EP2319583 - Pharmaceutical products and compositions comprising salmeterol, budesonide and ipratropium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cipla Ltd. 289, Belasis Road, Mumbai Central Mumbai 400 008 / IN | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lulla, Amar 131 Maker Towers 'L' 13th Floor Cuffe Parade Colaba 400 005, Mumbai / IN | 02 /
Malhotra, Geena 4 Anderson House Opposite Mazgaon Post Office Mazgaon 400 010, Mumbai / IN | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184561.8 | 29.08.2003 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | GB20020020095 | 29.08.2002 Original published format: GB 0220095 | GB20020027342 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0227342 | [2011/19] | Previously filed application, date | WO2003GB03751 | 29.08.2003 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319583 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P11/08, A61K9/00, A61K9/72, A61K31/135, A61K31/46, A61K31/58 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/38 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/46 (EP,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
A61K9/0078 (EP,US);
A61K9/008 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/38, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/46, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Produkte und Zusammensetzungen enthaltend Salmeterol, Budesonid und Ipratropium | [2011/19] | English: | Pharmaceutical products and compositions comprising salmeterol, budesonide and ipratropium | [2011/19] | French: | Produits pharmaceutiques et compositions à base de salmétérol, de budésonide et d'ipratropium | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03791050.2 / EP1531866 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030791050) is 15.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO03000241 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [XP] 1-17 * page 26; claims 1-38 *; | [X]WO0178742 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 6, line 5; claim - *; | [I]WO0176601 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-17 * page 4, line 15; claim - *; | [XI] - AZIZ I ET AL, "Comparative trough effects of formoterol and salmeterol on lymphocyte beta2-adrenoceptor - regulation and bronchodilatation", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (19990801), vol. 55, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S002280050652, ISSN 0031-6970, pages 431 - 436, XP002268184 [X] 1,16,17 * Protocol; page 432 - page 433 * [I] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002280050652 | [I] - R.K.GUPTA, S.K.CHHABRA, "An evaluation of salmeterol in the treatment of chronic obstructive pulmonary diseases", THE INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEST DISEASES & ALLIED SCIENCES, (200207), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 165 - 172, XP008018997 [I] 1-17 * abstract * | [I] - M.MIRAVITLLES E.A., "Treatment and quality of life in patients with chronic obstructive pulmonary disease", QUALITY OF LIFE RESEARCH, (200206), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 329 - 338, XP008018999 [I] 1-17 * page 329 * * page 331, column 1 * * page 332 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1015520110663 | by applicant | WO0176601 | WO0047200 |