EP2277615 - Methods and apparatuses for analyzing biological samples by mass spectrometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY Box 6009 Station B Nashville, TN 37235 / US | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caprioli, Richard 5020 High Valley Drive Brentwood, TN 37027 / US | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht, et al Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Dehmel, Albrecht, et al Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10183126.1 | 18.09.2002 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | US20010329719P | 15.10.2001 Original published format: US 329719 P | US20020178067 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: US 178067 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2277615 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2277615 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D59/44, H01J49/00, G01N33/574, G01N33/68, H01J49/16 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US);
Y10T436/24 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Analyse von biologischen Proben durch Massenspektrometrie | [2011/04] | English: | Methods and apparatuses for analyzing biological samples by mass spectrometry | [2011/04] | French: | Procédés et appareils pour l'analyse des échantillons biologiques par spectrométrie de masse | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02801634.3 / EP1444032 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020801634) is 03.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5808300 (CAPRIOLI RICHARD M [US]) [XD] 1,2,7-9 * Claims 1-27; figures in 11, 21, 23, 26 and 31; legend of figure 31 in column 8 * | [XI] - TODD P J ET AL, "ORGANIC ION IMAGING OF BIOLOGICAL TISSUE WITH SECONDARY ION MASS SPECTROMERTY AND MATRIX-ASSISTED LASER DESORPTION/IONIZATION", JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY, WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, (200104), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 1076-5174, pages 355 - 369, XP008037954 [X] 1,2,6-9 * Page 355, left column, 1st paragraph; Page 356, see the subsection entitled "Mapping the sample". * * Pages 357 - 358, see the subsection entitled "Sample preparation". * * Pages 361 - 367, see the section entitled "Imaging biological tissue sections by MALDI-MS" * * figures 6-9 * [I] 3-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jms.153 | [X] - STOECKLI M ET AL, "Imaging mass spectrometry: A new technology for the analysis of protein expression in mammalian tissues", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200104), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 493 - 496, XP002979722 [X] 1-9 * Figures 1-6; page 493, column 1-page 495, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/86573 | [AD] - CAPRIOLI R M ET AL, "Molecular imaging of biological samples: Localization of peptides and proteins using MALDI-TOF MS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19971201), vol. 69, no. 23, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 4751 - 4760, XP002974554 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac970888i | by applicant | US5808300 | US5272338 | US5372719 | US5453199 | US5607859 | US5569915 | US5241569 | US5827190 | US6225047 | WO0011208 | WO0136977 | - CAPRIOLI, R.M.; CHAEURAND, P.; HALLAHAN, D.E.; STOECKLI, M., "Imaging mass spectrometry: A new technology for the analysis of protein expression in mammalian tissues", NATURE MEDICINE, (2001), vol. 7, pages 493 - 496 | - CAPRIOLI, R.M.; FARMER, T.B.; GILE, J., "Molecular imaging of biological samples: Localization of peptides and proteins using MALDI-TOF MS", ANAL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 69, pages 4751 - 4760 | - CHAURAND, P.; STOECKLI, M.; CAPRIOLI, R.M., "Direct profiling of proteins in biological tissue sections by MALDI mass spectrometry", ANAL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 71, pages 5263 - 5270 | - CHENG, L.; NEUMANN, R.M.; WEAVER, A.L.; SPOTTS, B.E.; BOSTWICK, D.G., "Predicting cancer progression in patients with stage T1 bladder carcinoma", J. CLIN. ONCOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 3182 - 3187 | - CHONG, B.E.; LUBMAN, D.M.; MILLER, F.R.; ROSENSPIRE, A.J., "Rapid screening of protein profiles of human breast cancer cell lines using non-porous reverse-phase high performance liquid chromatography separation with matrix-assisted laser desorption/ionization time-of-flight mass spectral analysis", RAPID COMMUN. MASS SPECTROM, (1999), vol. 13, pages 1808 - 1812 | - FIRLIK, K.S.; MARTINEZ, A.J.; LUNSFORD, L.D., "Use of cytological preparations for the intra-operative diagnosis of stereotactically obtained brain biopsies: A 19-year experience and survey of neuropathologists", J. NEUROSURG, (1999), vol. 91, pages 454 - 458 | - GIBBS, J.F.; HUANG, P.P.; ZHANG, P.J.; KRAYBILL, W.G.; CHENEY, R., "Accuracy of pathologic techniques for the diagnosis