EP2319481 - Hair cosmetic product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujinuma, Hiroyuki c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
Matsuo, Takashi c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Masahiko c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 04 /
Koshika, Tomohito c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 05 /
Okada, Kazuhiro c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10183376.2 | 26.04.2004 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | JP20030122808 | 25.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003122808 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319481 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/04, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61Q5/10, A61Q5/08 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (US);
A61K8/345 (US);
A61K8/347 (US);
A61K8/411 (US);
A61K8/415 (US);
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61Q5/08 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kosmetisches Produkt für die Haare | [2011/19] | English: | Hair cosmetic product | [2011/19] | French: | Produit cosmétique pour les cheveux | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2011 | Observations by third parties | 09.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 12.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04009836.0 / EP1470812 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040009836) is 22.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3341418 (MOSES RONALD E, et al) [X] 1,2,6,8 * column 1, line 9 - line 45 * * column 2, line 25 - line 35 * * column 2, line 36 - line 42 * * column 4, line 63 - line 66 * * examples 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2002284655 ; | [Y]JPH10287534 ; | [Y]WO9114759 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1055425 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3709437 (WRIGHT HERSHEL EARL) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 35 * * figure - *; | [A]JPH08283695 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002284655 A 20021003 (HOYU CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10287534 A 19981027 (HOYU CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08283695 A 19961029 (CHUO AEROSOL KAGAKU KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH10287534 | JPH09227347 | - FOOD PRODUCTS AND CONTAINERS, (1994), vol. 35, no. 10, pages 588 - 593 | other | JPH09301835 | JPH09301835K | JP2003081369K | - JAPAN SOFT DRINK KOGYO KAIKAN, "Non-gas Container Is this "Boom" for real? (English translation enclosed)", (1993), vol. 34, no. 8, pages 467 - 471, XP003028890 |