12N5/10, C12N5/16, C12N15/19, C12N15/63, A61K38/19, A61K38/16 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
C07K14/5255 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/33] | Title | German: | Menschliches alpha-Endokin und Verfahren zu seiner Verwendung | [2011/33] | English: | Human endokine alpha and methods of use | [2011/33] | French: | Endokine alpha humain et methodes d'utilisation | [2011/33] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 13.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 16.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00913602.9 / EP1161451 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000913602) is 15.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9807880 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 43, line 7 - page 47, line 25 *; | [E]WO0073445 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1-11 * page 86, paragraph 2 - paragraph L * * page 97, paragraph l - page 98, paragraph 1; sequences 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0212489 | EP0218868 | EP0288088 | EP0464533 | CA2045869 | EP0232262 | US5641670 | WO9629411 | WO9412650 | EP0394827 | US5478925 | WO9849305 | US5073627 | WO9410308 | US4179337 | EP0401384 | US5643575 | US4002531 | US5349052 | WO9506058 | WO9832466 | US5612460 | US4631211 | US4708781 | US5194392 | US4433092 | US5480971 | WO9317715 | WO9208802 | WO9100360 | WO9205793 | US5573920 | US4474893 | US5601819 | US4714681 | US4925648 | WO9208495 | WO9114438 | WO8912624 | US5314995 | EP0396387 | WO9002809 | WO9110737 | WO9201047 | WO9218619 | WO9311236 | WO9515982 | WO9520401 | US5698426 | US5223409 | US5403484 | US5580717 | US5427908 | US5750753 | US5821047 | US5571698 | US5516637 | US5780225 | US5658727 | US5733743 | WO9222324 | US4946778 | US5258498 | US5807715 | EP0239400 | WO9109967 | US5530101 | US5585089 | EP0592106 | EP0519596 | US5565332 | US4444887 | US4716111 | US5545806 | US5814318 | WO9846645 | WO9850433 | WO9824893 | WO9816654 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9110741 | WO9321232 | EP0439095 | US5474981 | US5336603 | US5622929 | US5359046 | US5349053 | US5447851 | US5112946 | EP0307434 | EP0367166 | WO9604388 | WO9106570 | WO9640281 | US5811097 | US5605793 | US5811238 | US5830721 | US5834252 | US5837458 | US5939598 | US5969108 | US4816567 | US4816397 | US5225539 | US5413923 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5569825 | US5661016 | US4694778 | WO8605807 | WO8901036 | US5122464 | US5414981 | US4741900 | US4676980 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | WO8702671 | US4873191 | US5399349 | US5460959 | US5464764 | US5631153 | US4736866 | WO8809810 | WO8910134 | WO9011364 | WO9409137 | WO9614328 | WO9733899 | WO9734911 | WO9807880 | WO9818921 | WO9733904 | WO9832856 | WO9830693 | WO9830694 | WO9841629 | WO9856892 | WO9854202 | WO9806842 | WO9634095 | EP0399816 | EP0682110 | EP0282317 | WO9206194 | WO9013649 | EP0506477 | WO9639515 | WO9626736 | WO9802543 | WO9807832 | DE19639601 | US3773919 | EP0058481 | EP0133988 | DE3218121 | EP0052322 | EP0036676 | EP0088046 | EP0143949 | EP0142641 | JPS58118008 | US4485045 | US4544545 | EP0102324 | US5756065 | US5714631 | US5696239 | US5652361 | US5505931 | US5489425 | US5435990 | US5428139 | US5342604 | US5274119 | US4994560 | US5808003 | US4980286 | WO9206180 | WO9222635 | WO9220316 | WO9314188 | WO9320221 | WO9412649 | US5436146 | WO9408598 | US5441050 | US5885793 | WO9011092 | WO9811779 | US5693622 | US5705151 | US5580859 | - SMITH, R.A. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 6951 - 6954 | - KRIEGLER, M. ET AL., CELL, (1988), vol. 53, pages 45 - 53 | - BEUTLER, B. ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 316, page 552 | - KLEBANOFF, S.J. ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 136, page 4220 | - PERUSSIA. B. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 765 | - VILCEK. J. ET AL., J. EXP. MED, (1986), vol. 163, page 632 | - SUGARMAN, B.J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, page 943 | - LACHMAN, L.B. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 2913 | - DARZYNKIEWICZ, Z., CANC. RES., (1984), vol. 44, page 83 | - KOHASE. M. ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 45, page 659 | - WONG, G.H.W., NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, page 819 | - BERTOLINI, D.R., NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, page 516 | - SAKLATVALA, J., NATURE, (1986), vol. 322, page 547 | - DAYER, J.-M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1985), vol. 162, page 2163 | - YOKOTA, S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 140, page 531 | - KEHRL, J.H. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 166, page 786 | - PHILIP, R. ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, page 86 | - RANGES, G.E. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1988), vol. 167, page 1472 | - COLLINS, T. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, page 446 | - PUJOL-BORREL, R. ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 326, page 304 | - POBER, J.S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 136, page 1680 | - POBER, J.S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 3319 | - CAMUSSI, G. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 166, page 1390 | - CERAMI, A. ET AL., IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1988), vol. 9, page 28 | - OLIFF, A. ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 50, page 555 | - PIGUET, P.-F. ET AL., J. EXP. MED, (1987), vol. 166, page 1280 | - KERN, K.A. ET AL., J. PARENT, ENTER. NUTR., (1988), vol. 12, pages 286 - 298 | - MICHIE, H.R. ET AL., BR. J. SURG., (1989), vol. 76, pages 670 - 671 | - DEBETS, J.M.H. ET AL., SECOND VIENNA SHOCK FORUM, (1989), pages 463 - 466 | - SIMPSON, S.Q. ET AL., CRIT. CARE CLIN, (1989), vol. 5, pages 27 - 47 | - KORNBLUTH, S.K. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 137, pages 2585 - 2591 | - MICHIE, H.R. ET AL., N. ENG. J. MED., (1988), vol. 318, pages 1481 - 1486 | - REVHAUG, A. ET AL., ARCH. SURG., (1988), vol. 123, pages 162 - 170 | - WAAGE, A. ET AL., LANCET, (1987), vol. 1, pages 355 - 357 | - HAMMERLE, A.F. ET AL., SECOND VIENNA SHOCK FORUM, (1989), pages 715 - 718 | - DEBETS, J.M.H. ET AL., CRIT. CARE MED., (1989), vol. 17, pages 489 - 497 | - CALANDRA, T. ET AL., J. INFEC. DIS., (1990), vol. 161, pages 982 - 987 | - KAWASAKI, T., ALLERGY, (1967), vol. 16, page 178 | - KAWASAKI, T., SHONICA (PEDIATRICS), (1985), vol. 26, page 935 | - LIANG, C-M. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1986), vol. 137, pages 847 - 854 | - MEAGER, A. ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1987), vol. 6, pages 305 - 311 | - FENDLY ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1987), vol. 6, pages 359 - 369 | - BRINGMAN, T.S. ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1987), vol. 6, pages 489 - 507 | - HIRAI, M. ET AL., J IMMUNOL. METH., (1987), vol. 96, pages 57 - 62 | - MOLLER, A. ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1990), vol. 2, pages 162 - 169 | - MATHISON, J.C. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1988), vol. 81, pages 1925 - 1937 | - BEUTLER, B. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 869 - 871 | - TRACEY, K.J. ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 330, pages 662 - 664 | - SHIMAMOTO, Y. ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (1988), vol. 77, pages 311 - 318 | - SILVA, A.T. ET AL., J. INFECT. DIS., (1990), vol. 162, pages 421 - 427 | - OPAL, S.M. ET AL., J INFECT. DIS., (1990), vol. 161, pages 1148 - 1152 | - HINSHAW, L.B. ET AL., CIRC. SHOCK, (1990), vol. 30, pages 279 - 292 | - ELLIOTT, M.J. ET AL., BAILLIERES CLIN. RHEUMATOL., (1995), vol. 9, pages 633 - 52 | - FELDMANN M ET AL., ANN. N. Y ACAD SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 766, pages 272 - 8 | - VAN DER POLL, T. ET AL., SHOCK, (1995), vol. 3, pages 1 - 12 | - WHERRY ET AL., CRIT. CARE. MED, (1993), vol. 21, pages 436 - 40 | - TRACEY K,J. ET AL., CRIT. CARE MED., (1993), vol. 21, pages 415 - 22 | - GRUSS; DOWER, BLOOD, (1995), vol. 85, no. 12, pages 3378 - 3404 | - AGGARWAL; NATARAJAN, EUR. CYTOKINE NETW., (1996), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 93 - 124 | - GENTZ, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 821 - 824 | - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 37, page 767 | - CARTER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 13, page 4331 | - ZOLLER ET AL., NUEL. ACIDS RES., (1982), vol. 10, page 6487 | - WELLS ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 34, page 315 | - WELLS ET AL., PHILOS. TRANS. R. SOC. LONDON SERA, (1986), vol. 317, page 415 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - BRUTLAG ET AL., COMP. APP. BIOSCI., (1990), vol. 6, pages 237 - 245 | - BOWIE, J.U. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1306 - 1310 | - PHIZICKY, E. ET AL., MICROBIOL. REV., (1995), vol. 59, pages 94 - I23 | - D. BENNETT ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR RECOGNITION, (1995), vol. 8, pages 52 - 58 | - K. JOHANSON, THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, no. 16, pages 9459 - 9471 | - KOLLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 8932 - 8935 | - ZIJLSTRA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 435 - 438 | - SMITH; JOLMSON, GENE, (1988), vol. 67, pages 31 - 40 | - BOWIE, J.U. ET AL., "Deciphering the Message in Protein Sequences: Tolerance to Amino Acid Substitutions", SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1306 - 1310 | - PINCKARD ET AL., CLIN EXP. IMMUNOL., (1967), vol. 2, pages 331 - 340 | - ROBBINS ET AL., DIABETES, (1987), vol. 36, pages 838 - 845 | - CLELAND ET AL., CRIL. REV. THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1993), vol. 10, pages 307 - 377 | - OSTADE ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 361, pages 266 - 268 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - SMITH ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - DE VOS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 306 - 312 | - SMITH; JOHNSON, GENE, (1988), vol. 67, pages 3 1 - 40 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 331, pages 84 - 86 | - FOUNTOULAKIS ET AL., J. BíOCHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 3958 - 3964 | - LANDSCHULZ ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, page 1759 | - BEUTLER; HUFFEL, SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 264, page 667 | - BANNER ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 73, page 431 | - HOPPE ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1994), vol. 344, page 191 | - HUNKAPILLER, M. ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 310, pages 105 - 111 | - MALIK, EXP. HEMATOL., (1992), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 1028 - 1035 | - ZOLLER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1982), vol. 10, page 6487 | - WELLS ET AL., PHILOS. TRANS. R. SOC. LONDON SERA, (1986), vol. 337, page 415 | - MORPURGO ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 56, pages 59 - 72 | - VOROBJEV ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES NUCLEOTIDES, (1999), vol. 18, pages 2745 - 2750 | - CALICETI ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (1999), vol. 10, pages 638 - 646 | - MALIK ET AL., EXP. HEMALOL., (1992), vol. 20, pages 1028 - 1035 | - DELGADO ET AL., CRIT. REV. THERA. DRUG CARRIER SYS., (1992), vol. 9, pages 249 - 304 | - FRANCIS ET AL., INTERN. J OF HEMATOL., (1998), vol. 68, pages 1 - 18 | - DELGADO ET AL., CRIT. REV. THERA, DRUG CARRIER SYS., (1992), vol. 9, pages 249 - 304 | - FIELDS; SONG, NATURE, (1989), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246 | - GEYSEN, H.M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 3998 - 4002 | - SUTCLIFFE, J.G. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 219, pages 660 - 666 | - WILSON, I.A. ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 3, no. 7, pages 767 - 778 | - HOUGHTEN, R.A., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 5131 - 5135 | - CHOW, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 82, pages 910 - 914 | - BITTLE, F.J. ET AL., J GEN. VIROL., (1985), vol. 66, pages 2347 - 2354 | - TUTT, A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 60 - 69 | - KOSTELNY, S.A. ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681 | - BRINKMAN U. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 182, pages 41 - 50 | - AMES, R.S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 184, pages 177 - 186 | - KETTLEBOROUGH, C.A. ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 952 - 958 | - PERSIC, L. ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 187, pages 9 - 18 | - BURTON, D.R. ET AL., ADVANCES IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280 | - MULLINAX, R.L. ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 864 - 869 | - SAWAI, H. ET AL., AJRI, (1995), vol. 34, pages 26 - 34 | - BETTER, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - HUSTON ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 203, pages 46 - 88 | - SHU, L. ET AL., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 7995 - 7999 | - SKERRA, A. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1040 | - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 1202 | - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214 | - GILLIES, S.D. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202 | - PADLAN E.A., MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4-5, pages 489 - 498 | - STUDNICKA G.M. ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - ROGUSKA M.A. ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - NARAMURA, M. ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (1994), vol. 39, pages 91 - 99 | - GILLIES, S.O. ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 1428 - 1432 | - FELL, H.P. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 146, pages 2446 - 2452 | - ASHKENAZI. A. ET AL., PNAS, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10535 - 10539 | - ZHENG, X.X. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 154, pages 5590 - 5600 | - VIL, H. ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 11337 - 11341 | - DENG, B. ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, no. 6, pages 1981 - 1988 | - CHEN, Z. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, no. 16, pages 3668 - 3678 | - HARROP, J.A. ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, no. 4, pages 1786 - 1794 | - ZHU, Z. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, no. 15, pages 3209 - 3214 | - YOON, D.Y. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, no. 7, pages 3170 - 3179 | - PRAT, M. ET AL., J. CELL. SCI., (1998), vol. II I, pages 237 - 247 | - PITARD, V. ET AL., J. LMMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 205, no. 2, pages 177 - 190 | - LIAUTARD, J. ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1997), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 233 - 241 | - CARLSON, N.G. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 17, pages 11295 - 11301 | - TARYMAN, R.E., NEURON, (1995), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 755 - 762 | - MULLER, Y.A. ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1998), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 1153 - 1167 | - BARTUNEK, P. ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1996), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 14 - 20 | - GEYSEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 81, pages 3998 - 4002 | - HOUGHTEN, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 5131 - 5135 | - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 37, pages 767 - 778 | - SUTCLIFFE, SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 219, pages 660 - 666 | - CHOW ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, vol. 82, pages 910 - 914 | - BITTLE ET AL., J GEN. VIROL., (1985), vol. 66, pages 2347 - 2354 | - BITTLE ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1985), vol. 66, pages 2347 - 2354 | - FOUNTOULAKIS ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 3958 - 3964 | - JANKNECHT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 8972 - 897 | - PATTEN ET AL., CURR. OPINION BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 724 - 33 | - HARAYAMA, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 76 - 82 | - HANSSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 287, pages 265 - 76 | - LORENZO; BLASCO, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1998), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 308 - 13 | - J TUTT ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 60 - 69 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - DENG ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, no. 6, pages 1981 - 1998 | - CHEN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, no. 16, pages 3668 - 3678 | - HARROP ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, no. 4, pages 1786 - 1794 | - ZHU ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, no. 15, pages 3209 - 3214 | - YOON ET AL., J LMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, no. 7, pages 3170 - 3179 | - PRAT ET AL., J. CELL. SCI., (1998), vol. 111, pages 237 - 247 | - PITARD ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 205, no. 2, pages 177 - 190 | - LIAUTARD ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1997), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 233 - 241 | - CARLSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 17, pages 11295 - 11301 | - TARYMAN ET AL., NEURON, (1995), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 755 - 762 | - MULLER ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1998), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 1153 - 1167 | - BARTUNEK ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1996), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 14 - 20 | - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681 | - BRINKMAN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 182, pages 41 - 50 | - AMES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 184, pages 177 - 186 | - KETTLEBOROUGH ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 952 - 95 8 | - PERSIC ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 187, pages 9 - 18 | - BURTON ET AL., ADVANCES IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280 | - MULLINAX ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 864 - 869 | - SAWAI ET AL., A,JRI, (1995), vol. 34, pages 26 - 34 | - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - SHU ET AL., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 7995 - 7999 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1040 | - GILLIES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - PADLAN, MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4-5, pages 489 - 498 | - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - ROGUSKA ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - JESPERS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903 | - GREENSPAN; BONA, FASEB.J., (1989), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 437 - 444 | - NISSINOFF, J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, no. 8, pages 2429 - 2438 | - KUTMEIER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1994), vol. 17, page 242 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 457 - 479 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1984), vol. 81, pages 851 - 855 | - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 604 - 608 | - TAKEDA ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 452 - 454 | - BIRD, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 42 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 334, pages 544 - 54 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 1038 - 1041 | - FOECKING ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 45, page 101 | - COCKETT ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 2 | - RUTHER ET AL., EMBO J., (1983), vol. 2, page 1791 | - INOUYE; INOUYE, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 3101 - 3109 | - VAN HEEKE; SCHUSTER, J: BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 5503 - 5509 | - LOGAN; SHENK, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 355 - 359 | - BITTNER, METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, pages 51 - 544 | - WIGLER ET AL., CELL, (1977), vol. 11, page 223 | - SZYBALSKA; SZYBALSKI, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 48, page 202 | - LOWY ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, page 817 | - WIGLER ET AL., NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 357 | - O'HARE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 1527 | - MULLIGAN; BERG, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 2072 | - CLINICAL PHARMACY, vol. 12, pages 488 - 505 | - WU; WU, BIOTHERAPY, (1991), vol. 3, pages 87 - 95 | - TOLSTOSHEV, ANN. