EP2289911 - Therapeutic use of a growth factor, NsG33 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NsGene A/S Baltorpvej 154 2750 Ballerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states NsGene A/S Baltorpvej 154 2750 Bellerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grønborg, Mette Nebbegårdsbakken 51 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 02 /
Kusk, Philip Baunesvinget 20 3450 Lynge / DK | 03 /
Blom, Nikolaj Nebbegårdsbakken 51 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 04 /
Petersen, Thomas Nordahl Hillerødgade 55, st.th. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | 05 /
Johansen, Teit E. Stampeengen 26 2970 Hørsholm / DK | 06 /
Brunak, Søren Gammel Vartov Vej 22 2900 Hellerup / DK | 07 /
Wahlberg, Lars Ulrik 259 Riverside Dr. Tiverton, RI 02878 / US | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 10182987.7 | 30.03.2005 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | DK20040000510 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: DK 200400510 | US20040575086P | 28.05.2004 Original published format: US 575086 P | DK20040000843 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: DK 200400843 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2289911 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2289911 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/475, C12N15/12, A61K38/18, A61K31/7088, A61K31/713, A61P25/00, A61P37/00, A61L27/38, C12N15/86, A61K9/00, // A61K38/00 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/475 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A01K67/027 (EP,US);
A61K38/185 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A01K2207/05 (EP,US);
A01K2207/20 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0356 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Therapeutische Verwendung des Wachstumsfaktors nsg33 | [2011/09] | English: | Therapeutic use of a growth factor, NsG33 | [2011/09] | French: | Utilisation thérapeutique du facteur de croissance nsg33 | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05717160.5 / EP1745069 | EP09156744.6 / EP2075254 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050717160) is 21.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0139786 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0154474 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claim -; sequences 675,845,255,425 *; | WO0155440 [ ] (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0638] - paragraph [0655]; claim -; sequences 675,845,255,425 *; | [X]WO0157190 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 59 - page 61; example -; claim -; tables 2-6; sequences 1401,3369,417,2385 *; | [X]WO0183510 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 49 - page 51; claim -; sequences 31,93,94 * * page 213 - page 225 * * page 245 - page 253 *; | [XP]WO2004035732 (FIVE PRIME THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0147]; claim -; sequence 91 *; | [ ] - "Human protein SEQ ID NO 1401.", Geneseq, (20011106), Database accession no. AAM78739, URL: EBI, XP002334619 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - "Human protein SEQ ID NO 3369.", Geneseq, (20011106), Database accession no. AAM79723, URL: EBI, XP002334620 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - "Human cDNA SEQ ID NO: 675.", Geneseq, (20020110), Database accession no. ABB10367, URL: EBI, XP002334621 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - "Human cDNA SEQ ID NO: 845.", Geneseq, (20020110), Database accession no. ABB10537, URL: EBI, XP002334622 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - "Human cDNA SEQ ID NO: 255.", Geneseq, (20020110), Database accession no. ABA06589, URL: EBI, XP002334623 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - "Human cDNA SEQ ID NO: 425.", Geneseq, (20020110), Database accession no. ABA06759, URL: EBI, XP002334624 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - "Human secreted protein encoding polypeptide SEQ ID NO 93.", Geneseq, (20020315), Database accession no. ABB57447, URL: EBI, XP002334625 [ ] * the whole document * | [XDP] - NISHINO JINSUKE ET AL, "Meteorin: a secreted protein that regulates glial cell differentiation and promotes axonal extension", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (20040505), vol. 23, no. 9, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 1998 - 2008, XP002334608 [XDP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.emboj.7600202 | [ ] - "Human secreted protein SEQ ID #91.", Geneseq, (20040812), Database accession no. ADP29324, URL: EBI, XP002334626 [ ] * the whole document * | [A] - COLTON C K, "Engineering challenges in cell-encapsulation