of metastatic melanoma in sentinel lymph nodes", ANN. SURG. ONCOL., (1999), vol. 6, pages 699 - 704 | - HALL, A.K., "Differential expression of thymosin genes in human tumors and in the developing human kidney", INT. J. CANCER, (1991), vol. 48, pages 672 - 677 | - IGUCHI, K. ET AL., "Decreased thymosin P.4 in apoptosis induced by a variety of antitumor drugs", BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 57, pages 1105 - 1111 | - JIMENEZ, C.R. ET AL., "Direct mass spectrometric peptide profiling and sequencing of single neurons reveals differential peptide patterns in a small neuronal network", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 2070 - 2076 | - KARAS, M.; BACHMANN, D.; BAHR, U.; HILLENKAMP, F., "Matrix-assisted ultraviolet-laser desorption of nonvolatile compounds", INT. J. MASS SPECTROM. ION PROCESS., (1987), vol. 78, pages 53 - 68 | - KLEM, D.; JACOBS, H.K.; JORGENSEN, R.; FACENDA, L.S.; BAKER, D.A.; ALTIMARI, A., "Stereotatic breast biopsy in a community hospital setting", AM.SURG., (1999), vol. 65, no. 8, pages 737 - 740,1 | - LEVISETTI, R. ET AL., "Imaging-SIMS (secondary-ion mass-spectroscopy) studies of advanced materials", SCANNING MICROSC., (1993), vol. 7, pages 1161 - 1172 | - LI, K.W. ET AL., "Direct peptide profiling by mass spectrometry of single identified neurons reveals complex neuropeptide-processing pattern.", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 30288 - 30292 | - LONGACRE, T.A.; HENDRICKSON, M.R., "Diffusely infiltrative endometrial adenocarcinoma -- an adenoma malignum pattern of myoinvasion", AM. J. SURG. PATHOL., (1999), vol. 23, pages 69 - 78 | - MOROZ, L.L.; GILLETTE, R.; SWEEDLER, J.V., "Single-cell analyses of nitrergic neurons in simple nervous systems", J. EXP. BIOL., (1999), vol. 202, pages 333 - 341 | - "Central nervous system tumors", NELSON, D.F.; MCDONALD, J.V.; LAPHAM, L.W.; QUAZI, R.; RUBIN, P., Clinical Oncology: A Multidisciplinary Approach for Physicians and Students, WB SAUNDERS, (1993), pages 617 - 644 | - PACHOLSKI, M.L.; WINOGRAD, N., "Imaging with mass spectrometry", CHEM. REV., (1999), vol. 99, pages 2977 - 3005 | - PACIUCOI, R. ET AL., "Isolation of plasminogen activator, cathepsin H, and non-specific cross- reacting antigen from SK-PC-1 pancreas cancer cells using subtractive hybridization", FEBS LETT., (1996), vol. 385, pages 72 - 76 | - RICHTER, T.; NAHRIG, J.; KOMMINOTH, P.; KOWOLIK, J.; WERNER, M., "Protocol for ultrarapid immunostaining of frozen sections.", J. CLIN. PATHOL., (1999), vol. 52, pages 461 - 463 | - ROEPSTORFF, P., "Proposal for a common nomenclature for sequence ions in mass spectra of peptides", BIOMED. MASS SPECTROM., (1984), vol. 11, page 601 | - SHAH, A.B.; MUZUMDAR, G.A.; CHITALE, A.R.; BHAGWATI, S.N., "Squash preparation and frozen section in intra-operative diagnosis of central nervous system tumors", ACTA CYTOLOGICA, (1998), vol. 42, pages 1149 - 1154 | - SILBERGELD, D.L.; CHICOINE, M.R., "Isolation and characterization of human malignant glioma cells from histologically normal brain", J. NEUROSURG., (1997), vol. 86, pages 525 - 531 | - STOECKLI, M.; FARMER, T.B.; CAPRIOLI, R.M., "Automated mass spectrometry imaging with a matrix-assisted laser desorption ionization time-of-flight instrument", J. AM. SOC. MASS SPECTROM., (1999), vol. 10, pages 67 - 71 | - SUN, H.Q.; KWIATOWSKA, K.; YIN, H.L, "Actin monomer binding proteins", CURR. OPIN. CELL BIOL., (1995), vol. 7, pages 102 - 110 | - THEBAUIT, S.; GILBERT, D.; MACHOUR, N.; MARVIN, L.; LANGE, C.; TRON, F.; CHARLLONAT, R., "Two- dimensional electrophresis and mass spectrometry identification of proteins bound by a murine monoclonal anti-cardiolipin antibody: A powerful technique to characterize the cross-reactivity of a single autoantibody", ELECTROPHORESIS, (2000), vol. 21, pages 2531 - 2539 | - TODD, P.J.; MCMAHON, J.M.; SHORT, R.T.; MCCANDLISH, C.A., "Organic SIMS of biological tissue", ANAL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 69, pages 529A - 535A | - TURNER, R.R.; HANSEN, N.M.; STERN, S.L.; GIULIANO, A.E., "Intra-operative examination of the sentinel lymph node for breast carcinoma staging", AM. J. CLIN. PATHOL., (1999), vol. 112, pages 627 - 634 | - VALASKOVIC, G.A.; MORRISON, G.H., "Quantitative imaging ion microscopy -- a short review", SCANNING MICROSCOPY, (1992), vol. 6, pages 305 - 318 | - VLAHOU, A.; SCHELLHAMMER, P.F.; MENDRINOS, S.; PATEL, K.; KONDYLIS, F.I.; GONG, L.; NASIM, S.; WRIGHT, G.L.JR., "Development of a novel proteomic approach for the detection of transitional cell carcinoma of the bladder in urine", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (2001), vol. 158, pages 1491 - 1502 | - WANG, H.W.; WILLIS, J.; CANTO, M.I.F.; SIVAK, M.V.; IZATT, J.A., "Quantitative laser scanning confocal autofluorescence microscopy of normal, premalignant, and malignant colonic tissues", IEEE TRANS. BIOMED. ENG., (1999), vol. 46, pages 1246 - 1252 |