EP2311885 - Production of carrageenan and carrageenan products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 1735 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, Albert, G. 109 Sweetbay Lane New Castle, DE 19720 / US | 02 /
LEDWITH, Linnea, K., S. 29 Beech Hill Road Rockport, ME 04856 / US | 03 /
KOPESKY, Robert 490 Molyneaux Road Camden, ME 04843 / US | 04 /
LYNCH, Maurice, Gerard 18 Avenue Henri Houssaya B-1410, Waterloo / BE | 05 /
BLAKEMORE, William, Ross 13 Garnet Drive Topsham, ME 04086 / US | 06 /
RILEY, Peter, J. 1003 Meridian Way Yardley, PA 19067 / US | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2011/16] | Application number, filing date | 10179971.6 | 10.12.2001 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | US20000255279P | 13.12.2000 Original published format: US 255279 P | US20010798012 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: US 798012 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311885 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/12 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C07H13/12 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
C08B37/0042 (EP,US);
A61K9/4816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Carrageenan und Carrageenanprodukte | [2011/16] | English: | Production of carrageenan and carrageenan products | [2011/16] | French: | Preparation de carragénan et de produits de carragénan | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 04.07.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01995410.6 / EP1351995 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010995410) is 04.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS4891256 ; | [X]WO9422922 (GRINDSTED PROD AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-17 * examples 14-17; claim - *; | US5502179 [ ] (LARSEN PETER F [DK]); | [X]JPS61254146 ; | [X]WO9422921 (GRINDSTED PROD AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-17 * examples 18-21; claim - *; | [X]WO9004333 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]) [X] 1-17 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 14 * * page 7, line 5 - line 33 * * page 8, line 17 - line 24 *; | [X]WO0006609 (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 17, line 15 - line 23 * * claim - *; | [XP]WO0166073 (SHEMBERG MARKETING CORP [PH], et al) [XP] 1-17 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 19 * * claim - *; | [X]WO0010538 (BANNER PHARMACAPS INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * claim - *; | [X]WO9840412 (TANVEST LIMITED [CA], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 5 - page 20, line 10; example -; claims 1-20 * | [X] - "Treating seaweed to enable utilisation of components - by crushing, adjusting water content and extruding", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1980, no. 17, Database accession no. 1980-30457C, XP002196719 & JPS4891256 A 19731128 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870403), vol. 011, no. 106, Database accession no. (C - 414), & JP61254146 A 19861111 (TADATOKI INOUE) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | by applicant | US5502179 | US5441753 | US6214376 | WO0103677 | US6268191 | US5662840 |