EP2264523 - A method of forming a pattern on a substrate in imprint lithographic processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOARD OF REGENTS, THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM Office of the General Counsel, 201 West 7th Street Austin, Texas 78701 / US | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Byung, Jin 11512 Medallion Lane Austin, TX 78758 / US | 02 /
Colburn, Matthew 1807 West Braker Lane Suite C-100 Austin, TX 78758 / US | 03 /
Sreenivasan, S., v. 10502 Grand Oak Drive Austin, TX 78750 / US | 04 /
Bailey, Todd 1807 West Braker Lane Suite C-100 Austin, TX 78758 / US | [2011/24] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Choi, Byung, Jin 11512 Medallion Lane Austin, TX 78758 / US | ||
02 /
Colburn, Matthew 41 Fairview Rd Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | |||
03 /
Sreenivasan, S., v. 10502 Grand Oak Drive Austin, TX 78750 / US | |||
04 /
Bailey, Todd 1106 Jefferson Blvd Fishkill, NY 12524 / US | |||
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Choi, Byung, Jin 1634 Jerusalem Drive Round Rock, TX 78664 / US | ||
02 /
Colburn, Matthew 4100 Everest Lane Austin, TX 78727 / US | |||
03 /
Sreenivasan, S., v. 10502 Grand Oak Drive Austin, TX 78750 / US | |||
04 /
Bailey, Todd 11160 Jollyville Road, 434 Austin, TX 78759 / US | Representative(s) | Sutto, Luca, et al PGA S.P.A., Milano Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Sutto, Luca Ponzellini, Gioia e Associati S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10182709.5 | 16.07.2001 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | US20000218568P | 16.07.2000 Original published format: US 218568 P | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2264523 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2264523 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G03F9/00 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B29C35/0888 (EP,US);
G03F9/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29C37/005 (EP);
B29C37/0053 (EP,US);
B29C43/003 (EP,US);
B29C43/021 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/0002 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C2043/025 (EP,US);
Y10S101/36 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildung von Mustern auf einem Substrat in Lithographiedruckverfahren | [2010/51] | English: | A method of forming a pattern on a substrate in imprint lithographic processes | [2010/51] | French: | Procédé de formation d'un motif sur un substrat dans des procédés lithographiques d'empreinte | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01952771.2 / EP1303792 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010952771) is 20.07.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5772905 (CHOU STEPHEN Y [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 42 - line 67 *; | [XYI] - WHITE D L ET AL, "Novel alignment system for imprint lithography", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AVS / AIP, MELVILLE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000602), vol. 18, no. 6, doi:10.1116/1.1319706, ISSN 1071-1023, pages 3552 - 3556, XP002204287 [X] 1,2,5,6,8-11 * the whole document * [Y] 7 [I] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.1319706 | [A] - COLBURN M ET AL, "STEP AND FLASH IMPRINT LITHOGRAPHY: A NEW APPROACH TO HIGH-RESOLUTION PATTERNING", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE, USA, (19990315), vol. 3676, doi:10.1117/12.351155, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 379 - 389, XP008011830 [A] 1-15 * P.380, bottom * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.351155 | [Y] - AOYAMA H ET AL, "Magnification correction by changing wafer temperature in proximity x-ray lithography", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B: MICROELECTRONICSPROCESSING AND PHENOMENA, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19991101), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.1116/1.591021, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 3411 - 3414, XP012007946 [Y] 7 * Introduction; page 3411, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.591021 | Examination | US5155749 | JPH0963929 | - FLANDERS D C ET AL, "A NEW INTERFEROMETRIC ALIGNMENT TECHNIQUE", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (19771001), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.89719, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 426 - 428, XP009012795 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.89719 | by applicant | US5204739 |