EP2306201 - Methods and compositions for assaying homocysteine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ATOMICS 3550 General Atomics Court San Diego, CA 92121-1194 / US | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yuan, Chong-Sheng 11404 Arabian Crest Rd. San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
Datta, Abhijit 6426 La Garza Court Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 03 /
Dou, Chao 5773 Concord Woods Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2014/41] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Yuan, Chong-Sheng 11404 Arabian Crest Rd. San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
Datta, Abhijit 6426 La Garza Court Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
03 /
Dou, Chao 5773 Concord Woods Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Yuan, Chong-Sheng 3590 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92009 / US | ||
02 /
Datta, Abhijit 6426 La Garza Court Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
03 /
Dou, Chao 5773 Concord Woods Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2011/14] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181606.4 | 09.07.2004 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | US20030486865P | 10.07.2003 Original published format: US 486865 P | US20040801623 | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 801623 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306201 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2306201 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/34, C12Q1/48, G01N33/68 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
C12Q1/48 (EP,US);
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
G01N33/6815 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/14] | G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzung zum Bestimmen von Homocystein | [2011/14] | English: | Methods and compositions for assaying homocysteine | [2011/14] | French: | Procede et kit pour la detection d'homocysteine | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04777969.9 / EP1644741 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040777969) is 27.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2004 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | GR | 09.01.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 09.07.2004 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | NL | 08.10.2014 | |
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0040973 (AXIS SHIELD ASA [NO], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 9, paragraph 3; claims 1,13 *; | [A]WO0077244 (UNIV VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO0102600 (GEN ATOMICS [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]US2002123088 (MATSUYAMA NAOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 6; claims 4-6,12-16 *; | [A]WO03040694 (CATCH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5* claims 5,13,71 * | by applicant | US5631127 | US5827645 | US5854023 | US5861294 | US5885767 | US5958717 | US5998191 | US6046017 | US6063581 | US6174696 | US6376210 | US6436658 | US2002119507 | WO03060478 | US6664073 | US6686172 | - FRANTZEN ET AL., "Enzyme Conversion Immunoassay for Determining Total Homocysteine in Plasma or Serum", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 311 - 316 | - REFSUM ET AL., ANNU. REV. MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 49, pages 31 - 62 | - BAUAL ET AL., CLEVELAND CLINIC JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 64, pages 543 - 549 | - FOODY ET AL., CLINICIAN REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 8, pages 203 - 210 | - "Homocysteine: Selected aspects", PERRY T., Heritable disorders of amino acid metabolism., JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1974), pages 419 - 451 | - "The etiology of neural tube defects", SCOTT ET AL., Homocysteine metabolism: from basic science to clinical medicine, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1995), pages 133 - 136 | - BOUSHEY ET AL., JAMA, (1995), vol. 274, pages 1049 - 1057 | - MOGHADASIAN ET AL., ARCH. INTERN. MED., (1997), vol. 157, pages 2299 - 2307 | - BOERS ET AL., J INHER. METAB. DIS., (1997), vol. 20, pages 301 - 306 | - UELAND ET AL., J LAB. CLIN. MED., (1989), vol. 114, pages 473 - 501 | - JACOBSEN ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1998), vol. 44, pages 2238 - 2239 | - DUCLOUX ET AL., NEPHROL. DIAL. TRANSPLANTL, (1998), vol. 13, pages 2890 - 2893 | - DIAZ-ARRASTIA ET AL., ARCH. NEUROL., (1998), vol. 55, pages 1407 - 1408 | - HORNBERGER ET AL., AMERICAN J OF PUBLIC HEALTH, (1998), vol. 88, pages 61 - 67 | - MANSOOR ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 200, pages 218 - 229 | - STEIR ET AL., ARCH. INTERN. MED., (1998), vol. 158, pages 1301 - 1306 | - UELAND ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1993), vol. 39, pages 1764 - 1779 0 | - "Plasma homocysteine and cardiovascular disease", UELAND ET AL., Atherosclerotic Cardiovascular Disease, Hemostasis, and Endothelial Function, MARCEL DOKKER, (1992), pages 183 - 236 | - STEHOUWER ET AL., KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (1999), pages 55308 - 314 | - ARAKI ET AL., J. CHROMATOG., (1987), vol. 422, pages 43 - 52 | - STABLER ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1988), vol. 81, pages 466 - 474 | - MATSUYAMA ET AL., CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 47, pages 2155 - 2156 | - TAN ET AL., CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 49, pages 1029 - 1030 | - SHAPIRO; STANLEY K, METHODS ENZYMOL. 17 PT.B, SULFUR AMINO ACIDS, (1971), pages 400 - 405 | - SHAPIRO SK, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1958), vol. 29, pages 405 - 9 | - THANBICHLER ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1999), vol. 181, no. 2, pages 662 - 5 | - SHAPIRO ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1964), vol. 239, no. 5, pages 1551 - 6 | - THOMAS ET AL., JBIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, no. 52, pages 40718 - 24 | - COULTER-KARIS; HERSHFIELD, ANN. HUIN. GENET., (1989), vol. 53 2, pages 169 - 175 | - LAI ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1997), vol. M5, pages 2413 - 24 | - CORNELL; RISCOE, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1998), vol. 1396, no. 1, pages 8 - 14 | - SAKSELA; RAIVIO, BIOCHEM. J., (1996), vol. 315, no. 1, pages 235 - 9 | - MCNALLY ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1997), vol. 231, pages 645 - 650 | - SINGH ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 241, pages 564 - 571 | - PEREZ-DE LA MORA ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 180, no. 2, pages 248 - 52 | - GORE, INT. J. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 13, no. 8, pages 879 - 86 | - JOCELYN, METHODS OF ENZYMOLOGY, (1987), vol. 143, pages 243 - 256 |