technology", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19960501), vol. 14, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0167-7799(96)10021-4, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 158 - 162, XP004035786 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(96)10021-4 | [AD] - NIELSEN H ET AL, "A neural network method for identification of prokaryotic and eukaryotic signal peptides and prediction of their cleavage sites", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF NEURAL SYSTEMS, SINGAPORE, SG, (19971001), vol. 8, no. 5-6, ISSN 0129-0657, pages 581 - 599, XP009144608 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - HEIJNE VON G, "A NEW METHOD FOR PREDICTING SIGNAL SEQUENCE CLEAVAGE SITES", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19860101), vol. 14, no. 11, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4683 - 4690, XP001189533 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "2023-57 Mouse E14.5 retina lambda ZAP II Library Mus musculus cDNA, mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20011221), Database accession no. BG806341, URL: EBI, XP002334627 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - MU X ET AL, "Gene expression in the developing mouse retina by EST sequencing and microarray analysis.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. 15 DEC 2001, (20011215), vol. 29, no. 24, ISSN 1362-4962, pages 4983 - 4993, XP002334609 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.24.4983 | by applicant | US4352883 | US4353888 | US4407957 | US4657760 | US4762915 | US4868116 | US4883666 | US4892538 | US4968733 | US4976859 | US5000958 | US5082670 | US5084350 | US5106627 | US5156844 | US5158881 | WO9219195 | US5169637 | US5185154 | US5206344 | US5219990 | US5225212 | WO9322437 | US5283187 | US5284761 | WO9505452 | US5399346 | WO9516709 | WO9524929 | US5460959 | WO9530761 | US5487739 | WO9607399 | US5512600 | US5550050 | US5554148 | WO9640072 | WO9701357 | WO9703692 | US5618531 | US5639275 | US5654007 | US5654010 | US5653975 | US5653687 | WO9734586 | US5677158 | WO9744065 | WO9805304 | US5780014 | US5798113 | US5800828 | US5814607 | US5904144 | WO9952573 | EP0973872 | US6027721 | US6042579 | US6063757 | US6299895 | US6309634 | US6361771 | US2002037281 | EP1223966 | US6439427 | WO02078730 | WO03004527 | US2003031700 | US6555674 | US6683058 | - BECKER; BONNI, PROG NEUROBIOL., (200401), vol. 72, no. 1, pages 1 - 25 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - TATIANA A. TATUSOVA; THOMAS L. MADDEN, "Blast 2 sequences - a new tool for comparing protein and nucleotide sequences", FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1999), vol. 174, pages 247 - 250 | - PEARSON WR, METHODS MOL BIOL, (2000), vol. 132, pages 185 - 219 | - NISHINO ET AL., THE EMBO JOURNAL, (2004), vol. 23, pages 2998 - 2008 | - PETER DUCKERT; SOREN BRUNAK; NIKOLAJ BLOM, PROTEIN ENGINEERING, DESIGN AND SELECTION, (2004), vol. 17, pages 107 - 112 | - GREENE; TISCHLER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1976), vol. 73, page 2424 | - NIELSEN ET AL., MOL CELL NEUROSCI., (200404), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 629 - 41 | - VAUDRY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20020430), vol. 99, no. 9, pages 6398 - 403 | - BLOOM ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI., (19981211), vol. 865, pages 274 - 89 | - CALDWELL ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20010519), no. 5, pages 475 - 9 | - NAKAO ET AL., EXP NEUROL, (19960313), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 144 - 57 | - NAKAO ET AL., BRAIN RES DEV BARIN RES, (19951221), vol. 90, no. 1-2, pages 92 - 101 | - WIDMER ET AL., EUR J NEUROSCI, (19941101), vol. 6, no. 11, pages 1669 - 79 | - WOLD, F., Posttranslational Covalent Modification of Proteins, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1983), pages 1 - 12 | - SEIFTER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 182, pages 626 - 646 | - RATTAN ET AL., "Protein Synthesis: Posttranslational Modifications and Aging", ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 663, pages 48 - 62 | - FEINBERG A P; VOGELSTEIN B, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1983), vol. 132, pages 6 - 13 | - LASTBOM ET AL., TOXICOLOGY, (1998), vol. 125, pages 59 - 66 | - HOFFMANN ET AL., ALLERGY, (1999), vol. 54, pages 446 - 54 | - VOHR ET AL., ARCH. TOXOCOL., vol. 73, pages 501 - 9 | - KIMBER ET AL., J. TOXICOL. ENVIRON. HEALTH, vol. 53, pages 563 - 79 | - LENSCHOW ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, pages 789 - 792 | - TURKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 11102 - 11105 | - Fundamental Immunology, RAVEN PRESS, (1989), pages 846 - 847 | - Fundamental