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1993), vol. 32, pages 573 - 596 | - MULLIGAN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932 | - MORGAN; ANDERSON, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 62, pages 191 - 217 | - TIB TECH, (199305), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 155 - 215 | - SANTERRE ET AL., GENE, (1984), vol. 30, page 147 | - COLBERRE-GARAPIN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1981), vol. 1.50, page 1 | - "The use of vectors based on gene amplification for the expression of cloned genes in mammalian cells", BEBBINGTON; HENTSCHEL, DNA Cloning, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 3 | - CROUSE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, page 257 7 | - PROUDFOOT, NATURE, (1986), vol. 322, page 52 | - KOHLER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 2197 | - NARAMURA ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (1994), vol. 39, pages 91 - 99 | - GILLIES ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 1428 - 1432 | - FELL ET AL., J.IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 146, pages 2446 - 2452 | - ASHKENAZI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10535 - 10539 | - ZHENG ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 5590 - 5600 | - VIL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 11337 - 11341 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 331, no. 1, pages 84 - 86 | - FOUNTOULAKIS ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 3958 - 3964 | - D. BENNETT ET AL., J. MOLECULAR RECOGNITION, (1995), vol. 8, pages 52 - 58 | - K. JOHANSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 9459 - 9471 | - GENTZ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 821 - 824 | - "Monoclonal Antibodies For Immunotargeting Of Drugs In Cancer Therapy", ARNON ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies And Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 243 - 56 | - "Antibodies For Drug Delivery", HELLSTROM ET AL., Controlled Drug Delivery, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 623 - 53 | - THORPE ET AL., "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES '84: BIOLOGICAL AND CLINICAL APPLICATIONS, (1985), pages 475 - 506 | - "Analysis, Results, And Future Prospective Of The Therapeutic Use Of Radiolabeled Antibody In Cancer Therapy", Monoclonal Antibodies For Cancer Detection And Therapy, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), pages 303 - 16 | - THORPE ET AL., "The Preparation And Cytotoxic Properties Of Antibody-Toxin Conjugates", IMMUNOL. REV., (1982), vol. 62, pages 119 - 58 | - AUSUBEL ET AL.,, Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1994), vol. 1 | - CHOMCZYNSKI; SACCHI, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 162, pages 156 - 159 | - HARADA, CELL, (1990), vol. 63, pages 303 - 312 | - FUJITA ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 49, pages 357 - 367 | - MAKINO ET AL., TECHNIQUE, (1990), vol. 2, pages 295 - 301 | - JALKANEN, M. ET AL., J CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 101, pages 976 - 985 | - JALKANEN, M. ET AL., J. CELL . BIOL, (1987), vol. 105, pages 3087 - 3096 | - IACOBELLI ET AL., BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, (1988), vol. 11, pages 19 - 30 | - WAHL ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1983), vol. 24, pages 316 - 325 | - WANDS ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1981), vol. 80, pages 225 - 232 | - BOULIANNE ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, page 643 | - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, page 268 | - PERKINS ET AL., EUR. J. NUCL. MED., (1985), vol. 10, pages 296 - 301 | - CARASQUILLO ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1987), vol. 28, pages 281 - 287 | - ESTEBAN ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1987), vol. 28, pages 861 - 870 | - KENNEDY, CLIN. CHIM. ACTA, (1976), vol. 70, pages 1 - 31 | - SCHURS ET AL., CLIN. CHIM. ACTA, (1977), vol. 81, pages 1 - 40 | - KOSTELNY, S.A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - Monoclonal Antibodies and T-cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681 | - SKERRA, A ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1040 | - ASHKENAZI, A. ET AL., PNAS, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10535 - 10539 | - ZHENG, X.X. ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 54, pages 5590 - 5600 | - HARROP, J.A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, no. 4, pages 1786 - 1794 | - YOON, D.Y. ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, no. 7, pages 3170 - 3179 | - PRAT, M. ET AL., J CELL. SCI., (1998), vol. III, pages 237 - 247 | - PITARD, V. