EP2301576 - Therapeutic use of Anti-CS1 Antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Biotherapeutics Inc. 1500 Seaport Boulevard Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2013/12] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Abbott Biotherapeutics Corp. 1500 Seaport Boulevard Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Abbott Biotherapeutics Corp. 1500 Seaport Boulevard Redwood City CA 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Marna 347 Ely Place Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Tso, J. Yun 445 Oak Grove Avenue, no. 16 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
Landolfi, Nicolas F. 240 Gloria Circle Palo Alto, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
Liu, Gao 1135 Phyllis Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Williams, Marna 347 Ely Place Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | ||
02 /
Tso, J. Jun 445 Oak Grove Avenue 16 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
03 /
Landolfi, Nicolas F. 240 Gloria Circle Palo Alto, CA 94025 / US | |||
04 /
Liu, Gao 1135 Phyllis Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Marc George, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Wilkinson, Marc George, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/38] | Broughton, Jon Philip avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane, Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2011/13] | Broughton, Jon Philip HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10180748.5 | 08.11.2004 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | US20040557621P | 29.03.2004 Original published format: US 557621 P | US20040557620P | 29.03.2004 Original published format: US 557620 P | US20040557622P | 29.03.2004 Original published format: US 557622 P | US20040842011 | 07.05.2004 Original published format: US 842011 | US20040982357 | 05.11.2004 Original published format: US 982357 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301576 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2301576 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/28, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, C12N5/20 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07K14/70503 (EP,US);
C07K16/2806 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Extension states | AL | 08.10.2010 | HR | 08.10.2010 | LT | 08.10.2010 | LV | 08.10.2010 | MK | 08.10.2010 | YU | 08.10.2010 | Title | German: | Therapeutische Verwendung von Anti-CS1-Antikörpern | [2011/13] | English: | Therapeutic use of Anti-CS1 Antibodies | [2011/13] | French: | Utilisation thérapeutique d'anticorps anti-CS1 | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 29.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04810631.4 / EP1729803 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040810631) is 25.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2014/09] |
Former [2013/52] | CY | 19.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO0146260 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [I] 1,13 * page 54, lines 1-31; example 5 * [A] 2-12,14-24; | [A]WO0222660 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * claims 20,28; sequence 741 *; | [IA]US2003113332 (MATHEW PORUNELLOR A [US], et al) [I] 1,13 * figure 7; example 2; claims 23,36 * [A] 2-12,14-24; | [A] - BOUCHON A ET AL, "CUTTING EDGE:ACTIVATION OF NK CELL-MEDIATED CYTOTOXICITY BY A SAP-INDEPENDENT RECEPTOR OF THE CD2 FAMILY", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WILLIAMS & WILKINS CO, US, (2001), vol. 167, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 5517 - 5521, XP008072681 [A] 1-24 * page 5517, column RIGHT, paragraphs 2,4 * * page 5519, column LEFT, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * | [T] - RICE ET AL, "Eradication of Tumors in Pre-Clinical Models of Multiple Myeloma by Anti-CS1 Monoclonal Antibody HuLuc63: Mechanism of Action Studies.", BLOOD, ASH ANNUAL MEETING ABSTRACTS 2006, vol. 8, no. 11, (200611), page 1, URL: http://www.abstracts2view.com/hem4806/view.php?nu=HEM06L1_1177, (20070420), XP002430427 [T] 1-24 * abstract * | [T] - HSI ET AL, "CS1: A Potential New Therapeutic Target for the Treatment of Multiple Myeloma.", BLOOD, ASH ANNUAL MEETING ABSTRACTS 2006, vol. 108, no. 11, (20061116), page 1, URL: http://www.abstracts2view.com/hem4806/view.php?nu=HEM06L1_954&terms=, (20070419), XP002430428 [T] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2006-04-016253 | [A] - MURPHY JOHN J ET AL, "Studies on a novel human immunoglobulin superfamily member (19A) with structural similarity to CD2", IMMUNOLOGY, & ANNUAL CONGRESS OF THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR IMMUNOLOGY; HARROGATE, UK; DECEMBER 05-08, 2000, (200012), vol. 101, no. Supplement 1, ISSN 0019-2805, page 89, XP008078069 [A] 1-24 * abstract * | by applicant | US4179337 | US4301144 | US4469863 | US4496689 | US4634664 | US4634666 | US4640835 | US4670417 | WO8705330 | US4791192 | US4946778 | US5004692 | US5034506 | WO9110741 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | US5216141 | WO9312227 | US5235033 | US5386023 | US5445934 | WO9525116 | WO9535505 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5585089 | US5602240 | US5637684 | US5644048 | US5677427 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5700637 | US5969108 | US6120767 | WO0055627 | US6150584 | US6180370 | US6329508 | WO0200729 | US2003113332 | WO2004029207 | US6737056 | US2004132101 | - NI, J. ET AL., "Immunological abnormality in C3H/HeJ mice with heritable inflammatory bowel disease", CELL IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 169, pages 7 - 15 | - OGURA, Y. ET AL., "A frameshift mutation in NOD2 associated with susceptibility to Crohn's Disease", NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 603 - 606 | - RUIZ-ARUGELLES GJ; SAN MIGUEL JF, "Cell Surface Markers in Multiple Myeloma", MAYO CLIN. PROC., (1994), vol. 69, pages 684 - 90 | - LEO R ET AL., "Multiparameter analysis of normal and malignant human plasma cells", ANN. HEMATOL., (1992), vol. 64, pages 132 - 9 | - TRICOT G ET AL., "Poor prognosis in Multiple Myeloma", BLOOD, (1995), vol. 86, pages 4250 - 2 | - BOLES; MATHEW, IMMUNOGENETICS, (2001), vol. 52, pages 302 - 307 | - BOUCHON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 167, pages 5517 - 5521 | - MURPHY ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2002), vol. 361, pages 431 - 436 | - IMMUNOGENETICS, (2001), vol. 52, pages 302 - 307 | - BOUCHON, A. ET AL., J. OF IMMUNO., (2001), pages 5517 - 5521 | - MURPHY, J. ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2002), vol. 361, pages 431 - 436 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NAT'1. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1977), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 919 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NAT'1. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1993), vol. 49, pages 1925 - 1963 | - LETSINGER, J. ORG. CHEM., (1970), vol. 35, pages 3800 - 3803 | - SPRINZL ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1977), vol. 81, pages 579 - 589 | - LETSINGER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, pages 3487 - 499 | - SAWAI ET AL., CHEM. LETT., (1984), page 805 | - LETSINGER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1988), vol. 110, pages 4470 - 4471 | - PAUWELS ET AL., CHEMICA SCRIPTA, (1986), vol. 26, pages 141 - 149 | - MAG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 1437 - 441 | - BRILL ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, pages 2321 - 2322 | - EGHOLM, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 114, pages 1895 - 1897 | - MEIER ET AL., CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1992), vol. 31, pages 1008 - 1010 | - NIELSEN, NATURE, (1993), vol. 365, pages 566 - 568 | - CARLSSON ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 380, page 207 | - DENPCY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 6097 - 101 | - KIEDROWSKI ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INTL. ED. ENGLISH, (1991), vol. 30, pages 423 - 426 | - LETSINGER ET AL., NUCLEOSIDE AND NUCLEOTIDE, (1994), vol. 13, page 1597 | - MESMAEKER ET AL., BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEM. LETT., (1994), vol. 4, pages 395 - 398 | - JEFFS ET AL., J. BIOMOLECULAR NMR, (1994), vol. 34, page 17 | - HORN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1996), vol. 37, page 743 | - JENKINS ET AL., CHEM. SOC. REV., (1995), pages 169 - 176 | - C&E NEWS, (19970602), page 35 | - HUNTER ET AL., NATURE, (1962), vol. 144, page 945 | - DAVID ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 13, pages 1014 - 1021 | - PAIN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1981), vol. 40, pages 219 - 230 | - NYGREN, J. HISTOCHEM. AND CYTOCHEM, (1982), vol. 30, pages 407 - 412 | - "Overview of principles of hybridization and the strategy of nucleic acid assays", TIJSSEN, Hybridization with Nucleic Probes, ELSEVIER, (1993), vol. 24 | - FRESHNEY, Culture of Animal Cells a Manual of Basic Technique(2d ed.), WILEY-LISS, (1994), pages 231 - 241 | - LANZAVECCHIA ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 17, page 105 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUNKAPILLER; HOOD, NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, pages 15 - 16 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - MARKS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - BATEMAN A. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 260 - 2 | - CARTER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 13, page 4331 | - OESTBERG ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1983), vol. 2, pages 361 - 367 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - COIA G ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS 1, (2001), vol. 254, no. 1-2, pages 191 - 7 | - HANES J. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 1287 - 92 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (1998), vol. 95, no. 24, pages 14130 - 5 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (1997), vol. 94, no. 10, pages 4937 - 42 | - YEUNG ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2002), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 212 - 20 | - BOEDER, E. T. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 553 - 7 | - BYERS, B. S. ET AL., SEMINARS CELL BIOL, (1991), vol. 2, pages 59 - 70 | - FANGER, M. W. ET AL., IMMUNOL TODAY, (1991), vol. 12, pages 51 - 54 | - LEFKOVITS AND PERNIS,, Immunological Methods, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1979), vol. I, II | - 1994, PIERCE CHEMICAL COMPANY CATALOG, TECHNICAL SECTION ON CROSS-LINKERS, (1994), pages 155 - 200 | - WU; WALLACE, GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 560 - 569 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 1077 - 1080 | - BARRINGER ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 89, pages 117 - 122 | - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878 | - KITAMURA ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 9146 - 9150 | - CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structure and Molecular Properties, FREEMAN, (1992), pages 79 - 86 | - APLIN; WRISTON, CRC CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM, (1981), pages 259 - 306 | - SOJAR; BAHL, ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1987), vol. 259, pages 52 - 57 | - EDGE ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 118, pages 131 - 137 | - THOTAKURA ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 138, pages 350 - 359 | - FIELD ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, pages 2159 - 2165 | - EVAN ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1985), vol. 5, pages 3610 - 3616 | - PABORSKY ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1990), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 547 - 553 | - HOPP ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1204 - 1210 | - MARTIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 192 - 194 | - SKINNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 15163 - 15166 | - LUTZ-FREYERMUTH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6393 - 6397 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103 | - SHIELDS, R.L. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 26733 - 26740 | - SHINKAWA, T. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, page 3466 | - SHIELDS, R.L. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604 | - PRESTA ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC. TRANS., (2002), vol. 30, pages 487 - 490 | - LOCKHART, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 1675 - 1680 | - ASAI, ET AL., Methods in Cell Biology: Antibodies in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), vol. 37 | - CAPECCHI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1288 - 1292 | - MORRIS GP ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1989), vol. 96, pages 795 - 803 | - BOUGHTON-SMITH NK, BR. J. PHANNACOL., (1988), vol. 94, pages 65 - 72 | - GRISHAM MB ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1991), vol. 101, pages 540 - 547 | - YAMADA Y ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1992), vol. 102, pages 524 - 534 | - TORRES MI ET AL., DIG. DIS. SCI, (1999), vol. 44, pages 2523 - 29 | - NERUATH M; FUSS I; STROBER W, INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 19, pages 51 - 62 | - HOFFINAN P ET AL., GUT, (1997), vol. 41, pages 195 - 202 | - JACOBSON K; MCHUGH K; COLLINS SM, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1997), vol. 112, pages 156 - 62 | - HAMMER RE ET AL., "Spontaneous inflammatory disease in transgenic rats expressing HLA-B27 and Human b2M: An animal model of HLA-B27 associated human disorders", CELL, (1990), vol. 63, pages 1088 - 1112 | - BAUMGART DC ET AL., "Mechansisms of intestinal epithelial cell injury and colitis in interleukin 2 deficient mice", CELL IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 187, pages 52 - 66 | - PANWALA CM ET AL., "A Novel Model of Inflammatory Bowel Disease: Mice deficient for the multiple drug resistance gene, mdrla, spontaneously develop colitis", J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, pages 5733 - 44 | - SARTOR RB, ALIMENT. PHARMACOL. THER., (1997), pages 1189 - 96 | - SHANG-YI H. ET AL., AMER. J. INVEST. PATHOL., (2004), vol. 164, pages 747 - 756 | - UNKELESS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1974), vol. 249, pages 4295 - 4305 | - STRICKLAND; BEERS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1976), vol. 251, pages 5694 - 5702 | - WHUR ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1980), vol. 42, pages 305 - 312 | - "Angiogenesis, tumor vascularization, and potential interference with tumor growth", GULLINO, Biological Responses in Cancer, PLENUM, (1985), pages 178 - 184 | - FRESHNEY, CANCER RES., (1985), vol. 5, pages 111 - 130 | - LAZEBNIK ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 371, page 346 | - HENSHALL ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 63, pages 4196 - 4203 | - HENSHALL ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 6005 - 12 | - GLYNNE ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 403, pages 672 - 676 | - ZHAO ET AL., GENES DEV., (2000), vol. 14, pages 981 - 993 | - QUEEN, C. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033 | - LEVITT, M., J. MOL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 168, pages 595 - 620 | - CUISINIER ET AL., EUR. J. IMM., (1993), vol. 23, pages 110 - 118 | - RAVETCH, J.V ET AL., CELL, (1981), vol. 27, pages 583 - 591 | - MANHEIMER-LORY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 174, pages 1639 - 1652 | - STEMMER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 164, pages 49 - 53 | - COLE, M.S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 159, pages 3613 - 3621 | - CO, M.S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1149 - 1154 | - TOVAR ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (2002), vol. 54, pages 394 - 402 | - XU ET AL., CELL IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 200, pages 16 - 26 | WO1997US01019 | WO1997US01048 | WO2000US34963 |