EP2336924 - Medical pump configuration and activity logging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hospira, Inc. Dept. NLEG, H1 275 North Field Drive Lake Forest, IL 60045-2579 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Gary A. 1281 9th Ave Unit 3209 San Diego, CA92101 / US | 02 /
Assadi, Fred 7008 Elmsdale Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
Xin, Yu 15074 Dove Creek Rd San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 04 /
Okasinski, Nick 1330 Brandt Road Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 05 /
Canup, Thomas 7058 Via Del Rio San Jose, CA 95139 / US | 06 /
Engebretsen, Steve 748 Eureka Canyon Road Corralitos, CA 95076 / US | 07 /
Silkaitis, Raymond P. 317 Brampton Court Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | 08 /
Holland, Geoffrey N. 39850 N. Dilleys Wadsworth, IL 60083 / US | 09 /
Keely, Patrick B. 100 Alleghany Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | 10 /
Awan, Mozammil H. 15920 Piazza Way Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10184141.9 | 12.11.2004 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | US20030519646P | 13.11.2003 Original published format: US 519646 P | US20030527550P | 05.12.2003 Original published format: US 527550 P | US20040783877 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: US 783877 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2336924 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H70/40 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US);
A61M5/14212 (EP,US);
A61M5/145 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | System zur Konfigurierung und Protokollierung von Aktivitäten einer medizinischen Pumpe | [2011/25] | English: | Medical pump configuration and activity logging system | [2011/25] | French: | Système de configuration et enregistrement des activités d'une pompe médical | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04810890.6 / EP1685516 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040810890) is 31.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | by applicant | US6269340 | US20030527583 |