Immunology, RAVEN PRESS, (1989), pages 840 - 856 | - Current Protocols in Immunology, PUB. GREENE PUBLISHING ASSOCIATES AND WILEY-INTERSCIENCE | - HERRMANN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, pages 2488 - 2492 | - HERRMANN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1982), vol. 128, pages 1968 - 1974 | - HANDA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 135, pages 1564 - 1572 | - TAKAI ET AL., IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 137, pages 3494 - 3500 | - TAKAI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 140, pages 508 - 512 | - BOWMAN ET AL., J. VIROLOGY, vol. 61, pages 1992 - 1998 | - BERTAGNOLLI ET AL., CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 133, pages 327 - 341 | - BROWN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 153, pages 3079 - 3092 | - MALISZEWSKI, J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 144, pages 3028 - 3033 | - "Assays for B cell function: In vitro antibody production", MOND, J. J.; BRUNSWICK, M., Current Protocols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1994), vol. 1, pages 3.8. 1 - 3.8,16 | - TAKAI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 137, pages 3494 - 3500 | - BERTAGNOLLI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 149, pages 3778 - 3783 | - GUERY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 134, pages 536 - 544 | - INABA ET AL., JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1991), vol. 173, pages 549 - 559 | - MACATONIA ET AL., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 154, pages 5071 - 5079 | - PORGADOR ET AL., JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1995), vol. 182, pages 255 - 260 | - NAIR ET AL., JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 67, pages 4062 - 4069 | - HUANG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 264, pages 961 - 965 | - MACATONIA ET AL., JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1989), vol. 169, pages 1255 - 1264 | - BHARDWAJ ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1994), vol. 94, pages 797 - 807 | - INABA ET AL., JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1990), vol. 172, pages 631 - 640 | - DARZYNKIEWICZ ET AL., CYTOMETRY, (1992), vol. 13, pages 795 - 808 | - GORCZYCA ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (1993), vol. 7, pages 659 - 670 | - GORCZYCA ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 1945 - 1951 | - ITOH ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 66, pages 233 - 243 | - ZACHARCHUK, JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 145, pages 4037 - 4045 | - ZAMAI ET AL., CYTOMETRY, (1993), vol. 14, pages 891 - 897 | - GORCZYCA ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, (1992), vol. 1, pages 639 - 648 | - ANTICA ET AL., BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, pages 111 - 117 | - FINE ET AL., CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 155, pages 111 - 122 | - GALY ET AL., BLOOD, (1995), vol. 85, pages 2770 - 2778 | - TOKI ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7548 - 7551 | - ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHERAPY, (1993), vol. 27, page 912 | - CANCER, (1993), vol. 41, page 1270 | - CANCER RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 44, page 1698 | - KOBAYASHI ET AL., MOL. CHEM. NEUROPATHOL., (1991), vol. 15, pages 193 - 206 | - TUSZYNSKI ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 3, pages 305 - 314 | - LEHERICY ET AL., J. COMP. NEUROL., (1993), vol. 330, pages 15 - 31 | - Reminoton's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MAACK PUBLISHING CO. | - JOHNSON ET AL., NAT. MED., (1996), vol. 2, pages 795 - 799 | - YASUDA, BIOMED. THER., (1993), vol. 27, pages 1221 - 1223 | - HORA ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 755 - 758 | - "Design and Production of Single Immunization Vaccines Using Polylactide Polyglycolide Microsphere Systems", CLELAND, Vaccine Design: The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach, PLENUM PRESS, (1995), pages 439 - 462 | - "Controlled release of bioactive agents from lactide/glycolide polymer", LEWIS, Biodegradable Polymers as Drug Delivery Systems, MARCEL DEKKER, (1990), pages 1 - 41 | - FRALEY ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (1981), vol. 6, page 77 | - MANNINO ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, page 682 | - BILANG-BLEUEL ET AL., PROC. ACAD. NATI. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 8818 - 8823 | - CHOI-LUNDBERG ET AL., EXP. NEUROL., (1998), vol. 154, pages 261 - 275 | - CHOI-LUNDBERG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 275, pages 838 - 841 | - MANDEL ET AL., PROC. ACAD. NATL. