EP2298902 - Luciferase biosensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMEGA CORPORATION 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fan, Frank 823 Tamarack Way Verona, WI 53593 / US | 02 /
Lewis, Martin Ken . deceased / US | 03 /
Schultz, John W. 407 Melody Lane Verona, WI 53595 / US | 04 /
Wood, Keith V. Promega Corporation 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | 05 /
Butler, Braeden 1818 Yahara Place Madison, WI 53704 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Fan, Frank 2977 Dunmore Street Madison, WI 53711 / US | ||
02 /
Lewis, Martin Ken . deceased / US | |||
03 /
Schultz, John W. 407 Melody Lane Verona, WI 53595 / US | |||
04 /
Wood, Keith V. 8380 Swan Road Mt. Horeb, WI 53572 / US | |||
05 /
Butler, Braeden 1818 Yahara Place Madison, WI 53704 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/17] |
Former [2011/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10182742.6 | 01.10.2004 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20030510187P | 10.10.2003 Original published format: US 510187 P | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298902 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2298902 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/53, C12N9/02, C12Q1/66, G01N33/573 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C12N9/0069 (EP,US);
C12Q1/66 (EP,US);
C07K2319/20 (EP,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C07K2319/23 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2011/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Luciferase-Biosensor | [2011/12] | English: | Luciferase biosensor | [2011/12] | French: | Biocapteur à la luciférase | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04809862.8 / EP1673459 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040809862) is 19.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2004 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BE | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | IE | 01.10.2015 | LU | 01.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/45] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0206458 (CHEMICON INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1097992 (UNIV WALES MEDICINE [GB]) [X] 1,2,7,11,13 * examples 2,4 *; | [XD] - WAUD JONATHAN P ET AL, "Engineering the C-terminus of firefly luciferase as an indicator of covalent modification of proteins", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1996), vol. 1292, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 89 - 98, XP002325291 [XD] 1-8,11,12 * the whole document * | [XD] - OZAWA T ET AL, "SPLIT LUCIFERASE AS AN OPTICAL PROBE FOR DETECTING PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS IN MAMMALIAN CELLS BASED ON PROTEIN SPLICING", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (20010601), vol. 73, no. 11, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2516 - 2521, XP001081130 [XD] 1,2,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac0013296 | [A] - MICHEL P ET AL, "Expression and purification of polyhistidine-tagged firefly luciferase in insect cells - a potential alternative for process scale-up", BRAUWELT, NUERNBERG, DE, (20010123), vol. 85, no. 1, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 49 - 56, XP004315109 [A] 5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(00)00377-1 | [A] - ZAKO T ET AL, "Luminescent and substrate binding activities of firefly luciferase N-terminal domain", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - PROTEINS & PROTEOMICS, ELSEVIER, (20030730), vol. 1649, no. 2, ISSN 1570-9639, pages 183 - 189, XP004440134 [A] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1570-9639(03)00179-1 | Examination | - PAULMURUGAN R ET AL, "MONITORING PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS USING SPLIT SYNTHETIC RENILLA LUCIFERASE PROTEIN-FRAGMENT-ASSISTED COMPLEMENTATION", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20030401), vol. 75, no. 7, doi:10.1021/AC020731C, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1584 - 1589, XP001170664 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac020731c | by applicant | US6270964 | US6294330 | US6428951 | WO0216944 | WO9726366 | - STEWART ET AL., Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis, 2 ed.,, PIERCE CHEMICAL CO., vol. ILL, pages 11 - 12 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, page 403 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1977), vol. 25, page 3389 | - CHONG ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 192, page 271 | - CORPET ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 108S | - EINBOND ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1996), vol. 384, page 1 | - GEYSEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. | - HANKS; HUNTER, FASEB J, (1995), vol. 9, pages 576 - 595 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD.. SCI, USA, (1989), vol. 89, page 10915 | - HIGGINS ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 73, page 237 | - HIGGINS ET AL., LABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, page 157 | - HUANG ET AL., LABIOS, (1992), vol. 8, page 155 | - ILSLEY ET AL., CELL SIGNALING., (2002), vol. 14, page 183 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL, ACAD. SCI., USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 5873 | - LEE ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2003), vol. 316, page 162 | - LIU ET AL., GENE, (1999), vol. 237, page 153 | - MAYER; BALTIMORE, TRENDS CELL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 3, page 8 | - MERRIFIELD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), page 2149 | - MILS ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, page 1257 | - MYERS; MILLER, LABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, page 11 | - OZAWA ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 73, page 2516 | - PAULMURUGAN ET AL., PNAS, (1999), vol. 24, page 15603 | - PEARSON ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 307 | - PLAINKUM ET AL., NAT. STRUCT. BIOL., (2003), vol. 10, page 115 | - SADOWSKI ET AL., MOL. CELL, BIO., (1986), vol. 6, page 4396 | - SADOWSKI ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 335, page 563 | - SALA-NEWBY ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (1991), vol. 279, page 727 | - SALA-NEWBY ET AL., FEES, (1992), vol. 307, page 241 | - STEWART ET AL., Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis, 2 ed.,, PIERCE CHEMICAL CO., pages 11 - 12 | - WANG ET AL., B8RC, (2001), vol. 282, page 28 | - WAUD ET AL., BBA, (1996), vol. 1292, page 89 |