EP2290549 - Protocol for communication with dynamic memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barth, Richard, Maurice c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Ware, Frederick, Abbot c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
Dillon, John, Bradly c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
Stark, Donald, Charles c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | 05 /
Hampel, Craig, Edward c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | 06 /
Griffin, Matthew, Murdy c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | [2015/26] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Barth, Richard, Maurice c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Ware, Frederick, Abbot c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | |||
03 /
Dillon, John, Bradly c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | |||
04 /
Stark, Donald, Charles c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | |||
05 /
Hampel, Craig, Edward c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | |||
06 /
Griffin, Matthew, Murdy c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2015/26] |
Former [2011/09] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10179835.3 | 18.10.1996 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US19950545292 | 19.10.1995 Original published format: US 545292 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2290549 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2290549 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290549 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G11C7/22 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F13/161 (EP,US);
G11C5/066 (EP,US);
G11C7/10 (EP,US);
G11C7/1072 (EP,US);
G11C8/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2015/26] |
Former [2011/09] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Protokoll zur Kommunikation mit dynamischem Speicher | [2015/02] | English: | Protocol for communication with dynamic memory | [2011/09] | French: | Protocole de communication avec mémoire dynamique | [2011/09] |
Former [2011/09] | Protokoll zur Kommunikation mit dynamischen Speicher | Examination procedure | 18.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 13.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02012810.4 / EP1244110 | EP96936776.2 / EP0870241 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960936776) is 04.02.2002 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.2010 | 15   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/36] | IT | 24.06.2015 | |
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | IT | 24.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0384620 (DATA GENERAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,11 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 57 *; | [Y]US5319755 (FARMWALD MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,11 * column 6, line 57 - column 12, line 24 *; | [A]EP0623931 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17* figure 8 *; | [AP]US5515325 (WADA TOMOHISA [JP]) [AP] 1-17 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 19; figures 9,11 * |