EP2263899 - Drive unit for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GETRAG Getriebe- und Zahnradfabrik Hermann Hagenmeyer GmbH & Cie KG Hermann-Hagenmeyer-Strasse 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoblauch, Daniel Lohsteige 11 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | 02 /
Knödel, Ulrich Heckenstrasse 25 74379 Ingersheim / DE | 03 /
Stammberger, Marc Untere Strasse 6 75438 Knittlingen / DE | [2014/12] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Knoblauch, Daniel Lohsteige 11 74199, Untergruppenbach / DE | ||
02 /
Knödel, Ulrich Heckenstrasse 25 74379, Ingersheim / DE | |||
03 /
Stammberger, Marc Untere Strasse 6 75438, Knittlingen / DE | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/34] |
Former [2010/51] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181133.9 | 03.05.2006 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | DE20051022926 | 13.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005022926 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2263899 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2263899 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2263899 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/00, B60K17/08, B60K17/16, F16H57/02, F16H57/04, F16H63/34 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
B60K1/00 (EP);
B60K17/08 (EP);
B60K17/16 (EP);
F16H57/02 (EP);
F16H57/037 (EP);
F16H57/0427 (EP);
F16H2057/02034 (EP);
F16H2057/02043 (EP);
F16H2057/02086 (EP);
F16H2057/02091 (EP);
F16H2200/0034 (EP);
F16H48/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | B60K1/00, B60K17/08, B60K17/16, F16H57/02, F16H57/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2010/51] | Title | German: | Antriebseinheit für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2010/51] | English: | Drive unit for a motor vehicle | [2010/51] | French: | Unité d'entraînement pour un véhicule automobile | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 26.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06753471.9 / EP1879763 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060753471) is 07.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE4305055 (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT]) [YD] 1,2,6,9-12 * column 3, lines 22-30; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0631070 (RENAULT [FR]) [Y] 1,2,6,9-12 * column 4, lines 15-20; figure - *; | [Y]JPH07139628 (AICHI MACHINE IND, et al) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [YA]DE10021177 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 3, lines 24-65; figure 1 * [A] 1-4,7,8; | [YA]US5637048 (MAEDA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 12 * column 2, line 37 - column 5, line 63; figures 1-7 * [A] 1; | [A]JP2002039380 (AICHI MACHINE IND) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP1035358 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0014] , [0022] , [0023]; figure - * | by applicant | DE4305055 | DE4212324 | DE19917724 |