EP2298807 - Antibodies directed against amyloid-beta peptide and methods using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rinat Neuroscience Corp. 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenthal, Arnon 150 Normandy Lane Woodside, CA 94062 / US | 02 /
Pons, Jaume Rinat Research Pfizer Inc 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
Ho, Wei-Hsien 153 California Avenue F211 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 04 /
Grimm, Jan, Markus 643 18th Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Rosenthal, Arnon 150 Normandy Lane Woodside, CA 94062 / US | ||
02 /
Pons, Jaume 3311 La Mesa Drive 3 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
03 /
Ho, Wei-Hsien 153 California Avenue F211 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
04 /
Grimm, Jan, Markus 643 18th Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/12] | Porter, Jonathan Philip, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184193.0 | 01.08.2005 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20040592494P | 30.07.2004 Original published format: US 592494 P | US20050653197P | 14.02.2005 Original published format: US 653197 P | US20050676093P | 29.04.2005 Original published format: US 676093 P | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2298807 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2298807 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, A61P25/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gegen das Amyloid-beta-Peptid gerichtete Antikörper und Verfahren zu deren Anwendung | [2011/12] | English: | Antibodies directed against amyloid-beta peptide and methods using same | [2011/12] | French: | Anticorps anti peptide amyloide beta, et leurs procedes d' utilisation | [2011/12] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 18.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 06.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05778628.7 / EP1781704 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050778628) is 15.02.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9958572 (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al); | [X]EP1172378 (DODEL RICHARD DR [DE], et al); | [XYI]WO03077858 (NEURALAB LTD, et al); | [AD]WO03086310 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al); | [YD]US2004146512 (ROSENTHAL ARNON [US], et al); | [E]WO2005120571 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al); | by applicant | EP0003089 | US4676980 | US4683195 | US4683202 | WO8704462 | US4754065 | GB2200651 | US4777127 | US4800159 | US4816567 | EP0345242 | WO9007936 | WO9011092 | WO9100360 | WO9102805 | US5047335 | WO9114445 | WO9220373 | EP0524968 | WO9303769 | WO9310218 | WO9311230 | US5219740 | US5225539 | WO9319191 | WO9325698 | WO9325234 | US5278299 | WO9403622 | WO9404690 | WO9412649 | WO9423697 | WO9428938 | WO9500655 | WO9507994 | WO9511984 | WO9513796 | US5422120 | WO9530763 | US5500362 | US5510261 | WO9617072 | US5530101 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5580859 | US5585089 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | US5677425 | WO9742338 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5750373 | US5807715 | US5814482 | US5821337 | US5866692 | WO9927944 | WO9958572 | US5997867 | WO0072880 | WO0072876 | US6180370 | US6331415 | US6376471 | US6413942 | US6436908 | US6548640 | US2003147887 | US2003165496 | WO03086310 | WO03104437 | WO2004032868 | US2004087777 | WO2004058184 | US2004146512 | US2004219146 | GB19980009951 | WO1999GB01441 | US20030683815 | WO2003US32080 | US20050676093 |