EP2261302 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE DEVICE AND ANTHRACENE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/50] | Organic electroluminescence device and anthracene derivative | ||
[2015/50] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Hidetsugu 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0205 / JP | 02 /
Ido, Motohisa 24-4, Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 03 /
Funahashi, Masakazu 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0205 / JP | [2016/16] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Ikeda, Hidetsugu 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0205 / JP | ||
02 /
Ido, Motohisa 24-4, Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | |||
03 /
Funahashi, Masakazu 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0205 / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10184035.3 | 18.08.2003 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | JP20020243545 | 23.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002243545 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2261302 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261302 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2261302 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, C07C15/28, C07C13/66, C07C43/20, C07C43/257, H01L51/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
C07C13/66 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/626 (EP,US);
C07C15/28 (EP,US);
C07C43/20 (EP,US);
C07C43/257 (EP,US);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K85/615 (EP,US);
H10K85/622 (US);
H10K85/654 (US);
H10K85/6572 (US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US);
C07C2603/26 (EP,US);
C07C2603/40 (EP,US);
C07C2603/50 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1014 (EP,US);
H10K2102/103 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/81 (US);
H10K50/82 (US);
H10K85/324 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
Y10S428/917 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | C09K11/06, C07C15/28, C07C13/66, H05B33/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2010/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung und Anthrazen Verbindungen | [2018/31] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE DEVICE AND ANTHRACENE DERIVATIVE | [2015/50] | French: | dispositif electrolumiescent et compositions sur base d'anthracene | [2018/31] |
Former [2010/50] | Elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung und Anthrazen Verbindungen | ||
Former [2010/50] | Organic electroluminescence device and anthracene derivative | ||
Former [2010/50] | dispositif electrolumiescent et compositions sur base d'anthracene | Examination procedure | 14.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.05.2015 | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03792695.3 / EP1553154 | EP09175111.5 / EP2145937 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030792695) is 22.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2017/08] | 28.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.07.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.06.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.03.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2003 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | IE | 18.08.2016 | LU | 18.08.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.08.2003 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.08.2003 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
NL | 20.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0857007 (TDK CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0952200 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [X]EP1009044 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]EP1167488 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) | by applicant | JP2000182776 | Opposition | EP0857007 | EP1009044 | EP1167488 | EP1221434 |