EP2290715 - Semiconductor light-emitting device, method for manufacturing the same, and light-emitting apparatus including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2019/04] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kususe, Takeshi c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Takahiko c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2019/04] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Kususe, Takeshi c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakamoto, Takahiko c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/04] |
Former [2011/09] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10184721.8 | 01.08.2003 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | JP20020225043 | 01.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002225043 | JP20020256884 | 02.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002256884 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290715 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290715 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15, H01L33/08, H01L33/20, H01L33/32, H01L33/38, H01L33/62, H01L23/00 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
H01L24/06 (EP,US);
H01L33/60 (US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L27/156 (EP,US);
H01L33/08 (EP,US);
H01L33/20 (EP,US);
H01L33/32 (EP,US);
H01L33/385 (EP,US);
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0603 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45169 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48139 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48257 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49113 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01021 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0103 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01038 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0104 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01044 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01045 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01046 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01049 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01051 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01056 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01057 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01058 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01059 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0106 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01063 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01065 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01066 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01067 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01068 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01072 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01073 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01076 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01077 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10329 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10336 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12036 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/20751 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/20752 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/20753 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/20754 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/20755 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/20756 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/20757 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45169, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48257, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/01015, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12036, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2011/09] | H01L33/38, // H01L33/62, H01L33/20, H01L33/08, H01L33/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/04] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lichtemittierendes Halbleiterbauelement, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Lichtemissionsvorrichtung damit | [2018/34] | English: | Semiconductor light-emitting device, method for manufacturing the same, and light-emitting apparatus including the same | [2011/09] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur à luminescence, procédé de fabrication de ce dernier et appareil à luminescence comprenant ce dispositif | [2011/09] |
Former [2011/09] | Halbleiter-lichtemissionsbauelement, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Lichtemissionsvorrichtung damit | Examination procedure | 02.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 12.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03766716.9 / EP1553640 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030766716) is 12.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2003 | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | IT | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | IE | 01.08.2019 | LU | 01.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | FR | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 01.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 01.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 01.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
FR | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 01.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 23.01.2019 | |
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11330559 ; | [A]US3900863 (KIM HE B) [A] 1,2,37* column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 68; figures 3,4,6 *; | [IY]US6229160 (KRAMES MICHAEL R [US], et al) [I] 37,38 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 46; figures 5,6,10 * * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 7 * [Y] 37,38; | [XYI]US2002017651 (KATO MUNEHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,13,15,24,25,31,32 * paragraphs [0031] - [0057]; figure 1 * [Y] 37,38 [I] 5 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 2, & JP11330559 A 19991130 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0330629 | JP2001313422 |