EP2290987 - picture decoding apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagai, Makoto c/o PanasonicCorporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Kadono, Shinya c/o PanasonicCorporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/08] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Hagai, Makoto c/o PanasonicCorporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Kadono, Shinya c/o PanasonicCorporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180875.6 | 11.09.2002 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | JP20010276280 | 12.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001276280 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290987 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290987 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/32, H04N7/30, H04N7/36, H04N7/26 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
H04N19/86 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/137 (KR);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/156 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,US);
H04N19/162 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/174 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/527 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/82 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Bilddekodierungsverfahren und Bilddekodiervorrichtung | [2011/09] | English: | picture decoding apparatus and method | [2011/09] | French: | procédé et dispositif de decodage d'image | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 23.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02763018.5 / EP1387585 | EP04027152.0 / EP1515567 | EP06011479.0 / EP1694076 | EP09174234.6 / EP2164267 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020763018) is 08.04.2004 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.02.2013 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | IT | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | IE | 11.09.2013 | LU | 11.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 20.02.2013 | |
BG | 20.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63309082 ; | [A]JPH03136586 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0638197 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0047] - [0053] - [0076] - [0083] - [0100] - [0101] *; | [A]EP0603878 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 34 - column 8, line 26 * * column 10, line 46 - column 17, line 58 * * column 30, line 22 - line 34 *; | [A]US6249610 (MATSUMOTO TAISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, lines 35-54 ** column 6, lines 3-41 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890412), vol. 013, no. 150, Database accession no. (E - 742), & JP63309082 A 19881216 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |