EP2375665 - Wireless communication system and wireless communication method with a plurality of guard interval lengths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suda, Kenji c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Seki, Hiroyuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2017/39] |
Former [2011/41] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London, Greater London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184586.5 | 27.04.2006 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | JP20060012364 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006012364 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2375665 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2375665 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
H04L27/2605 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L25/03006 (US);
H04L27/2601 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/39] |
Former [2011/41] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Drahtloses Übertragungssystem und drahtloses Übertragungsverfahren mit mehreren Schutzintervall-Längen | [2011/41] | English: | Wireless communication system and wireless communication method with a plurality of guard interval lengths | [2011/41] | French: | Système de communication sans fil et procédé de communication sans fil avec plusieurs longueurs de l'intervalle de garde | [2011/41] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 11.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06252277.6 / EP1811733 | EP10150775.4 / EP2178258 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6115354 (WECK CHRISTFRIED [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0025] , [0041]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1418720 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 9; figure 2A * * column 2, lines 21-35 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2004160987 (SUDO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * Page 14, 3rd paragraph and fig. 3 *; | [A]GB2291314 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0195] , [0233] - [0241] * | by applicant | JP2000244441 | JP2002247005 |