EP2263593 - Multi-component telepresence system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/51] | Multi-component telepresence system and method | ||
[2014/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1266 Kifer Road, Building 101 Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Thomas G. 304 Concord Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2015/11] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Cooper, Thomas G. 304 Concord Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2010/51] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10182920.8 | 10.12.1997 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | US19960033321P | 12.12.1996 Original published format: US 33321 P | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2263593 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2263593 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2263593 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, // A61B19/08 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61B46/13 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B34/35 (EP,US);
A61B34/37 (EP,US);
A61B34/71 (EP,US);
A61B34/76 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00482 (EP,US);
A61B2034/305 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0803 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/51] | Title | German: | Tele-Anwesenheitsanordnung mit Mehrfachkomponenten | [2014/43] | English: | Multi-component telepresence system | [2014/43] | French: | Système de télépresence multicomposant | [2014/43] |
Former [2010/51] | Tele-Anwesenheitsanordnung und -verfahren mit Mehrfachkomponenten | ||
Former [2010/51] | Multi-component telepresence system and method | ||
Former [2010/51] | Système de télépresence multicomposant et procédé correspondant | Examination procedure | 13.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97949717.9 / EP1015068 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970949717) is 15.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2015 | BE | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | ES | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | IE | 10.12.2015 | LU | 10.12.2015 | [2016/45] |
Former [2016/37] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9220295 (KOIVUKANGAS JOHN [FI]) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 30; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US5184601 (PUTMAN JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 10, line 56 - line 65; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9403113 (COMPUTER MOTION INC [US]) [A] 1-13* figure 11 *; | [A]US5400267 (DENEN DENNIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5571110 (MATSEN III FREDERICK A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 14, line 31 - line 64; figures 8-10 * | by applicant | US19940239086 | US19950504301 | US19950517053 |