EP2371837 - Novel immunogenic compositions for the prevention and treatment of meningococcal disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MC, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Holdings LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | [2016/38] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Wyeth Holdings LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | ||
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states Wyeth Holdings LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | ||
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Wyeth Holdings Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zlotnick Gary, W. 21 Woodlyn Way Penfield NY 14526 / US | 02 /
Fletcher, Leah, D. 37 Second Street Geneseo, NY 14454 / US | 03 /
Farley John 49 Evandale Road Rochester, NY 14618 / US | 04 /
Bernfield, Liesel, A. 789 Thurston Road Rochester, NY 14619 / US | 05 /
Zagursky Robert, J 569 Fox Hunt Drive Victor, NY 14564 / US | 06 /
Metcalf, Benjamin, J. 15 Rensselaer Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/40] | Ricol, David Gerard, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10182544.6 | 11.10.2002 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | US20010328101P | 11.10.2001 Original published format: US 328101 P | US20020406934P | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 406934 P | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371837 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371837 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/00, C07K2/00, A61K39/02, A61K39/095, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, C07K16/12, C07K14/22, G01N33/569, C12N9/28, C12N9/40, C12N9/38, A61K39/39, A61K47/48 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
A61K39/095 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61K47/543 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/22 (EP,US);
C07K16/1217 (EP,US);
C12N9/2417 (EP,US);
C12N9/2465 (EP,US);
C12N9/2471 (EP,US);
G01N33/56911 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/523 (CN);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
A61K2039/55505 (CN,US);
A61K2039/55572 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55577 (EP,US);
A61K2039/58 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6087 (US);
A61K39/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N2333/22 (EP,US);
Y10S530/825 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | C07K1/00, C07K2/00, A61K39/02, A61K39/095, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2011/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Neue immunogene Zusammensetzungen zur Prävention und Behandlung der Meningokokken-Erkrankung | [2011/40] | English: | Novel immunogenic compositions for the prevention and treatment of meningococcal disease | [2011/40] | French: | Nouvelles compositions immunogènes pour la prévention et le traitement de la méningite à méningocoques | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 24.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2013 | Observations by third parties | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02804818.9 / EP1442047 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020804818) is 20.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | LU | 11.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | PT | 23.01.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/41] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0164922 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al); | [X]WO0164920 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al); | by applicant | US4376110 | EP0125023 | US4554101 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0178220 | EP0184187 | EP0185573 | US4650764 | EP0232262 | US4797368 | WO8907150 | US4861719 | WO9002806 | CA2012311 | US4980289 | EP0453242 | WO9118088 | WO9205263 | EP0488528 | US5124263 | US5139941 | WO9309239 | WO9412649 | WO9421807 | WO9426914 | WO9428152 | WO9428938 | WO9502697 | WO9507358 | US5399346 | WO9518863 | WO9521931 | WO9522617 | WO9526411 | US5459127 | WO9528494 | WO9610038 | WO9617823 | WO9622378 | WO9625508 | US5580859 | US5583038 | WO9639036 | US5589466 | WO9719182 | US5739118 | WO9901157 | WO9901158 | WO9901175 | US5955580 | WO0018434 | US6130085 | US6355253 | WO1986US02269 | other | WO9957280 | WO03020756 |