EP2327322 - Footwear with separable upper and sole structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2013/22] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Nike International Ltd One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grove, James A. 11201 S.W. Winterlake Drive Tigard, OR 97223 / US | 02 /
Avar, Eric P. 7644 S.W. 189th Avenue Aloha, OR 97007 / US | 03 /
Bruce J. Kilgore c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 04 /
Michael R. Friton c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton Oregon 97005-6453 / US | [2013/19] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
Grove, James A. 11201 S.W. Winterlake Drive Tigard, OR 97223 / US | ||
02 /
Aver, Eric P. 7644 S.W. 189th Avenue Aloha, OR 97007 / US | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/22] | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10179670.4 | 10.12.2003 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | US20030349398 | 21.01.2003 Original published format: US 349398 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2327322 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2327322 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/26, A43B13/36, A43B13/22 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A43B13/223 (EP,US);
A43B3/244 (US);
A43B13/26 (EP,US);
A43B13/36 (EP,US);
A43B23/0245 (US);
A43B3/24 (US);
A43B3/242 (US);
A43B3/246 (US);
A43B7/14 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | A43B13/26, A43B13/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/22] | Title | German: | Schuhwerk mit trennbarem Schaft und Sohlenstruktur | [2011/22] | English: | Footwear with separable upper and sole structure | [2011/22] | French: | Chaussure à tige et semelle séparables | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 07.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03789854.1 / EP1587385 | EP07021884.7 / EP1886591 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030789854) is 01.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2003 | AT | 29.05.2013 | BE | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | IT | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | NL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | TR | 29.05.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | ES | 09.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | IE | 10.12.2013 | LU | 10.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US997657 (DRAKE CHARLES LEONARD [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5317822 (JOHNSON JOSHUA F [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, lines 16-47; figure 5 *; | [A]US5661915 (SMITH MICHAEL R [US]) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 37 - line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6023859 (BURKE ROBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, lines 17-26; figures 5,6 *; | [A]FR2813766 (FENESTRAZ CAROLE CLAUDIE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4183156 | US4219945 | US4906502 | US4974344 | US5083385 | US5083361 | US5799417 | US5993585 | US6023857 | US6023859 | US6119371 |