EP2267807 - Method for manufacturing piezoelectric macro-fiber composite actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/52] | Piezoelectric macro-fiber composite actuator and manufacturing method | ||
[2019/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America as represented by the Administrator of the National Aeronautics and Space Adm. 300 E Street S.W. Washington, D.C. 20546 / US | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
High, James 1116 West Ocean View Avenue Norfolk, VA 23503 / US | 02 /
Wilkie, William 376 Merrimac Trail, 411 Williamsburg, VA 23185 / US | 03 /
Bryant, Robert 703 Whaler Drive Newport News, VA 23602 / US | 04 /
Hellbaum, Richard 74 Bannister Drive Hampton, VA 23666 / US | 05 /
Jalink, Antony 5 Madison Lane Newport News, VA 23606 / US | 06 /
Little, Bruce 603 Piney Point Road Yorktown, VA 23692 / US | 07 /
Fox, Robert 1592 Fleming Road Hayes, VA 23072 / US | 08 /
Mirick, Paul 201 Illex Drive Grafton, VA 23692 / US | [2019/37] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
High, James 1116 West Ocean View Avenue Norfolk, VA 23503 / US | ||
02 /
Wilkie, William 376 Merrimac Trail Williamsburg, VA 411 / US | |||
03 /
Bryant, Robert 703 Whaler Drive Newport News, VA 23602 / US | |||
04 /
Hellbaum, Richard 74 Bannister Drive Hampton, VA 23666 / US | |||
05 /
Jalink, Anthony 5 Madison Lane Newport News, VA 23606 / US | |||
06 /
Little, Bruce 603 Piney Point Road Yorktown, VA 23692 / US | |||
07 /
Fox, Robert 1592 Fleming Road Hayes, VA 23072 / US | |||
08 /
Mirick, Paul 201 Illex Drive Grafton, VA 23692 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2010/52] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10182633.7 | 29.06.2000 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US19990430677 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: US 430677 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2267807 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2267807 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2267807 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/37, H01L41/29 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
H10N30/87 (EP,US);
H10N30/1061 (EP,US);
H10N30/06 (EP,US);
H10N30/092 (EP,US);
H10N30/206 (EP,US);
H10N30/208 (EP,US);
H04R17/005 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1044 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1092 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1093 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1095 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US);
Y10T29/435 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49005 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49007 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4908 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49083 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49126 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49128 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | H01L41/08, H01L41/29 | ||
Former IPC [2010/52] | H01L41/08, H01L41/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2019/37] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines piezoelektrischen Aktuators aus Makrofaserverbundwerkstoff | [2019/11] | English: | Method for manufacturing piezoelectric macro-fiber composite actuator | [2019/11] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'actionneur composite en macro-fibre piézoélectrique | [2019/11] |
Former [2010/52] | Piezoelektrischer Aktuator aus Makrofaserverbundwerkstoff und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2010/52] | Piezoelectric macro-fiber composite actuator and manufacturing method | ||
Former [2010/52] | Actionneur composite en macro-fibre piézoélectrique et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00943321.0 / EP1230689 | EP08158874.1 / EP1983584 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000943321) is 03.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | ES | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | IT | 11.09.2019 | NL | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | PT | 13.01.2020 | [2021/20] |
Former [2020/36] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5869189 (HAGOOD IV NESBITT W [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * column 4, line 66 - column 12, line 4; figures 4, 5 * [A] 7-9; | [X] - JANOS B Z ET AL, "Magnetic particle doping for anisotropic matrix materials in Active Fiber Composites", SMART STRUCTURES AND MATERIALS 1999: SMART MATERIALS TECHNOLOGIES, 3-4 MARCH 1999, NEWPORT BEACH, CA, USA; PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (19990303), vol. 3675, doi:10.1117/12.352791, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 10 - 21, XP000952393 [X] 1-4,6,10-12 * sections 1, 6;; figure 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.352791 |