EP2314697 - Streptococcus pneumoniae proteins and nucleic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT | For all designated states J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2011/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masignani, Vega Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 53100, Siena / IT | 02 /
Tettelin, Herve The Institut for Genomic Research 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
Fraser, Claire The Institut for Genomic Research 9712 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10179956.7 | 27.03.2002 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | GB20010007658 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: GB 0107658 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314697 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C12N1/21, C12Q1/68, A61K39/09, A61P31/04, C07K14/315, C07K16/12, G01N33/68 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/3156 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | Proteine und Nukleinsäuren von Streptococcus pneumoniae | [2011/17] | English: | Streptococcus pneumoniae proteins and nucleic acids | [2011/17] | French: | Acides nucléiques et protéines de Streptococcus pneumoniae | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 22.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02735782.1 / EP1373513 | EP05075713.7 / EP1630230 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020735782) is 08.04.2004 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9818931 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 3,4 * SEQ ID NO 83 has 100% identity in a 3987nt overlap to SEQ ID NO.1 of the present application.; page 660 - page 677; sequence 83 * * page 34 * * page 37 *[I] 1,2,5-14; | [XYI]WO0006738 (MICROBIAL TECHNICS LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1-9 * The amino acid sequence corresponding to ID58 on page 68 displays 100% identity across the full length of SEQ ID NO.2 of the present application.; page 68; sequence 58 * * page 10 - page 11; claim 1115 * * page 1 * [Y] 5-9,12,14 [I] 10-14; | [XYI] - CLARKE ET AL, "Cloning and Expression of the beta-N-Acetylglucosaminidase Gene from Streptococcus pneumoniae", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US, (19950414), vol. 270, no. 15, doi:10.1074/JBC.270.15.8805, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 8805 - 8814, XP002999733 [X] 1,3,4 * figure 3 * [Y] 5-9,12,14 [I] 2,10,11,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.15.8805 | [XDP] - TETTELIN HERVE ET AL, "Complete genome sequence of a virulent isolate of Streptococcus pneumoniae.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (2001), vol. 293, no. 5529, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 498 - 506, XP002218261 [XDP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1061217 | [A] - WIZEMANN T M ET AL, "Use of a whole genome approach to identify vaccine molecules affording protection against Streptococcus pneumoniae infection", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US LNKD- DOI:10.1128/IAI.69.3.1593-1598.2001, (20010301), vol. 69, no. 3, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 1593 - 1598, XP002263818 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.69.3.1593-1598.2001 | by applicant | EP0012873 | EP0036259 | EP0036776 | US4336336 | EP0060057 | EP0063953 | US4405712 | EP0121775 | WO8404541 | EP0127328 | EP0127839 | EP0136829 | EP0136907 | EP0155476 | US4546083 | US4551433 | EP0164556 | EP0176170 | US4588684 | US4603112 | EP0196056 | EP0219237 | JPS6296086 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4689406 | EP0244042 | WO8802406 | US4738921 | US4745056 | EP0267851 | US4762915 | GB2200651 | US4769330 | EP0284044 | US4777127 | US4797368 | WO8901973 | WO8902463 | WO8902468 | WO8904669 | US4837148 | WO8905349 | EP0324647 | EP0324274 | EP0329203 | US4861719 | US4870008 | EP0334301 | WO8909271 | US4876197 | US4880734 | EP0345242 | WO9002806 | US4929555 | EP0372501 | EP0378881 | WO9007936 | WO9009441 | EP0386882 | WO9011092 | WO9014837 | US4980289 | EP0415731 | WO9102805 | WO9102825 | EP0427347 | EP0440219 | WO9114445 | EP0453242 | EP0471177 | US5091309 | WO9205266 | WO9207945 | WO9210578 | WO9211033 | US5139941 | US5149655 | US5166057 | US5173414 | EP0524968 | WO9303769 | WO9306223 | WO9307283 | WO9307282 | US5206152 | WO9309239 | WO9310218 | US5217879 | WO9311230 | US5219740 | WO9314778 | WO9317712 | WO9319191 | US5252479 | WO9325698 | WO9325234 | WO9403622 | US5288641 | WO9408026 | WO9411506 | WO9412649 | WO9418922 | WO9421792 | US5354678 | WO9424299 | WO9423697 | WO9428152 | WO9428157 | WO9428938 | WO9500655 | WO9502697 | WO9504139 | WO9505835 | WO9507994 | WO9509241 | WO9509654 | WO9511984 | WO9514102 | WO9513796 | US5422120 | WO9524297 | WO9525807 | WO9527071 | WO9529993 | WO9530763 | US5474935 | WO9534671 | US5478745 | WO9605320 | WO9629412 | WO9637626 | US5580859 | US5591624 | US5608143 | US5659122 | US5693506 | WO9804702 | WO9806437 | EP0505012 | US5753235 | WO9820734 | WO9858668 | WO9924578 | WO9927105 | WO9928475 | WO9936544 | WO9957280 | WO0022430 | WO0027994 | WO0037494 | WO0056360 | WO0061761 | WO0152885 | EP0509612 | WO0202606 | WO0234771 | WO02077021 | - BREEDVELD, LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, no. 9205, pages 735 - 740 | - GORMAN; CLARK, SEMIN. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 2, pages 457 - 466 | - GLEZEN; ALPERS, CLIN. INFECT. DIS., (1999), vol. 28, pages 219 - 224 | - HOSKINS ET AL., J BACTERIOL, (2001), vol. 183, pages 5709 - 17 | - CHERIAN ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 36, pages 3605 - 3608 | - KEARNS ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1999), vol. 37, page 3434 | - BORODOVSKY; MCININCH, COMPUTERS CHEM., (1993), vol. 17, pages 122 - 133 | - SALZBERG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1998), vol. 26, pages 544 - 548 | - SALZBERG ET AL., GENOMICS, (1999), vol. 59, pages 24 - 31 | - DELCHER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 4636 - 4641 | - SHMATKOV ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (1999), vol. 15, pages 874 - 876 | - TETTELIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1809 - 1815 | - PIZZA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1816 - 1820 | - BJUNE ET AL., LANCET, (1991), vol. 338, no. 8775, pages 1093 - 1096 | - FUKASAWA ET AL., VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, pages 2951 - 2958 | - ROSENQVIST ET AL., DEV. BIOL. STAND., (1998), vol. 92, pages 323 - 333 | - COSTANTINO ET AL., VACCINE, (1992), vol. 10, pages 691 - 698 | - COSTANTINO ET AL., VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, pages 1251 - 1263 | - WATSON, PEDIATR INFECT DIS J, (2000), vol. 19, pages 331 - 332 | - RUBIN, PEDIATR CLIN NORTH AM, (2000), vol. 47, pages 269 - 285 | - JEDRZEJAS, MICROBIOL MOL BIOL REV, (2001), vol. 65, pages 187 - 207 | - BELL, PEDIATR INFECT DIS J, (2000), vol. 19, pages 1187 - 1188 | - IWARSON, APMIS, (1995), vol. 103, pages 321 - 326 | - GERLICH ET AL., VACCINE, (1990), vol. 8, pages 63 - 68,79-80 | - HSU ET AL., CLIN LIVER DIS, (1999), vol. 3, pages 901 - 915 | - GUSTAFSSON ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1996), vol. 334, pages 349 - 355 | - RAPPUOLI ET AL., TIBTECH, (1991), vol. 9, pages 232 - 238 | - DEL GUIDICE ET AL., MOLECULAR ASPECTS OF MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 19, pages 1 - 70 | - KALMAN ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1999), vol. 21, pages 385 - 389 | - READ ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2000), vol. 28, pages 1397 - 406 | - SHIRAI ET AL., J. INFECT. DIS., (2000), vol. 181, no. 3, pages S524 - S527 | - ROSS ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 4135 - 4142 | - SUTTER ET AL., PEDIATR CLIN NORTH AM, (2000), vol. 47, pages 287 - 308 | - ZIMMERMAN; SPANN, AM FAM PHYSICIAN, (1999), vol. 59, pages 113 - 118 125,126 | - DREESEN, VACCINE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 2 - 6 | - MMWR MORB MORTAL WKLY REP, (19980116), vol. 47, no. 1, page 12,19 | - MCMICHAEL, VACCINE, (2000), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 101 - 107 | - KURODA ET AL., LANCET, (2001), vol. 357, no. 9264, pages 1225 - 1240 | - RAMSAY ET AL., LANCET, (2001), vol. 357, no. 9251, pages 195 - 196 | - LINDBERG, VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 528 - 36 | - CRUSE ET AL., Conjugate Vaccines, vol. 10, pages 48 - 114, ISBN 3805549326 | - D.N GLOVER, DNA Cloning, (1985), vol. I, II | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., page 154,155 | - D.M. WEIR AND C. C. BLACKWELL, Handbook of Experimental Immunology, (1986), vol. I-IV | - MANIATIS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 236, page 1237 | - DIJKEMA ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, page 761 | - GORMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 79, page 6777 | - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, page 521 | - SASSONE-CORSI; BORELLI, TRENDS GENET., (1986), vol. 2, page 215 | - BIRNSTIEL ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, page 349 | - PROUDFOOT, TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (1989), vol. 14, page 105 | - GLUZMAN, CELL, (1981), vol. 23, page 175 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1989), vol. 9, page 946 | - SHIMIZU ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 6, page 1074 | - LUCKOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 17, page 31 | - MILLER ET AL., ANN. REV. MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 42, page 177 | - VLAK ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1988), vol. 69, page 765 | - CARBONELL ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 