EP2293549 - Display of television program information using dynamically-adjusted scroll rate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose CA 95002 / US | [2017/52] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2 Circle Star Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | ||
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2160 Gold Street P.O. Box 2160 Alviso, CA 95002-2160 / US | ||
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states TiVo Inc. 2160 Gold Street Alviso, CA 95002-2160 / US | ||
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states TiVo, Inc. 2160 Gold Street Alviso, CA 95002-2160 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bates, Cary Lee c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 02 /
Day, Paul Reuben c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 03 /
Santosuosso, John M. c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2017/12] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Bates, Cary Lee c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
02 /
Day, Paul Reuben c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | |||
03 /
Santosuosso, John M. c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Representative(s) | Pisani, Diana Jean Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Pisani, Diana Jean Ropes & Gray International LLP 60 Ludgate Hill London EC4M 7AW / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10182306.0 | 09.02.2001 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20000502394 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: US 502394 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293549 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293549 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2293549 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, G06F3/00 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4667 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2011/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fernsehprogramminformationanzeige mit einer dynamisch eingestellten Bildschirmrollgeschwindigkeit | [2011/10] | English: | Display of television program information using dynamically-adjusted scroll rate | [2011/10] | French: | Affichage d'information de programmes de télévision utilisant un taux de défilement sur écran ajustable dynamiquement | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01301184.6 / EP1124372 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010301184) is 13.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 03.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/15] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5861906 (DUNN MATTHEW W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0001213 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0005891 (DIVA SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * figures 3a-c, 4 *; | [AP]WO0070799 (NEW HORIZONS TELECASTING INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-14 * page 16 - page 82 ** the whole document * | Examination | US4952927 | US5353121 | JPH07140963 | EP0944252 |