EP2345945 - Method and system for multi-mode coverage for an autonomous robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/29] | Method and system for multi-mode coverage for an autonomous robot | ||
[2016/10] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Joseph 9 Redwood Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 02 /
Mass, Philip R. 28 Fleet Street Boston, MA 02113 / US | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
Jones, Joseph 9 Redwood Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | ||
02 /
Mass, Philip R. 28 Fleet Street Boston, MA 02113 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184177.3 | 12.06.2002 | [2011/29] | Priority number, date | US20010297718P | 12.06.2001 Original published format: US 297718 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2345945 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2345945 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2345945 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
G05D1/0272 (EP,US);
G05D1/0219 (EP,US);
G05D1/0227 (EP,US);
G05D1/0238 (EP,US);
G05D1/0242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2011/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur multi-modi Bedeckung für einen autonomen Roboter | [2016/31] | English: | Method and system for multi-mode coverage for an autonomous robot | [2016/31] | French: | Système et procédé de couverture plurimodale pour un robot autonome | [2016/29] |
Former [2011/29] | Verfahren und System zur multimodalen Bedeckung für einen autonomen Roboter | ||
Former [2011/29] | Method and system for multi-mode coverage for an autonomous robot | ||
Former [2011/29] | Système et procédé de couverture plurimodale pour un robot autonome | Examination procedure | 05.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02734767.3 / EP1395888 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020734767) is 04.11.2004 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2017
11.12.2017
WITHDRAWN Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US Opponent's representative SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2017
11.12.2017
WITHDRAWN Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US Opponent's representative SBD IPAdmin 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2017/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2017
WITHDRAWN Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US Opponent's representative SBD IPAdmin 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2017/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2017
Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | 19.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.10.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2018 | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | IE | 12.06.2017 | LU | 12.06.2017 | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/21] | CY | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | DK | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | DK | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | DK | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5204814 (NOONAN THOMAS H [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5279672 (BETKER MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9959042 (FRIENDLY MACHINES LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19849978 (PRASLER ERWIN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6240342 (FIEGERT MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | US4119900 | US4306329 | US4700427 | US5109566 | US5293955 | US5353224 | US5369347 | US5440216 | US5534762 | US5537017 | US5548511 | US5613261 | US5634237 | US5650702 | US5781960 | US5787545 | US5815880 | US5839156 | US5926909 | US6038501 | US6076226 | US6255793 | US20010768773 |