EP2287421 - Wire reel for reinforcing bar binder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2021/16] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusakari, Ichiro MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 02 /
Nagaoka, Takahiro MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2021/16] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
Kusakari, Ichiro MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Nagaoka, Takahiro MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2021/16] |
Former [2011/08] | Müller, Gerald Christian Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10183727.6 | 08.11.2004 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | JP20040004816 | 09.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004004816 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2287421 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2287421 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2287421 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/12, E04G21/16, B25B25/00, B65B13/18, B65B13/28 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
B65B13/285 (EP,US);
E04G21/122 (EP,NO,US);
E04G21/12 (KR);
B65B13/28 (NO);
E04G21/123 (EP,US);
Y10S242/912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2011/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drahtrolle für Verstärkungsabbinder | [2011/08] | English: | Wire reel for reinforcing bar binder | [2011/08] | French: | Devidoir pour dispositif de reliage de barres d'armature | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04799703.6 / EP1612348 | EP09162063.3 / EP2090719 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040799703) is 31.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2004 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | IT | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | GB | 08.11.2021 | IE | 08.11.2021 | LU | 08.11.2021 | PL | 08.11.2021 | ES | 09.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.11.2004 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
TR | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
GB | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
ES | 09.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 08.11.2004 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
GB | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
ES | 09.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
GB | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
ES | 09.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
GB | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
ES | 09.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
GB | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
GB | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
GB | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0751270 (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]JPH09165918 (MAX CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [IA]WO03028916 (MAX CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-14 | by applicant | JP3050369B |