EP2267494 - CUBE CORNER CAVITY BASED RETROREFLECTORS WITH TRANSPARENT FILL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/52] | Cube corner cavity based retroreflectors with transparent fill material | ||
[2016/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Kenneth L. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Benson, Gerald M. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Coderre, James C. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
Frey, Cheryl M. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
Wilson, Bruce B. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
Craton, Michele A. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
Daniels, Michael P. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
Luehrs, Roger E. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2016/25] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
Smith, Kenneth L. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
Benson, Gerald M. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
Coderre, James C. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
Frey, Cheryl M. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
Wilson, Bruce B. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
06 /
Craton, Michele A. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
07 /
Daniels, Michael P. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
08 /
Luehrs, Roger E. 3M Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/25] |
Former [2011/29] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Hohmann, Arno 3M ESPE AG Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 10179858.5 | 12.05.1999 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US19990228367 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: US 228367 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2267494 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2267494 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2267494 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/124 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
B29D11/00605 (EP,US);
G02B5/124 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1471 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/25] |
Former [2010/52] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | RETROREFLEKTOREN MIT WÜRFELECKIGEN HOHLRÄUMEN GEFÜLLT MIT LICHTDURCHLÄSSIGEM MATERIAL | [2015/52] | English: | CUBE CORNER CAVITY BASED RETROREFLECTORS WITH TRANSPARENT FILL MATERIAL | [2016/02] | French: | RÉTRORÉFLECTEURS À CAVITÉS EN ANGLE DROIT ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DESDITS RÉTRORÉFLECTEURS | [2016/02] |
Former [2010/52] | Retroreflektoren mit Würfeleckigen Hohlräumen gefüllt mit Lichtdurchlässigem Material | ||
Former [2010/52] | Cube corner cavity based retroreflectors with transparent fill material | ||
Former [2010/52] | Rétroréflecteurs à cavités en angle droit et procédés de fabrication desdits rétroréflecteurs | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99921897.7 / EP1145050 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990921897) is 20.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.06.2016 | IT | 22.06.2016 | NL | 22.06.2016 | [2017/13] |
Former [2017/09] | IT | 22.06.2016 | |
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | NL | 22.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1646235 (GUBELA GUENTER) [Y] 1-7 * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [YD]US4181752 (CLEMENS LAWRENCE M [US], et al) [YD] 1-7 * abstract * * column 5, line 57 - line 65 *; | [Y]US5632946 (BACON JR CHESTER A [US], et al) [Y] 1-7* the whole document * | Examination | WO9701118 | by applicant | USRE24906E | US3684348 | US3712706 | US4127693 | US4181752 | US4329384 | US4330590 | US4656072 | US4737559 | WO8906811 | WO9511464 | US5637646 | US5753768 | - F.W. BILLMEYER, Textbook of Polymer Science(Second Edition,), WILEY-INTERSCIENCE, (1971), pages 84 - 85 |