EP2295413 - Indazole compounds useful as protein kinase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binch, Hayley 2 Orchard Way, Harwell Oxon, OX11 0L Q / GB | 02 /
Brenchley, Guy 12 Boucher Close, Grove Wantage Oxon, OX12 0NE / GB | 03 /
Golec, Julian, M., C. Garden House Woolstone Faringdon, OX SN7 7QL / GB | 04 /
Knegtel, Ronald 92 Andersey Way, Abingdon Oxon Northwest, OX145 / GB | 05 /
Mortimore, Michael Walrus House, 156 The Hill Burford, Oxfordshire OX18 4QY / GB | 06 /
Patel, Sanjay 2 Alder Close, Abingdon Oxon, OX14 1YG / GB | 07 /
Rutherford, Alistair 11 Reade Avenue Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 34E / GB | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Binch, Hayley 2 Orchard Way, Harwell Oxon, OX11 0L Q / GB | ||
02 /
Brenchley, Guy 12 Boucher Close, Grove Wantage Oxon, OX12 0NE / GB | |||
03 /
Golec, Julian, M., C. 8 Manor Farm, Chapel Road, Ashbury Swindon, Wiltshire SN6 8LS / GB | |||
04 /
Knegtel, Ronald 92 Andersey Way, Abingdon Oxon Northwest, OX145 / GB | |||
05 /
Mortimore, Michael Walrus House, 156 The Hill Burford, Oxfordshire OX18 4QY / GB | |||
06 /
Patel, Sanjay 2 Alder Close, Abingdon Oxon, OX14 1YG / GB | |||
07 /
Rutherford, Alistair 11 Reade Avenue Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 34E / GB | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181668.4 | 23.01.2003 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US20020351597P | 25.01.2002 Original published format: US 351597 P | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295413 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/56, C07D401/12, A61K31/416, C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D413/12, C07D409/12, C07D417/12, A61P35/00 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/416 (KR);
A61K31/4162 (KR);
A61K31/53 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D231/56 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | Indazolverbindungen als Proteinkinasehemmer | [2011/11] | English: | Indazole compounds useful as protein kinase inhibitors | [2011/11] | French: | Composés d'indazole utiles en tant qu'inhibiteurs de protéines kinases | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 23.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 18.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03708869.7 / EP1467972 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030708869) is 11.09.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 29.09.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 29.09.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 29.09.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 29.09.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 29.09.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2011 | 31.01.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0156988 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,14-18 * example -; claims 1,4,5 *; | [XP]EP1256574 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP]); | [X]WO0185719 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,14-17 * example 11; claim - *; | [XP]WO02083648 (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-12,14-18 * example -; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO0210137 | JPS50130759B | US6099562 | US5886026 | US5304121 | - KHWAJA, A., NATURE, (1999), vol. 401, pages 33 - 34 | - YUAN, Z.Q. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 2324 - 2330 | - NAMIKAWA, K. ET AL., J NEUROSCI., (2000), vol. 20, pages 2875 - 2886 | - CHENG, J.Q., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 9267 - 9271 | - BRODBECK, D. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, pages 9133 - 9136 | - KULIK ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 17, pages 1595 - 1606 | - HEMMINGS, B.A., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 275, pages 628 - 630 | - CALERA, M.R. ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 7201 - 7204 | - ALESSI, D.R. ET AL., CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEV., (1998), vol. 8, pages 55 - 62 | - CHENG, J.Q. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1992), vol. 89, pages 9267 - 9271 | - CHENG, J. Q. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1996), vol. 93, pages 3636 - 3641 | - BELLACOSA ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 64, pages 280 - 285 | - BEEBE, S.J., SEMIN. CANCER BIOL., (1994), vol. 5, pages 285 - 294 | - MCKNIGHT, G.S. ET AL., RECENT PROG. HORM. RES., (1988), vol. 44, page 307 | - BEEBE, S.J. ET AL., J. BIOI. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 25505 - 25512 | - BECKER, D. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1990), vol. 5, page 1133 | - ISHIZAKI, T. ET AL., EMBO J, (1996), vol. 15, pages 1885 - 1893 | - CHITALEY ET AL., CURR. HYPERTENS. REP., (200104), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 139 - 144 | - UEHATA, M. ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 990 - 994 | - CHITALEY, K. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2001), vol. 7, pages 119 - 122 | - UCHIDA, S. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2000), vol. 269, no. 2, pages 633 - 40 | - BITO, H. ET AL., NEURON, (2000), vol. 26, pages 431 - 441 | - TAKAMURA, M. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 33, pages 577 - 581 | - GENDA, T. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1999), vol. 30, pages 1027 - 1036 | - RAO ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (2001), vol. 42, pages 1029 - 37 | - ISHIZUKA, T. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 167, pages 2298 - 2304 | - SMIMOKAWA ET AL., ARTERIOSCLER. THROMB. VASC. BIOL., (2000), vol. 11, pages 2351 - 2358 | - LOU, Z. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 167, pages 5749 - 5757 | - SEAHOLTZ ET AL., CIRC. RES., (1999), vol. 84, pages 1186 - 1193 | - YOSHII ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CELL MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 20, pages 1190 - 1200 | - KUWAHARA, K. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1999), vol. 452, pages 314 - 318 | - VOLAREVIC, S. ET AL., PROG. NUCLEIC ACID RES. MOL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 65, pages 101 - 186 | - COFFER, P.J. ET AL., BIOEHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (1994), vol. 198, no. 7, pages 780 - 786 | - KUO, C.J. ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 358, pages 70 - 73 | - ALESSI, D.R., CURR. BIOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 69 - 81 | - ALESSI, D. ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC. TRANS, (2001), vol. 29, page 1 | - AVRUCH, J. ET AL., PROG. MOL SUBCELL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 26, page 115 | - FRöDIN, M. ET AL., EMBO J., (2000), vol. 19, pages 2924 - 2934 | - LAWLOR, M.A. ET AL., J. CELL SCI., (2001), vol. 114, pages 2903 - 2910 | - LAWLOR, M.A. ET AL., EMBO J., (2002), vol. 21, pages 3728 - 3738 | - BELHAM, C. ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (1999), vol. 9, pages R93 - R96 | - GRAFF, J.R., EXPERT OPIN, THER. TARGETS, (2002), vol. 6, pages 103 - 113 | - BROGNARD, J. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, pages 3986 - 3997 | - FLYNN, P. ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 1439 - 1442 | - HANAHAN, D. ET AL., CELL, (2000), vol. 100, pages 57 - 70 | - TENG, D.H. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 5221 - 5225 | - CHENG, J.Q. ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 93, pages 3636 - 3641 | - INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 64, page 280 | - GRAFF, J.R., EXPERT OPIN. THER. TARGETS, (2002), vol. 6, pages 103 - 113 | - AM. J. PATHOL., (2001), vol. 159, page 431 | - CHENG, J.Q. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI., (1996), vol. 93, pages 3636 - 3641 | - NEOPLASIA, (2001), vol. 3, page 278 | - HAYAKAWA, J. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 5988 - 5994 | - MOL. CANCER THER., (2002), vol. 1, page 707 | - ARICO, S. ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 27613 - 27621 | - ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2001), vol. 142, page 4795 | - THAKKAR, H. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 38361 - 38369 | - CHEN, X. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, pages 6073 - 6083 | - HENKE ET AL., J. MED CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, page 2706 | - BELLAMY ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1984), vol. 25, page 839 | - BOYER ET AL., J CHEM. RES. MINIPRINT, (1990), vol. 11, page 2601 | - PAMELL ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., (1959), page 2363 | - HERNANDEZ ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1995), vol. 60, page 2683 | - DAVIES ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1988), vol. 53, page 2087 | - BENCHIDIMI ET AL., J HET. CHEM., (1979), vol. 16, page 1599 | - PRAGER ET AL., AUST. J. CHEM., (1997), vol. 50, page 813 | - PFANNSTIEL, K., BER1942, vol. 75B, page 1096 | - VICENTE, J ET AL., HETEROCYCLES, (1997), vol. 45, no. 1, page 129 | - FOX ET AL., PROTEIN SCI., (1998), vol. 7, page 2249 | - PITT; LEE, J. BIOMOL. SCREEN., (1996), vol. 1, page 47 | - FOX ET AL., PROTEIN SCI, (1998), vol. 7, page 2249 |