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 14083 - 14088 | - MESSING ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, page 309 | - MAXAM ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1980), vol. 65, page 499 | - MANIATIS ET AL., MOLECULAR CLONING, (1982), pages 133 - 134 | - BANERJI ET AL., CELL, (1981), vol. 27, page 299 | - SCIENCE, (1980), vol. 209, page 1406 | - BREATHNACH; CHAMBON, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 50, page 349 | - JOLLY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1983), vol. 11, page 1855 | - CAPECCHI ET AL., Enhancer and eukaryotic gene expression, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORIES, (1991), pages 101 - 102 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, page 285 | - ROSSI; DECROMBRUGGHE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 5590 - 5594 | - PROCKOP; KIVIRIKKO, N. ENG. J. MED., (1984), vol. 311, page 376 | - SMITH; NILES, BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 19, page 1820 | - DE WET ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 258, page 14385 | - CHUA ET AL., CONNECTIVE TISSUE RES., (1990), vol. 25, pages 161 - 170 | - ELIAS ET AL., ANNALS N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1990), vol. 580, pages 233 - 244 | - SELIGER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 2138 - 2144 | - SELIGER ET AL., J. VIROLOGY, (1988), vol. 62, pages 619 - 621 | - DAEWOONG ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 19, pages 929 - 933 | - PIUCK, INT J EXP PATH, vol. 77, pages 269 - 278 | - LYSAGHT ET AL., J. CELL BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 56, page 196 | - COLTON, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, page 158 | - Biotech Source 87-88, FISHER SCIENTIFIC CO., (1987), pages 72 - 75 | - Sigma Cell Culture Catalog, SIGMA CHEMICAL CO., (1991), pages 162 - 163 | - LI; TURNER, EXP. EYE RES., (1988), vol. 47, pages 911 - 917 | - LOPEZ ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1989), vol. 30, pages 586 - 588 | - PRICE TN; BURKE JF; MAYNE LV., "A novel human astrocyte cell line (A735) with astrocyte-specific neurotransmitter function", IN VITRO CELL DEV BIOL ANIM., (199905), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 279 - 88 | - DECKWERTH; JOHNSON, J. CELL BIOL., (1993), vol. 123, pages 1207 - 1222 | - PETER DUCKERT; SOREN BRUNAK; NIKOLAJ BLOM., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, DESIGN AND SELECTION, (2004), vol. 17, pages 107 - 112 | - HENRIK NIELSEN; JACOB ENGELBRECHT; SOREN BRUNAK; GUNNAR VON HEIJNE, PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1997), vol. 10, pages 1 - 6 | - L. JUHL JENSEN; R. GUPTA; N. BLOM; D. DEVOS; J. TAMAMES; C. KESMIR; H. NIELSEN; H. H. STæRFELDT; K. RAPACKI; C. WORKMAN, J. MOL. BIOL., (2002), vol. 319, pages 1257 - 1265 | - L.J. JENSEN; R. GUPTA; H.H. STæRFELDT; S. BRUNAK, BIOINFORMATICS, (2003), vol. 19, pages 635 - 642 | - MYERS, E.W.; MILLER,W., COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI., (1998), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - KNUDSEN S; WORKMAN C; SICHERITZ-PONTEN T; FRIIS C., "GenePublisher: Automated analysis of DNA microarray data.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, no. 13, pages 3471 - 6 | - LENNON; AUFFRAY; POLYMEROPOULOS; SOARES, "An integrated molecular analysis of genomes and their expression", GENOMICS, (1996), vol. 33, pages 151 - 152 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, WILLEY | - DANIELS; BROWN, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 22446 - 22452 | - NOMURA ET AL., DEV. NEUROSCI., (2001), vol. 23, pages 145 - 152 | - CISTERNI ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., vol. 74, pages 1820 - 1828 | - FRIEDMAN; MYTILINEOU, NEUROSCI. LETT., (1987), vol. 79, pages 65 - 72 | - KARLSSON ET AL., BRAIN RES., (20021115), vol. 955, no. 1-2, pages 268 - 80 | - HEIKKILA ET AL., EURO J. PHARMACOL., (1984), vol. 103, pages 241 - 48 | - ZUFFEREY ET AL., J. VIROL, (1997), vol. 73, pages 2886 - 2892 | - ROSENBLAD ET AL., "In vivo protection of nigral dopamine neurons by lentiviral gene transfer of the novel GDNF-family member neublastin/artemin", MOL CELL NEUROSCI., (200002), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 199 - 214 | - VON SCHWEDLER ET AL., "Vif is crucial for human immunodeficiency virus type 1 proviral DNA synthesis in infected cells", VIROL., (199308), vol. 67, no. 8, pages 4945 - 55 | - SAUER; OERTEL, NEUROSCIENCE, (1994), vol. 59, pages 401 - 415 | - VILLA ET AL., EXP NEUROL, (2000), vol. 161, no. 1, pages 67 - 84 | - VILLA ET AL., EXP CELL RES., (20040401), vol. 294, no. 2, pages 559 - 70 | - NAKAO ET AL., EXP. NEUROL., (1996), vol. 138, pages 144 - 157 |