73, page 409 | - MAEDA ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, page 592 | - LEBACQ-VERHEYDEN ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, page 3129 | - SMITH ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 8404 | - MIYAJIMA ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 58, page 273 | - MARTIN ET AL., DNA, (1988), vol. 7, page 99 | - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, page 2156 | - MILLER ET AL., BIOESSAYS, (1989), vol. 4, page 91 | - AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols in Microbiology, (1990), vol. 2, page 16.8 | - CARBONELL ET AL., J. VIROL., (1985), vol. 56, page 153 | - WRIGHT, NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, page 718 | - FRASER ET AL., IN VITRO CELL. DEV. BIOL., (1989), vol. 25, page 225 | - ZENK, PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 3861 - 3863 | - VAULCOMBE ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1987), vol. 209, pages 33 - 40 | - CHANDLER ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1984), vol. 3, pages 407 - 418 | - ROGERS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 3731 - 3738 | - ROTHSTEIN ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 55, pages 353 - 356 | - WHITTIER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 15, page 25152535 | - WIRSEL ET AL., MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 3, pages 3 - 14 | - YU ET AL., GENE, (1992), vol. 122, pages 247 - 253 | - R.L. JONES; J. MACMILLIN, "Gibberellins", R.L. JONES; J. MACMILLIN, MALCOLM B. WILKINS, Advanced Plant Physiology, PITMAN PUBLISHING LIMITED, (1984), pages 21 - 52 | - SHEEN, PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 1027 - 1038 | - MAAS ET AL., EMBO J., (1990), vol. 9, pages 3447 - 3452 | - BENKEL; HICKEY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, pages 1337 - 1339 | - WILMINK; DONS, PLANT MOL. BIOL. REPTR, (1993), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 165 - 185 | - REED; MANIATIS, CELL, (1985), vol. 41, pages 95 - 105 | - CROSSWAY, MOL. GEN. GENET, (1985), vol. 202, pages 179 - 185 | - KRENS ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, pages 72 - 74 | - KLEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73 | - KNUDSEN; MULLER, PLANTA, (1991), vol. 185, pages 330 - 336 | - FRALEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1982), vol. 79, pages 1859 - 1863 | - FROMM ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 5824 | - RAIBAUD ET AL., ANNU. REV. GENET., (1984), vol. 18, page 173 | - CHANG ET AL., NATURE, (1977), vol. 198, page 1056 | - GOEDDEL ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1980), vol. 8, page 4057 | - YELVERTON ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, page 731 | - WEISSMANN, "The cloning of interferon and other mistakes.", WEISSMANN, I. GRESSER, Interferon, (1981), vol. 3 | - SHIMATAKE ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, page 128 | - AMANN ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 25, page 167 | - DE BOER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1983), vol. 80, page 21 | - STUDIER ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 189, page 113 | - TABOR ET AL., PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, page 1074 | - SHINE ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 254, page 34 | - NAGAI ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 309, page 810 | - JIA ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 60, page 197 | - ALLEN ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL., (1987), vol. 5, page 93 | - MAKOFF ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1989), vol. 135, page 11 | - MILLER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 7, page 698 | - GHRAYEB ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, page 2437 | - OKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, page 7212 | - PALVA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1982), vol. 79, page 5582 | - DAVIES ET AL., ANNU. REV. MICROBIOL., (1978), vol. 32, page 469 | - SHILLLITAKE ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, page 128 | - AMANN ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 40, page 183 | - POWELL ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 54, page 655 | - MASSON ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1989), vol. 60, page 273 | - MILLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, page 856 | - WANG ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1990), vol. 172, page 949 | - COHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1973), vol. 69, page 2110 | - DOWER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 6127 | - MANDEL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 53, page 159 | - TAKETO, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1988), vol. 949, page 318 | - CHASSY ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1987), vol. 44, page 173 | - FIEDLER ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM, (1988), vol. 170, page 38 | - AUGUSTIN ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1990), vol. 66, page 203 | - BARANY ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1980), vol. 144, page 698 | - PERRY ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1981), vol. 32, page 1295 | - SOMKUTI ET AL., PROC. 4TH EVR. CONG. