EP2269506 - Method of forming an electromagnetic sensing coil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Surgical Navigation Technologies, Inc. 826 Coal Creek Circle Louisville Colorado 80020 / US | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dukesherer, John H 445 Garland Street Lakewood, CO 80226 / US | 02 /
Burg, Bruce 958 Arapahoe Circle Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 03 /
Jascob, Bradley A. 11580 Marshall Street Broomfield, CO 80020 / US | 04 /
Kessman, Paul 2569 South Newcombe Lakewood, CO 80305 / US | 05 /
Shaver, Scott 460 E. 113rd Way Thornton, CO 80241 / US | 06 /
Hunter, Mark 373 Greycliff Bluff Drive St Louis, MO 63129 / US | 07 /
Martens, Todd 1225 S. Sherman St. Denver, CO 80210 / US | 08 /
Yared, Nadim 2285 Keota Lane Superior, CO 80027 / US | 09 /
Boes, Kristin 29533 Spruce Canyon Drive Golden, CO 80403 / US | [2011/23] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
Dukesherer, John H 445 Garland Street Lakewood, CO 80226 / US | ||
02 /
Burg, Bruce 958 Arapahoe Circle Louisville, CO 80027 / US | |||
03 /
Jascob, Bradley A. 11580 Marshall Street Broomfield, CO 80020 / US | |||
04 /
Kessman, Paul 2569 South Newcombe Lakewood, CO 80305 / US | |||
05 /
Shaver, Scott 460 E. 113rd Way Thornton, CO 80241 / US | |||
06 /
Hunter, Mark 373 Greycliff Bluff Drive St Louis, MO 63129 / US | |||
07 /
Martens, Todd 2960 Inca Street No. 317 Denver, CO 80202 / US | |||
08 /
Yared, Nadim 2285 Keota Lane Superior, CO 80027 / US | |||
09 /
Boes, Kristen 29533 Spruce Canyon Drive Golden, CO 80403 / US | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Edlund, Fabian Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 10183187.3 | 15.10.2004 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | US20030688068 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: US 688068 | US20040941782 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: US 941782 | [2011/01] | Previously filed application, date | EP20040024680 | 15.10.2004 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269506 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06, A61B19/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2068 (EP,US);
A61B2034/207 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2072 (EP,US);
A61B2034/256 (EP,US);
A61B2090/365 (EP,US);
A61B2090/367 (EP,US);
A61B2090/376 (EP,US);
A61B2090/378 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3983 (EP,US);
A61B5/4528 (EP,US);
A61B5/7285 (EP,US);
A61B6/12 (EP,US);
A61B6/4405 (EP,US);
A61B6/4423 (EP,US);
A61B6/4441 (EP,US);
A61B6/541 (EP,US);
A61B8/4245 (EP,US);
A61B8/543 (EP,US);
H01F2005/027 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49071 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49073 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49146 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49171 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Gestalten einer elektromagnetischen Messspule | [2011/01] | English: | Method of forming an electromagnetic sensing coil | [2011/01] | French: | Méthode de formation d'une bobine électromagnétique de détection | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 28.07.2011 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 29.08.2011 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 02.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04024680.3 / EP1523951 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040024680) is 25.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4173228 (CHILDRESS IRA N [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 3, lines 27-52 * * figure 3 *; | [AD]US5592939 (MARTINELLI MICHAEL A [US]) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE19631303 (KETTNER KARL ULRICH PROF DR [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5727553 (SAAD SAAD A [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 31 * * figures 6A,6B * [Y] 4; | [Y]US6253770 (ACKER DAVID E [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 9, line 8 - column 10, line 38 * * figures 5A,5B * | by applicant | US5727553 | US6253770 |