EP2506143 - System and method for executing application programs from a memory device linked to a server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockstar Consortium US LP 2201 Lakeside Boulevard Suite 1N-110 Richardson, TX 75082 / US | [2014/24] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 8200 Dixie Road, Suite 100, Brampton Ontario L6T 5P6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Domenikos, Steven 54 Myrtle Street Millis, MA 0205 / US | 02 /
Domenikos, George C. 100 Boatswain Way 203 Chelsea, MA 02150 / US | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | PPR AG Büro und Gewerbezentrum (BGZ) Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG Büro und Gewerbezentrum (BGZ) Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | ||
Former [2012/40] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 10183770.6 | 14.03.1997 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | US19960616746 | 15.03.1996 Original published format: US 616746 | [2012/40] | Previously filed application, date | WO1997US04194 | 14.03.1997 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2506143 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2506143 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
G06F9/445 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L67/025 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
G06F2209/549 (EP,US);
H04L67/133 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2012/40] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Ausführung eines Anwendungsprogramms von einem Speichergerät, das mit einem Server verbunden ist | [2012/40] | English: | System and method for executing application programs from a memory device linked to a server | [2012/40] | French: | Système et procédé pour exécuter des programmes d'application à partir d'un dispositif de mémoire relié à un serveur | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 21.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97916019.9 / EP0901655 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970916019) is 03.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4825354 (AGRAWAL RAKESH [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-9,12,14-16 * column 2, line 20 - line 30 * * column 7, line 10 - column 13, line 14 *; | [X]EP0358292 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 32; figure 1 *; | [X] - IBRAHIM ET AL, "World-wide algorithm animation", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 27, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0169-7552(94)90139-2, ISSN 0169-7552, (19941101), pages 255 - 265, (19941101), XP024243669 [X] 1,9 * Section 2; page 257 * * Section 5; page 263 - page 264 * * Section 3.1 and 3.3; page 259 - page 261 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(94)90139-2 | [A] - R. T. Fielding, "Relative Uniform Resource Locators", Uniform Resource Identifiers Working Group, (19950119), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.169.2614&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20120518), XP055027541 [A] 1,4,6-9,12,14-16 * the whole document * | [A] - Atul Adya ET AL, "Web File System: File-like Access to the Web", Fifth Annual MIT Student Workshop on Scalable Computing, (19950101), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.pmg.lcs.mit.edu/~adya/pubs/wfs.ps.gz, (20131114), XP055088281 [A] 1,4,6-9,12,14-16 * the whole document * |