EP2264218 - CVD precursors for silicon containing films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/51] | Precursors for cvd silicon carbo-nitride films | ||
[2012/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xiao, Manchao 5534 Caballos Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
Hochberg, Arthur Kenneth 1037 Santa Queta Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2012/46] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Xiao, Manchao 5534 Caballos Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
Hochberg, Arthur Kenneth 1037 Santa Queta Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | Representative(s) | Muir, Benjamin M. J. Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Muir, Benjamin M. J. Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2010/51] | Muir, Benjamin M. J. Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10181347.5 | 11.05.2006 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | US20050129862 | 16.05.2005 Original published format: US 129862 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264218 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2264218 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/36, C07F7/02, H01L21/02 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
C07F7/025 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02219 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02211 (US);
C09D5/00 (US);
C23C16/36 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02167 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02222 (US);
H01L21/02271 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02274 (US);
H01L21/0228 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | C23C16/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Vorläufer für CVD-Siliziumenthaltenden-Schichten | [2012/30] | English: | CVD precursors for silicon containing films | [2012/30] | French: | Précurseurs CVD pour films à base de silicium | [2012/30] |
Former [2010/51] | Vorläufer für CVD-Siliziumcarbonitrid-Schichten | ||
Former [2010/51] | Precursors for cvd silicon carbo-nitride films | ||
Former [2010/51] | Précurseurs pour films en carbonitrure de silicium au CVD | Examination procedure | 09.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06252488.9 / EP1724373 | EP09161603.7 / EP2110459 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060252488) is 05.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2006 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | LU | 11.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 11.05.2006 | |
AT | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
LU | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPH06132284 ; | [X]EP1149934 (ASM JAPAN [JP]) [X] 1,10 * page 3, paragraphs 11,15; table 1 * * page 4, paragraph 16 * * page 5, paragraphs 29,30 * * page 6, paragraph 32 * * page 8, paragraph 43 * * page 9, paragraph 52 *; | [X]WO02065508 (ASM INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * page 4, paragraphs 14,17 * * page 5, paragraph 21 - page 6, paragraph 23 *; | [XP]WO2005093126 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [XP] 1,10-15 * page 7, lines 3-16 * * page 9, paragraph 6 * * page 9, paragraph 6 ** page 12, lines 21-29 *; | [XP]WO2006036538 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,8 * page 6, paragraph 17; claim 6 *; | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940805), vol. 018, no. 419, Database accession no. (E - 1589), & JP06132284 A 19940513 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [XD] 1-3,7,8,11-15 * abstract * | [X] - SCHMIDBAUR, HUBERT; SCHUH, HEINZ, "Differences in reactivity of 1,4-disilabutane and n-tetrasilane towards secondary amines", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR NATURFORSCHUNG B: CHEMICAL SCIENCES, (1990), vol. 45, no. 12, pages 1679 - 1683, XP009071468 [X] 1-3,7,8,11-15 * page 1682, column R, paragraph 5 * * page 1679, column L, paragraph 1 * | [X] - AYLETT, BERNARD J.; EMSLEY, JOHN, "N-silyl derivatives of cyclic secondary amines", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY A: INORGANIC, PHYSICAL, THEORETICAL, London, UK, (1967), vol. 12, pages 1918 - 1921, XP009071485 [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * | [X] - MITZEL, NORBERT W., "Simple silylhydrazines as models for Si-N .beta.-donor interactions in SiNN units", CHEMISTRY--A EUROPEAN JOURNAL , 4(4), 692-698 CODEN: CEUJED; ISSN: 0947-6539, (1998), XP002396294 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3765(19980416)4:4<692::AID-CHEM692>3.0.CO;2-0 | [X] - ANDERSON, DAVID G.; RANKIN, DAVID W. H., "Isopropyldisilylamine and disisyl-tert-butylamine: preparation, spectroscopic properties, and molecular structure in the gas phase, determined by electron diffraction", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS: INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 5, pages 779 - 783, XP009071483 [X] 1-3,7,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5234869 | JPH06132284 | US5874368 | US6153261 | US6391803 | - GARY E. MCGUIRE,, Process technology handbook, NOYES PUBLICATION, (1988), pages 289 - 301 | - WOLF; STANLEY; TALBERT; RICHARD N., Silicon Processing for the VLSI ERA, LATTICE PRESS, (1990), pages 20 - 22,327-3 | - A. K. HOCHBERG; D. L. O'MEARA, "Diethylsilane as a Silicon Source for the Deposition of Silicon Nitride and Silicon Oxynitride Films By LPCVD", MAT. RES. SOC. SYMP. PROC, (1991), vol. 204, pages 509 - 514 | - SORITA ET AL., "Mass Spectrometric and Kinetic Study of Low-Pressure Chemical Vapor Deposition of Si3N4 Thin Films From SiH2CI2 and NH3", J. ELECTRO. CHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 141, no. 12, pages 3505 - 3511 | - AYLETT; EMSLEY, "The Preparation and Properties of Dimethylamino and Diethylamino Silane", J. CHEM. SOC., (1967), vol. A, pages 652 - 655 | - ANDERSON; RANKIN, "Isopropyldisilylamine and Disilyl-t-butylamine: Preparation, Spectroscopic Properties, and Molecular Structure in the Gas Phase, Determined by Electron Diffraction", J. CHEM. SOC. DALTON TRANS., (1989), pages 779 - 783 |