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 205, no. 2, pages 177 - 190 | - LIAUTARD, J. ET AL., CYTOKINDE, (1997), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 233 - 241 | - TARYMAN, R.E. ET AL., NEURON, (1995), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 755 - 762 | - PATERSON ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1994), vol. 40, pages 691 - 698 | - CARVER ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY), (1993), vol. 11, pages 1263 - 1270 | - WRIGHT ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY), (1991), vol. 9, pages 830 - 834 | - VAN DER PUTTEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 6148 - 6152 | - THOMPSON ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 313 - 321 | - LO, MOL CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 1803 - 1814 | - ULMER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, page 1745 | - LAVITRANO ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 57, pages 717 - 723 | - GORDON, INTL. REV. CYTOL., (1989), vol. 115, pages 171 - 229 | - CAMPELL ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 380, pages 64 - 66 | - WILMUT ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 385, pages 810 - 813 | - LASKO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6232 - 6236 | - GU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 103 - 106 | - CAPCCCHI ET AL., POSITIVE-NEGATIVE SELECTION METHODS AND VECTORS | - CAPECCHI ET AL., CELLS AND NON-HUMAN ORGANISMS CONTAINING PREDETERMINED GENOMIC MODIFICATIONS AND POSITIVE-NEGATIVE SELECTION METHODS AND VECTORS FOR MAKING SAME | - LEDER ET AL., TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS | - WAGNER ET AL., GENETIC TRANSFORMATION OF ZYGOTES | - O'CONNOR, J., NEUROCHEM., (1991), vol. 56, page 560 | - OKANO, J., NEUROCHEM., (1991), vol. 56, page 560 | - LEE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1979), vol. 6, page 3073 | - COONEY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, page 456 | - DERVAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, page 1300 | - BERNOIST; CHAMBON, NATURE, (1981), vol. 29, pages 304 - 310 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, pages 787 - 797 | - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1981), vol. 78, pages 1441 - 1445 | - BRINSTER. ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, pages 39 - 42 | - WAGNER, R., NATURE, (1994), vol. 372, pages 333 - 335 | - LETSINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U.S.A., (1989), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 6556 | - LEMAITRE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, pages 648 - 652 | - KROL ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 958 - 976 | - ZON, PHARM. RES., (1988), vol. 5, pages 539 - 549 | - GAUTIER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 6625 - 6641 | - INOUE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 6131 - 6148 | - INOUE ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1987), vol. 275, pages 327 - 330 | - STEIN ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 3209 | - SARIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, pages 7448 - 7451 | - SARVER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1222 - 1225 | - HASELOFF; GERLACH, NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 585 - 591 | - SMITHIES, NATURE, (1985), vol. 317, pages 230 - 234 | - THOMAS; CAPECCHI, CELL, (1987), vol. 51, pages 503 - 512 | - THOMPSON ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 5, pages 313 - 321 | - ROSSOL-VOTH ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1991), vol. 72, pages 143 - 147 | - MONTGOMERY ET AL., EUR. CYTOKINE NEWT., (1996), vol. 7, page 159 | - TARTAGLIA; GOEDDEL, J. BIOL, CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, no. 7, pages 4304 - 4307 | - TARTAGLIA ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 73, pages 213 - 216 | - PATTEN, P. A. ET AL., CURR. OPINION BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 8, pages 724 - 33 | - HARAYAMA, S., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 76 - 82 | - HANSSON, L. O. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 287, pages 265 - 76 | - LORENZO, M. M.; BLASCO, R., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1998), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 308 - 13 | - J. EXP. MED., vol. 188, no. 6, pages 1185 - 1190 | - "Tumor Necrosis Factors: Gene Structure and Biological Activities", GOEDDEL, D. V. ET AL., Symp. Quant. Biol., COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1986), vol. 51, pages 597 - 609 | - BEUTLER, B.; CERAMI, A., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 57, pages 505 - 518 | - OLD, L.J., SCI. AM., (1988), vol. 258, pages 59 - 75 | - FIEFS, W., FEBS LETT, (1991), vol. 285, pages 199 - 224 | - POBER. J.S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 136, page 1680 | - POBER, J.S. ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 3319 | - CAMUSSI, G. ET AL., J. EXP. MED, (1987), vol. 166, page 1390 | - PIGUET, P.-F. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 166, page 1280 | - AGGARWAL; NATARAJAN, EUR. CYTOKINE NETW., (1996), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 92 - 124 | - SIMPSON. S.Q. ET AL., CRIT. CARE CLIN., (1989), vol. 5, pages 27 - 47 | - WAAGE. A. ET AL., LANCET, (1987), vol. 1, pages 355 - 357 | - DEBETS, J.M.H. ET AL., CRIT. CARE MED, (1989), vol. 17, pages 489 - 497 | - CALANDRA, T. ET AL., J INFEC. IDIS., (1990), vol. 161, pages 982 - 987 | - SHIMAMOTO, Y. ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (1988), vol. 17, pages 311 - 318 | - HINSHAW, L.B ET AL., CIRE. SHOCK, (1990), vol. 30, pages 279 - 292 | - ELLIOTT, M.J. ET AL., BAILLIERES CLIN RHEUMATOL., (1995), vol. 9, pages 633 - 52 | - FELDMANN M ET AL., ANN. N. Y ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 766, pages 272 - 8 | - WHERRY ET AL., CRIT. CARE. MED., (1993), vol. 21, pages 436 - 40 | - TRACEY K.J. ET AL., CRIT. CARE MED., (1993), vol. 21, pages 415 - 22 | - HAUSER ET AL., GROWTH FACTORS, (1993), vol. 4, pages 259 - 268 | - SIDMAN, U. ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (1983), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556 | - R. LANGER ET AL., J. BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1981), vol. 15, pages 167 - 277 | - R. LANGER, CHEM. TECH., (1982), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - TREAT ET AL., Liposomes in the Therapy of Infectious Disease and Cancer, LISS, NEW YORK, (1989), pages 317 - 327 353 | - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA), (1985), vol. 82, pages 3688 - 3692 | - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA), (1980), vol. 77, pages 4030 - 4034 | - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - GOLDSPIEL ET AL., CLINICAL PHARMACY, (1993), vol. 12, pages 488 - 505 | - TIBTECH, (199305), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 155 - 215 | - KOLLER; SMITHIES, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 8932 - 8935 | - WU; WU, J BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - KOLLER; SMITHIES, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 8932 - 8935 | - MILLER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1993), vol. 217, pages 581 - 599 | - BOESEN ET AL., BIOTHERAPY, (1994), vol. 6, pages 291 - 302 | - CLOWES ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 93, pages 644 - 651 | - KIEM ET AL., BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, pages 1467 - 1473 | - SALMONS; GUNZBERG, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 129 - 141 | - GROSSMAN; WILSON, CURR. OPIN. IN GENETICS AND DEVEL., (1993), vol. 3, pages 110 - 114 | - KOZARSKY; WILSON, CURRENT OPINION IN GENETICS AND DEVELOPMENT, (1993), vol. 3, pages 499 - 503 | - BOUT ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 3 - 10 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 143 - 155 | - MASTRANGELI ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1993), vol. 91, pages 225 - 234 | - WANG ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 775 - 783 | - WALSH ET AL., PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED., (1993), vol. 204, pages 289 - 300 | - LOEFFLER; BEHR, METH. ENZYMOL., (1993), vol. 217, pages 599 - 618 | - COHEN ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1993), vol. 217, pages 618 - 644 | - CLINE, PHARMAC. THER., (1985), vol. 29, pages 69 - 92 | - STEMPLE; ANDERSON, CELL, (1992), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 973 - 985 | - RHEINWALD, METH. CELL BIO., (1980), vol. 21A, page 229 | - PITTELKOW; SCOTT, MAYO CLINIC PROC., (1986), vol. 61, page 771 | - WU; WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - TREAT ET AL., Liposomes in the Therapy of Infectious Disease and Cancer, LISS, (1989), pages 353 - 365 | - RANGER; PEPPAS, J., MACROMOL. SCI. REV. MACROMOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 23, page 61 | - LEVY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, page 190 | - DURING ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1989), vol. 25, page 351 | - HOWARD ET AL., J. NOUROSURG., (1989), vol. 71, page 105 | - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - JOLIOT, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 1864 - 1868 | - E.W. MARTIN, REMINGTON'S PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES | - JALKANEN, M. ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 101, pages 976 - 985 | - JALKANEN, M. ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 105, pages 3087 - 3096 | - LUCKOW, VIROLOGY, vol. 170, pages 31 - 39 | - FELGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417 | - ALT, F. W.; KELLEMS, R. M.; BERTINO, J. R.; SCHIMKE, R. T., J BIOL. CHEM., (1978), vol. 253, pages 1357 - 1370 | - HAMLIN, J. L.; MA, C., BIOCHEM. ET BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1990), vol. 1097, pages 107 - 143 | - PAGE, M. J.; SYDENHAM, M.A., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 64 - 68 | - CULLEN ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 438 - 447 | - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, pages 521 - 530 | - GOSSEN, M.; BUJARD, H., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 5547 - 5551 | - KOZAK, M., J MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 947 - 950 | - SMITH, C.A. ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 76, pages 959 - 962 | - SCHALL, T.J. ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 61, pages 361 - 370 | - TRAUTH, B. C. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 245, pages 301 - 305 | - YONEHARA, S. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1989), vol. 169, pages 1747 - 1756 | - OEHM, A. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 10709 - 10715 | - CHINNAIYAN, A. M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 990 - 992 | - KITSON, J. ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 384, pages 372 - 375 | - BODMER, J.-L. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 6, pages 79 - 88 | - SCREATON, G. R. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 4615 - 4619 | - WILEY, S. R. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 3, pages 673 - 682 | - PITTI, R. M. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 12687 - 2690 | - PAN, G. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 276, pages 111 - 113 | - WALCZAK, H. ET AL., EMBO J., (1997), vol. 16, pages 5386 - 5397 | - MACFARLANE, M. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 25417 - 25420 | - SCHNEIDER, P. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 7, pages 831 - 836 | - CHAUDHARY, P. M. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 7, pages 821 - 830 | - SHERIDAN, J. P ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 818 - 821 | - MARSTERS, S. A. ET AL., CUR. BIOL., (1997), vol. 7, pages 1003 - 1006 | - PAN, G., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 815 - 815 | - DEGLI-ESPOSTI, M. A. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1997), vol. 186, pages 1165 - 1170 | - DEGLI-ESPOSTI, M. A. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 7, pages 813 - 820 | - KWON, B. S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1963 - 1967 | - CAMERIMI, D. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 3165 - 3169 | - NOCENTINI, G. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 6216 - 6221 | - POLLOK, K. E. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 150, pages 771 - 781 | - PRASAD, K. V. S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 6346 - 6351 | - ARCH, R. H. ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL, (1998), vol. 18, pages 558 - 565 | - JANG, I. K. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COM., (1998), vol. 242, pages 613 - 620 | - SAOULLI, K. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 187, pages 1849 - 1862 | - AKIBA, H. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 13353 - 13358 | - ARCH, R. H ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, pages 558 - 565 | - AKIBA, H., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 13353 - 13358 | - JANG, 1. K. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COM., (1998), vol. 242, pages 613 - 620 | - JANG, 1. K. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHY.S. RES. COM., (1998), vol. 242, pages 613 - 620 | - ROTHE, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 1421 - 1 427 | - HU, H. M. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 30069 - 30072 | - NAKANO, H. ET AL., J: BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 14661 - 14664 | - TAKEUCHI, M. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1996), vol. 271, pages 19935 - 19942 | - CAO, Z. ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 383, pages 443 - 446 | - SONG, H. Y. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 9792 - 9796 | - ROTHE, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 1421 - 1427 | - SCHINDLER, U. ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 14, pages 5820 - 9796 | - NOCENTINI, G. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 6216 - 6221 | - SMITH, C. A. ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 76, pages 959 - 962 | - NOCENTINI, G. ET AL., PROC, NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 6216 - 6221 | - ARCH, R. H. ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, pages 558 - 565 | - ARCH, R. H. ET AL., CELL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, pages 558 - 565 | - CHENG, G. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 1494 - 1498 | - DUCKETT, C. S. ET AL., MOL CELL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 17, pages 1535 - 1542 | - VANARSDALE, T. L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 94, pages 2460 - 2465 | - SONG, H. Y. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI, USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 9792 - 9796 | - MAURI, D. N. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1998), vol. 8, pages 21 - 30 | - SIDRANSKY, D. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, page 706 | - HOLTON, T.A.; GRAHAM, M.W., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 19, page 1156 | - JOHNSON, C.G. ET AL., METHODS CELL BIOL., (1991), vol. 35, pages 73 - 99 | - JOHNSON, C.V., GENET. ANAL. TECH. APPL., (1991), vol. 8, page 75 | - KIRSCHMEIER, P.T. ET AL., DNA, (1988), vol. 7, pages 219 - 25 | - TABATA H. ET AL., CARDIOVASC. RES., (1997), vol. 35, pages 470 - 479 | - CHAO J. ET AL., PHARMACOL. RES., (1997), vol. 35, pages 517 - 522 | - WOLFF J.A., NEUROMUSCUL. DISORD., (1997), vol. 7, pages 314 - 318 | - SCHWARTZ B. ET AL., GENE THER., (1996), vol. 3, pages 405 - 411 | - TSURUMI Y. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1996), vol. 94, pages 3281 - 3290 | - FEIGNER P.L. ET AL., ANN NY ACAD SCI., (1995), vol. 772, pages 126 - 139 | - ABDALLAH B. ET AL., BIOL. CELL, (1995), vol. 85, pages 1 - 7 | - KOTLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 8932 - 8935 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - KOHLER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 6, page 511 | - KOHLER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL, (1976), vol. 6, page 292 | - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T- Cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681 | US19980176200 | US19950446922 |