EP2261426 - Construction machine management system, and Construction machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Construction Machinery Tsuchiura Works, 650 Kandastumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-013 / JP | 02 /
Hirata, Toichi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Construction Machinery Tsuchiura Works, 650 Kandastumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Genroku c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 05 /
Shibata, Koichi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 06 /
Komatsu, Hideki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Adachi, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Construction Machinery Tsuchiura Works, 650 Kandastumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-013 / JP | ||
02 /
Hirata, Toichi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Construction Machinery Tsuchiura Works, 650 Kandastumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
Sugiyama, Genroku c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
04 /
Watanabe, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
05 /
Shibata, Koichi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
06 /
Komatsu, Hideki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Adachi, Hiroyuki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-013 / JP | ||
02 /
Hirata, Toichi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
Sugiyama, Genroku c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
04 /
Watanabe, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
05 /
Shibata, Koichi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
06 /
Komatsu, Hideki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Hitachi Constructi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10180864.0 | 30.03.2001 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000099086 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000099086 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2261426 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261426 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
G08G1/20 (EP,US);
E02F9/20 (KR);
E02F9/2045 (EP,US);
E02F9/26 (EP,US);
E02F9/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2010/50] | Title | German: | Baumaschinenverwaltungssystem und Baumaschine | [2010/50] | English: | Construction machine management system, and Construction machine | [2010/50] | French: | Système de gestion de machine de construction et machine de construction | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01917741.9 / EP1273721 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010917741) is 23.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.04.2013 | [2014/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH08144312 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [I] 1-8 * abstract *; | [I]WO9836337 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10308983 (NIPPON JOHO TSUSHIN CONSULTING) [A] 8* abstract *; | [X]EP0989525 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH04174387 | JPH04174388 |