EP2328083 - Systems and methods for providing a service-oriented user interface integration bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larson Ronald 1990 West Nasa Boulevard Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | 02 /
Sellhorn, Augusto 1990 West Nasa Boulevard Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | [2020/08] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
Larson Ronald 1990 West Nasa Boulevard Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | ||
02 /
Sellhorn, Augusto 1990 West Nasa Boulevard Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2020/08] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/22] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10183815.9 | 30.09.2010 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | US20090570445 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: US 570445 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2328083 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2328083 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/38 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2011/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung eines dienstorientierten Benutzerschnittstellenintegrationsbusses | [2011/22] | English: | Systems and methods for providing a service-oriented user interface integration bus | [2011/22] | French: | Systèmes et procédés pour fournir un bus d'intégration d'interface utilisateur orientée par service | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2010 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | ES | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | IT | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | IE | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | LU | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5978834 (SIMONOFF ADAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 24 - line 39 * * column 4, line 42 - line 48 * * column 7, line 33 - line 36 * * column 7, line 37 - line 46 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 49 *; | [A]US2006265711 (BANTZ DAVID F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * sentence 5, paragraph 3 - sentence 7 * * sentence 7, paragraph 6 - sentence 9 * * sentence 1, paragraph 26 - sentence 4 * * sentence 6, paragraph 28 - sentence 8 * * sentence 1, paragraph 29 - sentence 4 *; | [A]US2008196043 (FEINLEIB DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * sentences 6-10, paragraph 5 * * sentence 1, paragraph 6 - sentence 12, paragraph 7 * | Examination | WO9911043 | US2004226027 | US2004015849 | - Florian Daniel ET AL, "Mashing Up Context-Aware Web Applications: A Component-Based Development Approach", Serious Games, Cham, (20080101), vol. 5175, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-85481-4_20, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-642-38979-5, pages 250 - 263, XP055569398 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-85481-4_20 |