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 1, page 412 | - MYANOHARA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 1 1 | - COHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 1078 | - HENIKOFF ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 283, page 835 | - HOLLENBERG ET AL., CURR. TOPICS MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., (1981), vol. 96, page 119 | - MERCERAU-PUIGALON ET AL., GENE, (1980), vol. 11, page 163 | - PANTHIER ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1980), vol. 2, page 109 | - BOTSTEIN ET AL., GENE, (1979), vol. 8, pages 17 - 24 | - BRAKE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 4642 - 4646 | - STINCHCOMB ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 158, page 157 | - ORR-WEAVER ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1983), vol. 101, pages 228 - 245 | - RINE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 6750 | - BUTT ET AL., MICROBIOL, REV., (1987), vol. 51, page 351 | - KURTZ ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 6, page 142 | - KUNZE ET AL., J. BASIC MICROBIOL., (1985), vol. 25, page 141 | - GLEESON ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1986), vol. 132, page 3459 | - ROGGENKAMP ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1986), vol. 202, page 302 | - DAS ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1984), vol. 158, page 1165 | - DE LOUVENCOURT ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), vol. 154, page 737 | - VAN DEN BERG ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 135 | - CREGG ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, page 3376 | - HINNEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, page 1929 | - ITO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), vol. 153, page 163 | - BEACH; NURSE, NATURE, (1981), vol. 300, page 706 | - DAVIDOW ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1985), vol. 10, page 380471 | - GAILLARDIN ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1985), vol. 10, page 49 | - DE LOUVENCOURT ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), vol. 154, page 1165 | - DAVIDOW ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1985), vol. 10, page 39 | - KOHBR; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 96 | - ROBINSON; TORRES, SEMINARS IN IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 9, pages 271 - 283 | - DONNELLY ET AL., ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 617 - 648 | - JOLLY, CANCER GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 51 - 64 | - KIMURA, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 845 - 852 | - CONNELLY, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 6, pages 185 - 193 | - KAPLITT, NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 6, pages 148 - 153 | - O'NEILL, J. VIROL., (1985), vol. 53, page 160 | - KELLY, J. VIROL., (1983), vol. 45, page 291 | - HARTLEY; ROWE, J VIROL, (1976), vol. 19, pages 19 - 25 | - VILE, CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 3860 - 3864 | - VILE, CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 962 - 967 | - RAM, CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 83 - 88 | - TAKAMIYA, J NEUROSCI RES, (1992), vol. 33, pages 493 - 503 | - BABA, J NEUROSURG, (1993), vol. 79, pages 729 - 735 | - MANN, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, page 153 | - CANE, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1984), vol. 81, page 6349 | - BERKNER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, page 616 | - ROSENFELD, SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, page 431 | - CURIEL, HUM. GENE THER., (1992), vol. 3, pages 147 - 154 | - NAHREINI, GENE, (1993), vol. 124, pages 257 - 262 | - SAMULSKI, J. VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, page 3096 | - SU, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 7, pages 463 - 470 | - GELLER, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 1667 - 1669 | - FINK, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 11 - 19 | - EVANS, NATURE, (1989), vol. 339, page 385 | - SABIN, J. BIOL. STANDARDIZATION, (1973), vol. 1, page 115 | - FISHER-HOCH, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1989), vol. 86, page 317 | - FLEXNER, ANN NY ACAD SCI, (1989), vol. 569, page 86 | - FLEXNER, VACCINE, (1990), vol. 8, page 17 | - MULLIGAN, NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, page 108 | - MADZAK, J GEN VIROL, (1992), vol. 73, page 1533 | - ENAMI, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1990), vol. 87, pages 3802 - 3805 | - ENAMI; PALESE, J VIROL, (1991), vol. 65, pages 2711 - 2713 | - LUYTJES, CELL, (1989), vol. 59, page 110 | - MCMICHAEL, NEJ MED, (1983), vol. 309, page 13 | - YAP, NATURE, (1978), vol. 273, page 238 | - NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, page 108 | - BUCHSCHACHER, J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, page 2731 | - HAMRE, PROC SOC EXP BIOL MED, (1966), vol. 121, page 190 | - CURIEL, HUM GENE THER, (1992), vol. 3, pages 147 - 154 | - WU, J BIOL CHEM, (1989), vol. 264, pages 16985 - 16987 | - PHILIP, MOL CELL BIOL, (1994), vol. 14, pages 2411 - 2418 | - WOFFENDIN, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1994), vol. 91, pages 1581 - 1585 | - WU; WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - HUCKED, BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, (1990), vol. 40, pages 253 - 263 | - PLANK, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (1992), vol. 3, pages 533 - 539 | - WOFFENDIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, no. 24, pages 11581 - 11585 | - STRYER, Biochemistry, W.H. FREEMAN, (1975), pages 236 - 240 | - SZOKA, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1980), vol. 600, page 1 | - BAYER, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1979), vol. 550, page 464 | - RIVNAY, METH ENZYMOL, (1987), vol. 149, page 119 | - WANG, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1987), vol. 84, page 7851 | - PLANT, ANAL BIOCHEM, (1989), vol. 176, page 420 | - HUG; SLEIGHT, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1991), vol. 1097, pages 1 - 17 | - STRAUBINGER, METH. ENZYMOL., (1983), vol. 101, pages 512 - 527 | - FELGNER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7416 | - MALONE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6077 - 6081 | - DEBS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 10189 - 10192 | - SZOKA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 4194 - 4198 | - STRAUBINGER, METH. IMMUNOL., (1983), vol. 101, pages 512 - 527 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1975), vol. 394, page 483 | - WILSON, CELL, (1979), vol. 17, page 77 | - DEAMER; BANGHAM, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1976), vol. 443, page 629 | - OSTRO, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1977), vol. 76, page 836 | - FRALEY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, page 3348 | - ENOCH; STRITTMATTER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, page 145 | - FRALEY, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, page 10431 | - SZOKA; PAPAHADJOPOULOS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, page 145 | - SCHAEFER-RIDDER, SCIENCE, (1982), vol. 215, page 166 | - BRESLOW, ANNU REV. BIOCHEM, (1985), vol. 54, page 699 | - LAW, ADV. EXP MED. BIOL., (1986), vol. 151, page 162 | - CHEN, JBIOL CHEM, (1986), vol. 261, page 12918 | - KANE, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 2465 | - UTERMANN, HUM GENET, (1984), vol. 65, page 232 | - METH. ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 128 | - PITAS, J. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 255, pages 5454 - 5460 | - MAHEY, J CLIN. INVEST, (1979), vol. 64, pages 743 - 750 | - ATKINSON, ANNU REV BIOPHYS CHEM, (1986), vol. 15, page 403 | - RADDING, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1958), vol. 30, page 443 | - MEINKOTH; WAHL, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 138, pages 267 - 284 | - MATTEUCCI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1981), vol. 103, page 3185 | - URDEA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 7461 | - AGRAWAL; IYER, CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1995), vol. 6, pages 12 - 19 | - AGRAWAL, TIBTECH, (1996), vol. 14, pages 376 - 387 | - COREY, TIBTECH, (1997), vol. 15, pages 224 - 229 | - BUCHARDT ET AL., TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 384 - 386 | - MULLIS ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 155, pages 335 - 350 | - AABERGE ET AL., MICROBIAL PATHOGENESIS, (1995), vol. 18, pages 141 - 152 | - BRICKER ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1999), vol. 172, page 131 | - DE SAIZIEU ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, page 4696 | - HAKENBECK ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, page 2477 | - WIZEMANN ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, page 1593 | - TETTELIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, page 498 | - DELCHER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 27, pages 4636 - 4641 | US19940240030 | US19940366787 | US19950405627 | US19950404796 | US19960679640 | US19960023867 | WO2001GB04789 |