EP2368553 - Pharmaceutical formulations containing methylnaltrexone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/39] | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS CONTAINING METHYLNALTREXONE | ||
[2011/41] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2015/01] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanghvi, Suketu 1 Hancock Drive Kendall Park, NJ 08824 / US | 02 /
Boyd, Thomas 279 River Road Grandview, NJ 10960 / US | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Russell, Tim Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/39] | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184575.8 | 08.04.2004 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | US20030461611P | 08.04.2003 Original published format: US 461611 P | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2368553 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2368553 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485, A61K31/195, A61K31/047, A61K9/19, A61K45/06, A61K47/12, A61K47/18 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K31/047 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/18 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/195, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/39] | Extension states | AL | 28.03.2012 | HR | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | MK | 28.03.2012 | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Formulierungen enthaltend Methylnaltrexon | [2011/41] | English: | Pharmaceutical formulations containing methylnaltrexone | [2011/41] | French: | Formulations pharmaceutiques contenant de la methylnaltrexone | [2011/41] |
Former [2011/39] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN ENTHALTEND METHYLNALTREXON | ||
Former [2011/39] | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS CONTAINING METHYLNALTREXONE | ||
Former [2011/39] | FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DE LA METHYLNALTREXONE | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 05.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04759349.6 / EP1615646 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040759349) is 25.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Str. 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | 02
30.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group PTC ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 220 Hafnarfjördur / IS Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner, et al, et al Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2015/45] | 02.12.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.11.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/53] | Appeal following opposition | 04.07.2017 | Appeal received No. T1609/17 | 21.09.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.11.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PL | 08.04.2020 | [2023/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5866154 (BAHAL SURENDRA MOHAN [US], et al) [YD] 1-11 * column 2, line 44 - line 51 * * claims 1-4 * * example 1 * * figures 5,6 *; | [YD]US5972954 (FOSS JOSEPH F [US], et al) [YD] 1-11 * column 4, line 49 - line 51 * * example 1 * * claim 4 *; | [Y]US2003022909 (MOSS JONATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0059] , [0 71] , [0 72] , [0 85] * * examples 1,3,4 *; | [AP]WO03032990 (SHEARWATER CORP [US], et al) [AP] 1-11 * page 2, line 21 - line 23 * * claim 5 * * page 24, line 1 - line 8 * * page 25, line 32 - page 26, line 1 ** page 26, line 2 - line 4 * | by applicant | US4176186 | US4719215 | US4861781 | US5102887 | US5866154 | US5972954 | US6274591 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY | - H.S. SAWHNEY; C.P. PATHAK; J.A. HUBELL, MACROMOLECULES, (1993), vol. 26, pages 581 - 587 |