EP2312031 - Flat warp knitting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/16] | Flat warp knitting machine | ||
[2017/06] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Mayer Textilmaschinenfabrik GmbH Brühlstrasse 25 63179 Obertshausen / DE | [2016/34] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states SANTONI S.p.A. Via Carlo Fenzi, 14 25135 Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lonati, Tiberio Via Sera 24 25128 Brescia / IT | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Galassi, Alessandro, et al PGA S.p.A. Milano Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Galassi, Alessandro, et al Ponzellini Gioia E Associati S.R.L. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10182414.2 | 06.03.2007 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | IT2006BS00060 | 16.03.2006 Original published format: IT BS20060060 | [2011/16] | Previously filed application, date | EP20070103638 | 06.03.2007 | [2011/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2312031 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D04B23/02, // D04B27/08 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
D04B27/08 (EP,US);
D04B23/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | Flachkettenwirkmaschine | [2011/16] | English: | Flat warp knitting machine | [2017/09] | French: | Métier à tricoter rectiligne à mailles jetées | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/16] | Flat warp knitting machine | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 01.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07103638.8 / EP1840253 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070103638) is 28.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB202135 (JOHN HENRY MILWARD HOBLEY, et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, lines 65-87; claim 4 * * page 2, line 99 - page 3, line 26; figures 1, 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2427394 (ESHLEMAN RICHARD F) [A] 9,13* column 2, lines 32-36; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US2604768 (SCHUSTER JOHN E) [A] 3,10-12 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 8; figures 5, 5A, 6, 7; claims 1, 4 *; | [Y]GB723091 (RAYMOND CECIL WORMLEIGHTON) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, lines 61-104; figures 1, 2; claims 1,5,7 * | by applicant | US3221520 | US3460358 | US3568470 | US3950942 | US4332149 | DE3620259 | WO03071018 |