EP2267150 - Oxidizable species as an internal reference in control solutions for biosensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ascensia Diabetes Care Holdings AG Peter-Merian Strasse 90 4052 Basel / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, NJ 07981-0915 / US | ||
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Bayer Healthcare LLC Diabetes Care 555 White Plains Road, 5th Floor Tarrytown, NY 10591-5097 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Huan-Ping 14374 Shoreline Drive Granger, Indiana 46530, IN / US | [2015/40] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
WU, Huan-Ping 14374 Shoreline Drive Granger, Indiana 46530, IN / US | Representative(s) | Struck, Norbert Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Linhart, Angela Bayer HealthCare AG BHC-CAO-LP-PL 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Linhart, Angela Bayer HealthCare AG BHC-CAO-LP-PL 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10181914.2 | 07.04.2006 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2267150 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2267150 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N27/416 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
G01N27/3274 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/96 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/004 (US);
G01N33/48707 (EP,US);
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
G01N33/66 (US);
Y10T436/104998 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Oxidierbare Verbindung als innere Referenz in einer Kontrolllösung für Biosensoren | [2010/52] | English: | Oxidizable species as an internal reference in control solutions for biosensors | [2010/52] | French: | Composé oxydable servant de référence interne d'une solution de contrôle pour biocapteurs | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 06.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06749468.2 / EP1869203 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060749468) is 15.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.07.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2006 | AT | 30.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | PT | 01.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.04.2006 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.04.2006 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LV | 30.09.2015 | |
GR | 31.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004040286 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | EP1557662 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0089] * * figure - *; | [A]US2004061841 (BLACK MURDO M [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0011] *; | [A]EP1156324 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0800086 (BAYER AG [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 45 * | [A] - HALL J W ET AL, "AUTOMATED DETERMINATION OF GLUCOSE USING ENZ GLUCOSE OXIDASE AND POTASSIUM FERRO CYANIDE ENZ PEROXIDASE", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1968), vol. 26, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 12 - 17, XP008067614 [A] 1-13 * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(68)90027-4 | by applicant | US2001042683 | US3920580 | US4572899 | US4729959 | US5028542 | US5605837 | WO9321928 | WO9513535 | WO9513536 | US5723284 | US2002139692 | US5620579 | US5653863 | WO2005078118 | WO2004040286 | US6531040 | US5798031 | US5120420 | US5320732 | US5429735 | US5660791 |