EP2434109 - Transmission device between two camshafts of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiat Powertrain Technologies S.p.A. Corso Settembrini 167 10135 Torino / IT | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'Epiro, Clino c/o Fiat Group Automobilies S.p.A. corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135, Torino / IT | 02 /
Capodiferro, Romeo c/o Fiat Automobiles S.p.A. corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [2015/02] |
Former [2012/13] | 01 /
D'Epiro, Clino c/o Fiat Group Automobilies S.p.A. corso Giovanni Agnelli 20 10135, Torino / IT | ||
02 /
Capodiferro, Romeo c/o Fiat Automobiles S.p.A. corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10180606.5 | 28.09.2010 | [2012/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2434109 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2434109 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/02, F01L1/10 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
F01L1/02 (EP,US);
F01L1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | Übertragungsvorrichtung zwischen zwei Nockenwellen eines Verbrennungsmotors | [2012/13] | English: | Transmission device between two camshafts of an internal combustion engine | [2012/13] | French: | Dispositif de transmission entre deux arbres à cames d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 01.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2010 | AL | 07.01.2015 | AT | 07.01.2015 | BE | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | GB | 28.09.2015 | IE | 28.09.2015 | LU | 28.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
GB | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
GB | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
GB | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
GB | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
GB | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1033458 (NSU WERKE AG) [A] 1-3,5 * column 1, line 1 - line 12 * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 3 * * figure - *; | [A]US2779321 (ALBERT RODER) [A] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 9 - line 14 * * figure - *; | [A]DE4006945 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * figure - *; | [A]DE3814544 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 3 * * figure - *; | [A]GB124042 (RICARDO HARRY RALPH [GB]) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 4 * * figure - *; | [A]GB216599 (FREDERICK WILLIAM LANCHESTER, et al) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 80 - line 101 * * figure - *; | [A]US2002033152 (HARA SEINOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 8-12 *; | [A]JPS6447904U (PATENTEE NOT RETRIEVABLE) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | GB713938 |