EP2280258 - Process and apparatus for a wavelength tuned light source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2011/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouma, Brett E. 12 Monmouth Street Quincy, MA 02171 / US | 02 /
Yun, Seok-Hyun 30 Cambridge Park Drive Apt No. 4128 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 03 /
Oh, William 30 Cambridge Park Drive Apt No. 5110 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 04 /
Deboer, Johannes 60 C Marshall Street Somerville, MA 02145 / US | 05 /
Tearney, Guillermo 12 Fairmont Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Ortlieb, Alexander Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | Samuels, Adrian James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10183438.0 | 04.06.2004 | [2011/05] | Priority number, date | US20030476600P | 06.06.2003 Original published format: US 476600 P | US20030514769P | 27.10.2003 Original published format: US 514769 P | [2011/05] | Previously filed application, date | EP20080015445 | 04.06.2004 | [2011/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2280258 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2280258 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/12, H01S3/10, G01J3/10, G01B9/02, A61B5/00, G01N21/47 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
G01J3/10 (EP,US);
G02B27/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/00 (KR);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
G01B9/02004 (EP,US);
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01J3/12 (EP,US);
G01J9/02 (KR);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US);
G02B27/46 (KR);
G02B5/20 (KR);
G01J9/0215 (EP,US);
H01S3/08009 (EP,US);
H01S3/08063 (EP,US);
H01S3/105 (EP,US);
H01S5/141 (EP,US);
H01S5/146 (EP,US);
H01S5/4087 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/05] | G01J3/18, H01S3/10, A61B5/00, G01N21/47, G02B27/48, G01J3/10, G01J3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für eine Lichtquelle mit Abstimmung der Wellenlänge | [2011/05] | English: | Process and apparatus for a wavelength tuned light source | [2011/05] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour une source de lumière à réglage de longueur d'onde | [2011/05] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04754611.4 / EP1639330 | EP08015445.3 / EP2030563 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040754611) is 15.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4601036 (FAXVOG FREDERICK R [US], et al) [A] 1-8* column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 5; figure 5 *; | [XI]WO9835203 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 19; figure 1 * * page 10, line 1 - line 3 * * page 16, line 4 - page 18, line 21; figures 4-6 * [I] 3,6,7; | [A]US6111645 (TEARNEY GUILLERMO [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 14; figures 1A,12 * * column 6, line 15 - column 8, line 18; figures 4,8 *; | [A]US6549801 (CHEN ZHONGPING [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [XI] - XIAOKE WAN ET AL, "Linearly chirped erbium-doped fiber laser", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030202), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1109/LPT.2002.806078, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 188 - 190, XP011426976 [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * the whole document * [I] 3,6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2002.806078 |